Robinson et al v. WestGUARD Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael & Khristian Robinson, Michael Robinson and Khristian Robinson
Defendant: WestGUARD Insurance Company, AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company doing business as Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies and North American Risk Services
Case Number: 4:2021cv00722
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by AMGuard Insurance Company, North American Risk Services, WestGUARD Insurance Company.(Peirce, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Khristian Robinson, Michael Robinson. (Patton, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Khristian Robinson, Michael Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Patton, Jonathan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/19/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/6/2021 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/15/2021. (rpc, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Read Peirce on behalf of All Defendants (Peirce, Jonathan)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/21/2021. (rpc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #8 Complaint, by AMGuard Insurance Company, North American Risk Services, WestGUARD Insurance Company.(rpc, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against AMGuard Insurance Company, North American Risk Services, WestGUARD Insurance Company, filed by Khristian Robinson, Michael Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(rpc, )
September 17, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 17, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, TO STATE COURT (Grubbs, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Grubbs, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company (Grubbs, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, COUNSEL OF RECORD BY AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Grubbs, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, DOCKET SHEET (Grubbs, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by AMGuard Insurance Company, WestGUARD Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, INDEX OF DOCUMENTS FILED (Grubbs, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from State Court, case number 429-04324-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8587751), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grubbs, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. WestGUARD Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael & Khristian Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan R. Patton
Represented By: J. Austen Irrobali
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khristian Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan R. Patton
Represented By: J. Austen Irrobali
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMGuard Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven O'Neal Grubbs
Represented By: Jonathan Read Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestGUARD Insurance Company doing business as Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies
Represented By: Jonathan Read Peirce
Represented By: Steven O'Neal Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Risk Services
Represented By: Jonathan Read Peirce
Represented By: Steven O'Neal Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?