Paul v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Paul
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC and Mountain Run Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00794
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Mountain Run Solutions, LLC by Kevin Paul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Leroy Scott, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Leroy)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Paul. Mountain Run Solutions, LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Scott, Leroy)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/11/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/4/2020. (rpc, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Merar, Michael)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Merar, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Mountain Run Solutions, LLC. (rpc, )
November 12, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Non-Serve as to Mountain Run Solutions, LLC submitted by Kevin Paul. The document should be filed using event Summons Returned Unexecuted. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Non-Serve as to Mountain Run Solutions, LLC, filed by Kevin Paul. (Scott, Leroy) Modified on 11/12/2020 (rpc, ). Modified on 11/13/2020 (rpc, ).
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Mountain Run Solutions, LLC. (rpc, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (rpc, )
October 15, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 15, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Kevin Paul Certificate of Interested Persons (Scott, Leroy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8055705.), filed by Kevin Paul. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Leroy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Paul
Represented By: Leroy Brenardo Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Michael Adam Merar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Run Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?