Holley et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Hillcrest Ambulatory Services, LLC, LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A. and Lisa Holley, M.D. individually and d/b/a LH Medical Services, LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A. and Hillcrest Ambulatory Services, LLC doing business as LH Medical Services doing business as LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A. doing business as Hillcrest Amb
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company and United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00187
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 07:2023
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for United Healthcare Insurance Company to 5/21/2021; United Healthcare Services, Inc. to 5/21/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc..( Clack, Lance)
April 19, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT submitted DOCUMENT #5 - THE NUMBER OF DAYS REQUESTED EXCEEDS THE NUMBER OF DAYS THAT THE CLERK CAN GRANT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc..( Clack, Lance) Modified on 4/19/2021 (baf, ).
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (baf, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (baf, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Holley, MD, LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A., Hillcrest Ambulatory Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Cole, Kim)
March 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 8, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8284210.), filed by Lisa Holley, LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A., Hillcrest Ambulatory Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Cole, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holley et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillcrest Ambulatory Services, LLC
Represented By: Kim Te'Nee Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Kim Te'Nee Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Holley, M.D. individually and d/b/a LH Medical Services, LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A. and Hillcrest Ambulatory Services, LLC doing business as LH Medical Services doing business as LH Anesthesia Associates, P.A. doing business as Hillcrest Amb
Represented By: Kim Te'Nee Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance Vernon Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Vernon Clack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?