Ochoa v. Commissioner, SSA
Plaintiff: Christi Michelle Ochoa
Defendant: Commissioner, SSA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00764
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christi Michelle Ochoa. Commissioner, SSA served on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(mcg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2021: #2 Summons Returned Executed) (rpc, ).
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and forwarded along with the Complaint and USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(mcg)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/6/2021. (daj, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Christi Ochoa. (Olinsky, Howard)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michelle Christi Ochoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard)
October 1, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg)
October 1, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (mcg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Michelle Ochoa
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?