Mid-American Supply Corporation v. Truist Bank
Plaintiff: Mid-American Supply Corporation
Defendant: Truist Bank and Truist Bank doing business as BB&T
Case Number: 4:2021cv00841
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 Truist Bank's Original Answer ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Truist Bank.(Clem, David)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Status Report by Truist Bank. (Clem, David) Modified on 12/1/2021 (rpc, ).
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mid-American Supply Corporation (Young, Aynsley)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mid-American Supply Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Young, Aynsley)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/10/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/2/2021. (rpc, )
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/21/2021. (daj, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Truist Bank.(rpc, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Truist Bank, filed by Mid-American Supply Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(rpc, )
October 19, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 19, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank. (Clem, David)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Truist Bank from 380th District Court of Collin County, Texas, case number 380-05170-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8632249), filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit EX A-1, #3 Exhibit EX A-2, #4 Exhibit EX A-3, #5 Exhibit EX A-4, #6 Exhibit EX A-5, #7 Exhibit EX A-6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Clem, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-American Supply Corporation v. Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-American Supply Corporation
Represented By: Keith C McDole
Represented By: Aynsley K. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: David Matthew Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank doing business as BB&T
Represented By: Sean Michael Affleck
Represented By: David Matthew Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?