Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation v. The University of North Texas et al
Plaintiff: Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation
Defendant: The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System, Shannon Goodman and Neal Smatresk
Case Number: 4:2020cv00973
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY IN SUPPORT of #12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation. (Henneke, Robert) Modified title on 2/16/2021 (bmf, ).
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to this Court's Order granting the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines #14 , the Rule 16 Management Conference scheduled for 3/18/2021 is CANCELLED.(ldm)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shannon Goodman, Neal Smatresk, The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellums, Sandy)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint MOTION to Stay re 11 Order. ORDERED that all deadlines in this case are STAYED pending the resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/26/2021. (ch, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay re #11 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #10 Order by Shannon Goodman, Neal Smatresk, The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellums, Sandy)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henneke, Robert)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/26/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/22/2021. (mcg)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/22/2021. (mcg)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE*** Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henneke, Robert) Modified on 1/22/2021 (mcg, ).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding Document #9 : TWO-PART PLEADING/MOTION. Plaintiff has until 11:59 p.m. on Monday, 1/25/2021, to refile it's Motion to Remand. (mcg)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Aaron Barnes, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barnes, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) by Shannon Goodman, Neal Smatresk, The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellums, Sandy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/12/2021) (baf, ).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Dominguez, #2 Exhibit A - UNT, #3 Exhibit B - Competition, #4 Exhibit C - Transparency, #5 Exhibit D - Accountability, #6 Exhibit E - Tuition, #7 Exhibit F - Tuition, #8 Exhibit G - Tuition Deregulation, #9 Exhibit H - Tuition Deregulation, #10 Exhibit I - Immigrant Tuition, #11 Exhibit J - Immigrant Tuition, #12 Exhibit K - Immigrant Tuition, #13 Exhibit L - Legislative Agenda, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Henneke, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT submitted DOCUMENT #5 - THE EXHIBITS ARE WITHIN THE MAIN DOCUMENT WHICH DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-5. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT submitted DOCUMENT #5 - THE EXHIBITS ARE ALL WITHIN THE MAIN DOCUMENT WHICH DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-5. Correction should be made by ONE BUISNESS DAY (baf, ) Modified on 1/11/2021 (baf, ).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henneke, Robert) Modified on 1/11/2021 (baf, ).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Shannon Goodman, Neal Smatresk, The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System.( Hellums, Sandy)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Neal Smatresk to 1/12/2021; The University of North Texas System to 1/12/2021; The University of North Texas to 1/12/2021; Shannon Goodman to 1/12/2021. 13 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Shannon Goodman, Neal Smatresk, The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System.(baf, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Shannon Goodman, Neal Smatresk, The University of North Texas, The University of North Texas System, filed by Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation.(baf, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Denton County District Court, case number 20-9524-442. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8167459), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit B-5, #9 Exhibit B-6, #10 Exhibit B-7, #11 Exhibit B-8, #12 Exhibit B-9, #13 Exhibit B-10, #14 Exhibit B-11, #15 Exhibit B-12, #16 Exhibit B-13, #17 Exhibit B-14, #18 Exhibit B-15, #19 Exhibit B-16, #20 Exhibit B-17, #21 Exhibit B-18, #22 Exhibit C, #23 Exhibit D)(Taylor, William)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation v. The University of North Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of North Texas
Represented By: William Andrew Taylor
Represented By: Sandy Dian Hellums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of North Texas System
Represented By: William Andrew Taylor
Represented By: Sandy Dian Hellums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Goodman
Represented By: William Andrew Taylor
Represented By: Sandy Dian Hellums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Smatresk
Represented By: William Andrew Taylor
Represented By: Sandy Dian Hellums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Conservatives of Texas Foundation
Represented By: Chance Dean Weldon
Represented By: Robert Earl Henneke
Represented By: Joseph Aaron Barnes, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?