Viva Voyage, LLC v. Rovia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Viva Voyage, LLC
Defendant: WorldVentures Marketing, LLC, Jerre Fuqua, Rovia, LLC, Wayne Nugent and WorldVentures Holdings LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00806
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-80838. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. The motion is otherwise denied as moot. Any pending motions are denied without prejudice for the parties to refile upon appearing before the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #13 Amended Complaint and Improper Venue, or Alternatively MOTION to Change Venue filed by Viva Voyage, LLC. Replies due by 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER. Upon a sua sponte review of the record and the filings by the parties, Plaintiff's response to #21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively Motion to Change Venue shall be filed by close of business day, Wednesday, October 14, 2020. The motion has been pending for well over two months, originally having been filed on August 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/13/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Notice that the Motion to Dismiss is at Issue filed by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Replies due by 10/16/2020. (Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Notice that the Motion to Dismiss is at Issue by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT Joint by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DE 25, #2 Exhibit B - DE 27, #3 Exhibit C - DE 30)(Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 30 Defendant's REPLY to #27 Supplement, Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Notice that the Motion to Dismiss is at Issue by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 29 CORRECTED CLERK'S NOTICE re #26 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney signed the Notice of Change of Address as Nicole V. Oden. Attorney must file documents under the name listed on the SDFL Roll of Attorneys, Nicole Christine Velasco. See #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/name-changes. It is not necessary to refile this document. (pt) Modified last word in text on 10/7/2020 to reflect document (bb). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Nicole Christine Velasco re #26 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Nicole Christine Velasco has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT to #25 Notice (Other),, in Opposition to Defendant's Notice that the Motion to Dismiss is at Issue by Viva Voyage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicole Christine Velasco. Attorney Nicole Christine Velasco added to party Jerre Fuqua (pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Christine Velasco added to party Wayne Nugent (pty:dft). (Velasco, Nicole) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC re #21 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #13 Amended Complaint and Improper Venue, or Alternatively MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Notice of DE 21 Being at Issue. Attorney Jonathan Charles Chane added to party Jerre Fuqua (pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Charles Chane added to party Wayne Nugent (pty:dft). (Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/24/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #21 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #13 Amended Complaint and Improper Venue, or Alternatively MOTION to Change Venue by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #13 Amended Complaint and Improper Venue, or Alternatively, MOTION to Change Venue by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rovia LLC Company Charter, #2 Exhibit B - WorldVentures Marketing LLC Company Charter, #3 Exhibit C - WorldVentures Holdings LLC Company Charter, #4 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Jerre Fuqua, #5 Exhibit F - MSA, #6 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Debra Renee Mzyk, #7 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Wayne Nugent, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Kenneth Edward Head, Jr. for WorldVentures Marketing, LLC, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Kenneth Edward Head, Jr. for WorldVentures Holdings, LLC)(Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/4/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. (Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/30/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to [DE 13] Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages re #13 Amended Complaint by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Velasco, Nicole) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or secondary email information for attorney Nicole Christine Velasco re #15 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney is instructed to return to her PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating her information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Christine Velasco on behalf of Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Attorney Nicole Christine Velasco added to party Rovia, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Christine Velasco added to party WorldVentures Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Christine Velasco added to party WorldVentures Marketing, LLC (pty:dft). (Velasco, Nicole) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss in light of Plaintiff's filing #13 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC, filed by Viva Voyage, LLC.(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 3, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Seal Confidential Documents per Local Rule 5.4 by Rovia, LLC. (Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
July 3, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint and Improper Venue, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Responses due by 7/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rovia, LLC charter, #2 Exhibit B - WorldVentures Marketing, LLC Charter, #3 Exhibit C - WorldVentures Holdings, LLC Charter, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Wayne Nugent, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Jerre Fuqua, #6 Exhibit F - Master Services Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Debra Renee Mzyk, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Kenneth Edward Head, Jr. on behalf of WorldVentures Marketing, LLC, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Kenneth Edward Head, Jr. on behalf of WorldVentures Holdings, LLC)(Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document #1 . Rovia, LLC; WorldVentures Holdings, LLC.; WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Responses/Answers due 7/3/2020. Additionally, Defendants may exceed the page limitations by five (5) pages. The parties should note that the courthouse is closed on July 3, 2020 but electronic filings are accepted. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/26/2020. (AHS) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 8 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,,, by Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE.Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall be: double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c).Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Pursuant to Southern District of Florida CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedure 3I(6), all proposed orders must be e-mailed in Word format (.doc or.docx) to the division e-mail address at Singhal@flsd.uscourts.gov.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/23/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Response due 6/29/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/23/2020. (eyr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Motion for Brief Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Charles Chane on behalf of Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. Attorney Jonathan Charles Chane added to party Rovia, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Charles Chane added to party WorldVentures Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Charles Chane added to party WorldVentures Marketing, LLC (pty:dft). (Chane, Jonathan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jerre Fuqua, Wayne Nugent, Rovia, LLC, WorldVentures Holdings, LLC, WorldVentures Marketing, LLC. (lbc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Viva Voyage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Exhibit "A", #2 Summon(s) Exhibit "B", #3 Summon(s) Exhibit "C", #4 Summon(s) Exhibit "D", #5 Summon(s) Exhibit "E") (Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12935520, filed by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viva Voyage, LLC v. Rovia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorldVentures Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerre Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rovia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WorldVentures Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viva Voyage, LLC
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?