Ewing v. Fannin County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Quentin Lee Ewing
Defendant: Fannin County Detention Center
Case Number: 4:2021cv00910
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Second) DEFICIENCY ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this Order to complete the civil rights form clearly and legibly, and to submit it to the Court, not later than Wednesday, February 9, 2022, at 5:00 p.m. ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this Order to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, together with an in forma pauperis data sheet, not later than Wednesday, February 9, 2022, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/10/2022. (daj, )
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER. It is ORDERED the Clerk of Court forward a standard 1983 prisoner civil rights form and the standard form for requesting in forma pauperis status to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days from the receipt of this Order to complete the civil rights form clearly and legibly, and to submit it to the Court. It is finally ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days from the receipt of this Order to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, together with an in forma pauperis data sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/10/2021. (rpc, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fannin County Detention Center, filed by Quentin Lee Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
November 17, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plf. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Fannin County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Lee Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannin County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?