Rose et al v. Aaron et al
Appellant: Carol Rose, Inc. and Carol Alison Ramsay Rose
Appellee: Elizabeth Weston, Jay McLaughlin, Aaron Ranch, Equis Equine, LLC, Phillip Aaron, Aaron's Ranch, Inc. and Lori Aaron
Case Number: 4:2020cv00790
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further proceedings should therefore be filed under Docket Number 4:19-CV-00098. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/30/2020. (daj, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Carol Rose, Inc., Carol Alison Ramsay Rose. (Hubbard, Caitlyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
October 14, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 14, 2020 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (baf, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK17-04131. File received, filed by Carol Alison Ramsay Rose, Carol Rose, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Corrected Order on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #4 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet)(baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose et al v. Aaron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carol Rose, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh G Connor, II
Represented By: Caitlyn Elizabeth Hubbard
Represented By: John Hill Cayce, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carol Alison Ramsay Rose
Represented By: Hugh G Connor, II
Represented By: Caitlyn Elizabeth Hubbard
Represented By: John Hill Cayce, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Elizabeth Weston
Represented By: Jimmy Don Gordon
Represented By: Jason M Davis
Represented By: Omar Jesus Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jay McLaughlin
Represented By: Jimmy Don Gordon
Represented By: Jason M Davis
Represented By: Omar Jesus Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Aaron Ranch
Represented By: Jimmy Don Gordon
Represented By: Jason M Davis
Represented By: Omar Jesus Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Equis Equine, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy Don Gordon
Represented By: Jason M Davis
Represented By: Omar Jesus Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Phillip Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Aaron's Ranch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lori Aaron
Represented By: Jimmy Don Gordon
Represented By: Jason M Davis
Represented By: Omar Jesus Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?