Cypers v. Bankcard Central LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rory Justin Cypers
Defendant: Bankcard Central LLC, Rev 19 LLC, Larry Daniels, Payment Holdings LLC, Does 1 thru 20 and PHI-BCC, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00382
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion To File Declaration Of Kenneth Catanzarite And Attached Exhibit "A" Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/8/2021. (rpc, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2021 for Plaintiff and by 12/8/2021 for Defendant. Discovery due by 2/16/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2021. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 6/16/2022. Mediation Completion due by 2/4/2022. Designation of Mediator due by 1/7/2022. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 12/8/2021. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/30/2021. (baf, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss , #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #25 MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Kenneth J. Catanzarite Under Seal and Attached Exhibit A filed on August 25, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Catanzarite, Kenneth)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Kenneth J. Catanzarite Under Seal and Attached Exhibit A filed on August 25, 2021 by Rory Justin Cypers. (Catanzarite, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order In light of the Court's criminal trial docket, the September 1, 2021 Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larry Daniels. (Meyer, Scott)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Catanzarite, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2021: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (rpc, ).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rory Justin Cypers (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Bankcard Central LLC, Rev 19 LLC (Corley, Gary)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Larry Daniels (Davis, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Counsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of filings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place very voluminous filings in three-ring binder(s). Staples are fine; no binder clips, please. (tls)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rory Justin Cypers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Catanzarite, Kenneth)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, Subject to Motion to Dismiss by Larry Daniels.(Meyer, Scott)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss by Larry Daniels. #1 Exhibit A) (Meyer, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2021: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by Bankcard Central LLC, Rev 19 LLC.(Corley, Gary)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant BankCard Central, LLC's Rule 12 (b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #7) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/19/2021. (baf, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Original ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by PHI-BCC, LLC, Payment Holdings LLC.(Wiley, Kevin)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Exhibits to Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet served on REV 19 LLC on 6/11/2021, filed by Rory Justin Cypers. (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons; Exhibits to Complaint served on BANKCARD CENTRAL LLC on 6/11/2021, filed by Rory Justin Cypers. (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/18/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/14/2021. (rpc, )
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Rory Justin Cypers. (Catanzarite, Kenneth)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rory Justin Cypers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Catanzarite, Kenneth)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Subject to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion by Bankcard Central LLC, Rev 19 LLC.(Corley, Gary)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Bankcard Central LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corley, Gary)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Rev 19 LLC. (rpc, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Larry Daniels. (rpc, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Payment Holdings LLC. (rpc, )
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Bankcard Central LLC. (rpc, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Catanzarite, Kenneth)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8417403.), filed by Rory Justin Cypers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A thru G)(Catanzarite, Kenneth)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cypers v. Bankcard Central LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankcard Central LLC
Represented By: Gary Dean Corley
Represented By: Jared Tyler Elk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev 19 LLC
Represented By: Gary Dean Corley
Represented By: Jared Tyler Elk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Daniels
Represented By: Matthew Kegan Davis
Represented By: Scott Richard Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Kevin S Wiley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thru 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI-BCC, LLC
Represented By: Kevin S Wiley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Justin Cypers
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Catanzarite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?