Barrett et al v. State Farm Lloyds et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Barrett and Bethanie Barrett
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00732
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/9/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/8/2021. (rpc, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS this case to U. S. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/14/2021. (rpc, )
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/4/2021. (rpc, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Lloyds re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Lauren Slaughter)(Thompson, Rhonda)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file an amended notice of removal that alleges facts sufficient to invoke the Court's diversity jurisdiction on or before September 30, 2021. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/24/2021. (baf, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Lloyds.(rpc, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Lloyds, filed by Jacob Barrett, Bethanie Barrett.(rpc, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Lloyds from 59th District Court, Grayson County, TX, case number CV-21-1046. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8594850), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Dec Page, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certified Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit 3 - Citation Issued to State Farm Lloyds, #5 Exhibit 4 - Citation Issued to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #6 Exhibit 5 - Executed Return of Service for State Farm Lloyds, #7 Exhibit 6 - Executed Return of Service for State Farm Fire and Casualty, #8 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Original Answer, #9 Exhibit 8 - List of Parties, Counsel and Other Information, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Rhonda)
September 22, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
September 22, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. State Farm Lloyds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Barrett
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethanie Barrett
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds
Represented By: Kolby J Keller
Represented By: Rhonda Joann Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Kolby J Keller
Represented By: Rhonda Joann Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?