Sonas Medical Supply, Inc. v. Becerra
Plaintiff: Sonas Medical Supply, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Secretary, United States Dept. of Health and Human Services and Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 4:2021cv00529
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(daj, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY - PLEASE DISREGARD*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonas Medical Supply, Inc.. Xavier Becerra served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Garland, U.S. Attny General, #2 Affidavit N. Ganjei, U.S. Attny)(Scott, Calvin) Modified on 8/30/2021 (daj, ).
July 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 9, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review, Attorney Fees, and Exemplary Damages against Xavier Becerra, Secretary, United States Dept. of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8487917.), filed by Sonas Medical Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Calvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonas Medical Supply, Inc. v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonas Medical Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Represented By: Lurese Ann Terrell
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Secretary, United States Dept. of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?