Natour et al v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Enclare, LLC and Nick Natour
Defendant: Data Payment Systems, Inc., Elavon, Inc., One Payment Services, Paide, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Ali Hicham Hamdan, Luis A. Requejo and Scott Bickell
Case Number: 4:2021cv00331
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ali Hicham Hamdan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents evidencing criminal investigations in California, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Canto, Gabriel)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #41 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney submitted by Ali Hicham Hamdan. The Certificate of Conference does not comply with Local Rules CV-7. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Elavon, Inc. only is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Elavon, Inc. as a party to this case. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/23/2021. (rpc, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 40, Proposed Pretrial Order STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ELAVON INC.. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rpc, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ali Hicham Hamdan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents evidencing criminal investigations in California)(Canto, Gabriel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2021: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ). Modified on 6/24/2021 (rpc, ).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. NOW ATTACHED TO DKT #39 .*** Proposed Pretrial Order STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ELAVON INC. by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. (Mosser, James) Modified on 6/23/2021 (rpc, ).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal of ELAVON INC. by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. (Mosser, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Petition or Amended Complaint by Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trowbridge, Christopher)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Due to the Court's civil trial docket, the June 23, 2021 Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Late File Joint Report of Attorney Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' dueling Joint Reports are deemed timely filed. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/16/2021. (rpc, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE by Elavon, Inc. of Discovery Disclosure (Sanders, Jason)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. of Defendants' Joint Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durham, Matthew)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Barakat on behalf of Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8456359. (Barakat, Brian)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Scott Bickell, Paide Paide Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Thomas, Cortney)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Original Petition or Amended Complaint on or Before July 19, 2021 by Scott Bickell, Paide. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Cortney)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Default by Scott Bickell, Paide. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Cortney)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Data Payment Systems, Inc.. (Williams, Ross)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report of Attorney Conference by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to file attachments as designated)(Mosser, James)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosser, James)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Durham, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Data Payment Systems, Inc. (Williams, Ross)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FILED IN ERROR. Vacation notices are not accepted for filing by the Clerk. Please ignore. NOTICE by Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services Vacation letter (Williams, Ross) Modified on 6/10/2021 (rpc, ).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default. The Court finds good cause to expedite briefing. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's response shall be filed by Friday, June 11, 2021 at 5 p.m. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/10/2021. (rpc, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #25 NOTICE Vacation letter submitted by Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services. Vacation letters should not be filed on the docket. (rpc, )
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File submitted by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order EXTEND TIME Joint Report of Attorney Conference)(Mosser, James) Modified on 6/9/2021 (rpc, ).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** NOTICE by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour re #9 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, extend deadline for Joint Status Report (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosser, James) Modified on 6/8/2021 (rpc, ).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #22 NOTICE Request for Extension of time submitted by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. The request should be filed as a Motion. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Emergency MOTION to Set Aside Default by Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services, Luis A. Requejo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Ross)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour NOTICE LOCAL RULE 26(c) (Mosser, James)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Scott Bickell, Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services, Paide (rpc, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #16 Request by Enclare, LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default and #17 Request by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour for Clerk's Entry of Default submitted by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. The documents were filed using the wrong event. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Request by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour for Clerk's Entry of Default against Scott Bickell, Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services, Paide. (Mosser, James)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Request by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour for Clerk's Entry of Default against Scott Bickell, Data Payment Systems, Inc., One Payment Services, Paide. (Mosser, James) Modified on 6/7/2021 (rpc, ).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Request by Enclare, LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Plaintiffs. (Mosser, James) Modified on 6/7/2021 (rpc, ).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs are granted an extension to June 28, 2021, to amend Plaintiffs' Original Petition. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/28/2021. (rpc, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Expedite Briefing on Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/28/2021. (rpc, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Extend Deadlines in Order Governing Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/28/2021. (rpc, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #8 Order, #9 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, by Enclare, LLC. (Mosser, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Durham, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Order Governing Proceedings by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Durham, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 management conference set for 6/23/2021 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 6/8/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/5/2021. (baf, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/27/2021. (rpc, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Ali Hicham Hamdan.(rpc, )
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Durham, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Elavon, Inc.(rpc, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Durham, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Scott Bickell, Data Payment Systems, Inc., Elavon, Inc., Ali Hicham Hamdan, One Payment Services, Paide, Luis A. Requejo, filed by Enclare, LLC, Nick Natour. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(rpc, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Durham, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. from 296th Collin County TX, case number 296-01505-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8378176), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(Durham, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natour et al v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data Payment Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Barakat
Represented By: Ross Angus Williams
Represented By: Christopher Bailey Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elavon, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Payment Services
Represented By: Brian Barakat
Represented By: Ross Angus Williams
Represented By: Christopher Bailey Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paide
Represented By: Cortney Christopher Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew David Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Hicham Hamdan
Represented By: Gabriel Canto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Requejo
Represented By: Ross Angus Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bickell
Represented By: Cortney Christopher Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enclare, LLC
Represented By: James C Mosser
Represented By: Nicholas D Mosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Natour
Represented By: James C Mosser
Represented By: Nicholas D Mosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?