Speedway Loans, Inc. v. Hassan et al
Plaintiff: Speedway Loans, Inc.
Defendant: Moataz Ibraham Hassan, Manal El-Ghorab, Jacob Andrew Hernandez, Tyler Grant Horn, Timothy Grant Horn, John Doe and Timothy Ray Horn
Case Number: 4:2021cv00575
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy Ray Horn (mem)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tyler Grant Horn. (mem)
September 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Tyler Grant Horn and Timothy Ray Horn, by Speedway Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit "A", #2 Affidavit Exhibit "B" (with Exs. A and B))(Johnson, John)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Manal El-Ghorab. (mem)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Moataz Ibraham Hassan. (mem)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants Moataz Ibraham Hassan and Manal El-Ghorab, by Speedway Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit "A", #2 Affidavit Exhibit "B")(Johnson, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Allow Alternative Method of Service as to Jackon Andrew Hernandez re #6 Summons Issued by Speedway Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, John)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Speedway Loans, Inc.. Tyler Grant Horn served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Johnson, John)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Speedway Loans, Inc.. Timothy Ray Horn served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Johnson, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Speedway Loans, Inc.. Manal El-Ghorab served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Johnson, John)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Speedway Loans, Inc.. Moataz Ibraham Hassan served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Johnson, John)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Tyler Grant Horn. (mem)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Jacob Andrew Hernandez. (mem)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Moataz Ibraham Hassan. (mem)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Manal El-Ghorab. (mem)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Timothy Ray Horn. (mem)
July 22, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mem)
July 22, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Speedway Loans, Inc. (Johnson, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First-Amended) against John Doe, Manal El-Ghorab, Moataz Ibraham Hassan, Jacob Andrew Hernandez, Tyler Grant Horn, Timothy Ray Horn, filed by Speedway Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, John)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Original) against John Doe, Manal El-Ghorab, Moataz Ibraham Hassan, Jacob Andrew Hernandez, Timothy Grant Horn, Tyler Grant Horn ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8505577.), filed by Speedway Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speedway Loans, Inc. v. Hassan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speedway Loans, Inc.
Represented By: John Erich Johnson
Represented By: Mark W Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moataz Ibraham Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manal El-Ghorab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Andrew Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Grant Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Grant Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ray Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?