Collins v. The National Football League et al
Plaintiff: La'el Collins
Defendant: The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council and Roger Goodell
Case Number: 4:2021cv00792
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/26/2021. (rpc, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TRO Hearing held on 10/8/2021 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham, Telephone number: 903-209-4013.
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Roger Goodell, The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council (Gambrell, John)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction (Dkt. #9 ) is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/12/2021. (rpc, )
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Roger Goodell, The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council for proceedings held on 10/8/2021 TRO Hearing before Judge Mazzant. (O'Brien, Patrick) (Forwarded to Court Reporter, Chris Bickham, on 10/12/2021) (slo)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Permit Telephonic Appearance by Peter Schaffer. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/8/2021. (rpc, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2021 at 1:00 p.m. re #9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction filed by La'el Collins. (Court Reporter Christina Bickham.) (kkc, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction Redacted filed by Roger Goodell, The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gambrell, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION telephonic appearance at hearing by Peter Schaffer by La'el Collins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCathern, Levi)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction filed by Roger Goodell, The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gambrell, John)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Opposition to TRO Motion, Declaration and Exhibits by Roger Goodell, The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gambrell, John)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Gregory O'Brien on behalf of All Defendants (O'Brien, Patrick)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing on #9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2021. (rpc, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction by La'el Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(McCathern, Levi)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stacy Eisenstein on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8616429. (Eisenstein, Stacy)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction by La'el Collins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCathern, Levi) Modified on 10/7/2021 (rpc, ).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2021. (rpc, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel L. Nash on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8616234. (Nash, Daniel)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6)(O'Brien, Patrick)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Roger Goodell, The National Football League, The National Football League Management Council, filed by La'el Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(rpc, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Temporary Injunction submitted by La'el Collins. The exhibits were not filed as separate attachments. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Gambrell, John)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 219th District Court of Collin County, Texas, case number 219-05465-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8615168), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of State Court Documents, #2 List of Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gambrell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. The National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'el Collins
Represented By: Levi Glenn McCathern, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Football League
Represented By: John Eric Gambrell, I
Represented By: Daniel L. Nash
Represented By: Patrick Gregory O'Brien
Represented By: Stacy Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Football League Management Council
Represented By: John Eric Gambrell, I
Represented By: Daniel L. Nash
Represented By: Stacy Eisenstein
Represented By: Patrick Gregory O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Goodell
Represented By: John Eric Gambrell, I
Represented By: Daniel L. Nash
Represented By: Patrick Gregory O'Brien
Represented By: Stacy Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?