Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.253.250, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.46.138, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.121.2, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.189.58.109, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.197.116, JOHN DOE, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.210.246, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.183.200.207, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.94.217, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 70.121.24.184, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.182.229.197, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.187.81.159, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.136.238, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 204.235.45.205, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.222.16.155, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.198.107.108, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.135.121, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.119.177, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.185.203.232, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.184.150.252, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.87.182, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 183, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.183.42.154, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 70.119.78.24, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.158.54, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.182.227.115, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 66.196.23.17, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 174, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.241.127, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 71.136.190.89, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.78.46, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 69.226.245.252, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 86, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.15.250.221, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 99.97.210.1, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.13.126.1, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.15.248.164, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 172.127.161.249 and John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.113.205
Case Number: 4:2022cv00469
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Ex Parte SEALED MOTION Application for Leave to File Unredacted Versions of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Proposed Summons and Return of Service Under Seal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Summons(es))(Beik, Paul)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the civil case between Plaintiff and Defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.158.54 is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk will close civil action 4:22-CV-384-SDJ, and terminate the John Doe Defendant identified by IP address in this member case as a party in this consolidated action, 4:22-CV-469. (ldm)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Beik, Paul)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the civil cases between Plaintiff and the following John Doe Defendants are dismissed without prejudice: Defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.253.250, Defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 47.185.203.232, and Defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 66.196.23.17. The clerk will close civil actions 4:22-CV-155-SDJ, 4:22-CV-377-SDJ, and 4:22-CV-387-SDJ, and terminate each of the John Doe Defendants identified by IP address in those member cases as a party in this consolidated action, 4:22-CV-469. (ldm)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FOURTH AMENDED CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Cause No. 4:22-CV-469 is to be designated as the LEAD CASE and that the above-captioned cases are now CONSOLIDATED as part of action numbered 4:22-CV-469. All pleading shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 7/27/2022. (mmc)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CONSOLIDATED DEFENDANTS ADDED: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.253.250 (4:22-cv-155), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.46.138 (4:22-cv-156),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.121.2 (4:22-cv-158), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.189.58.109 (4:22-cv-167),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.197.116 (4:22-cv-268), JOHN DOE, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.210.246 (4:22-cv-270), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.183.200.207 (4:22-cv-272), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.94.217 (4:22-cv-273), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 70.121.24.184 (4:22-cv-274), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.182.229.197 (4:22-cv-276), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.187.81.159 (4:22-cv-277), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.136.238 (4:22-cv-278), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 204.235.45.205 (4:22-cv-279), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.222.16.155 (4:22-cv-280),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.198.107.108 (4:22-cv-281), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.135.121 (4:22-cv-282),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.119.177 (4:22-cv-274),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.185.203.232 (4:22-cv-377), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.184.150.252 (4:22-cv-378), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.87.182 (4:22-cv-380),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.10.70.183 (4:22-cv-381),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.183.42.154 (4:22-cv-382), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 70.119.78.24 (4:22-cv-383), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.158.54 (4:22-cv-384), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.182.227.115 Consolidated Civil Action 4:22-cv-386, John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 66.196.23.17 (4:22-cv-387), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 174.82.99.82 (4:22-cv-388), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.241.127 (4:22-cv-390), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 71.136.190.89 (4:22-cv-459), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.78.46 (4:22-cv-460), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 69.226.245.252 (4:22-cv-461), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 75.62.71.86 (4:22-cv-463),John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.15.250.221 (4:22-cv-464), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 99.97.210.1 (4:22-cv-465), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.13.126.1 (4:22-cv-466), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.15.248.164 (4:22-cv-467), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 172.127.161.249 (4:22-cv-468), John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.113.205 (4:22-cv-567) (mmc)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Parties in these newly consolidated cases are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the lead case (4:22-CV-155). With these modifications, the prior consolidation orders, (4:22-CV-155, Dkt. #5, #7, #23), remain in effect. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 6/8/2022. (daj, )
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 4:22cv155 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings are to be filed in the Lead Case. (daj, )
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/3/2022. (baf, )
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (las, )
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (las, )
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beik, Paul)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Beik, Paul)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8954214.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beik, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul Stephen Beik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.253.250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.46.138
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.121.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.189.58.109
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.186.197.116
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.210.246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.183.200.207
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.94.217
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 70.121.24.184
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.182.229.197
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.187.81.159
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.136.238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 204.235.45.205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.222.16.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.198.107.108
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.135.121
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.186.119.177
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.185.203.232
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.184.150.252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.87.182
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 183
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.183.42.154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 70.119.78.24
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 47.187.158.54
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.182.227.115
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 66.196.23.17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 174
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.241.127
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 71.136.190.89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.187.78.46
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 69.226.245.252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 86
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.15.250.221
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 99.97.210.1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.13.126.1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 104.15.248.164
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 172.127.161.249
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 72.180.113.205
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?