Nunes v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Devin G. Nunes
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00608
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Prather, Laura)
September 23, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NBCUniversal Media, LLC to 10/28/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin G. Nunes. NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Sekharan, Madhu)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (baf, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NBCUniversal Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8520687.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sekharan, Madhu)
August 3, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
August 3, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin G. Nunes
Represented By: Madhu Suseela Sekharan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?