Chao v. City of Plano, Texas et al
Plaintiff: James T. Chao
Defendant: City of Plano, Texas, Kyle Watson, Lori Schwarz, Scott Lussier and Mark Israelson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00312
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Additional Financial Documents)(rpc, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 Order. filed by James T. Chao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rpc, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - granting #8 Motion with Leave of Court to Request an Extension to File Request[ed] Document for 14 days. Plaintiff James T. Chao shall have until Thursday, June 17, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., to file an amended complaint in accordance with the Courts instructions in the May 4, 2021 order [Dkt. 4]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/4/2021. (baf, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time by James T. Chao. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court of the United States No. 17-647, #2 Supreme Court of the United States Syllabus No. 17-647, #3 Fifth Amendment Knick v. Township of Scott, #4 Governor Abbott Extends COVID-19 Disaster Declaration, #5 Photos of Address)(rpc, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Address by James T. Chao (rpc, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff James T. Chao's construed Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/4/2021. (rpc, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is ORDERED that no later than Thursday, June 3, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff James T. Chao shall provide the Clerk of Court with his current physical mailing address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/4/2021. (rpc, )
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff James T. Chao shall file a legible amended complaint, no later than Thursday, June 3, 2021, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/4/2021. (rpc, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (rpc, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James T. Chao. (rpc, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Plano, Texas, Mark Israelson, Scott Lussier, Lori Schwarz, Kyle Watson, filed by James T. Chao. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rpc, )
April 19, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chao v. City of Plano, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Plano, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Israelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?