Wilson et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Wilson, Patrick Krenek and Donald Akridge
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Stellantis N.V.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00447
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anwar, Kamran)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen R. Basser on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9016303. (Basser, Stephen)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Riley W. Prince on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9001226. (Prince, Riley)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Parkhill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9001197. (Parkhill, Anthony)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ben Barnow on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9001135. (Barnow, Ben)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FCA US LLC.( Anwar, Kamran)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kamran Adam Anwar on behalf of FCA US LLC (Anwar, Kamran)
June 16, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FCA US LLC to 7/22/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Wilson, Donald Akridge, Patrick Krenek. FCA US LLC served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Steckler, Bruce)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to FCA US LLC. (baf, )
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, Stellantis N.V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8947140.), filed by Jason Wilson, Donald Akridge, Patrick Krenek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steckler, Bruce)
May 26, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
May 26, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wilson
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Anthony Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Riley W. Prince
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Krenek
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Anthony Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Riley W. Prince
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Akridge
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Anthony Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Riley W. Prince
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Kamran Adam Anwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellantis N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?