Buffalo Patents, LLC v. Nestle S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Buffalo Patents, LLC
Defendant: Nestle S.A., Societe des Produtis Nestle S.A., Nestle USA, Inc., Nestle Nespresso S.A. and Nespresso USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00495
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nestle Nespresso S.A., Nestle S.A., Societe des Produtis Nestle S.A..( Barsky, Wayne)
August 9, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne)
August 9, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
August 9, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nespresso USA, Inc. to 9/12/2022; Nestle USA, Inc. to 9/12/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
August 9, 2022 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Societe des Produtis Nestle S.A. to 9/14/2022; Nestle S.A. to 9/14/2022; Nestle Nespresso S.A. to 9/14/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
July 27, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. Societe des Produtis Nestle S.A. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah)
July 27, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. Nestle USA, Inc. served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah)
July 27, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. Nestle S.A. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah)
July 27, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. Nestle Nespresso S.A. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah)
July 27, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. Nespresso USA, Inc. served on 7/22/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Societe des Produtis Nestle S.A. (daj, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Nestle USA, Inc. (daj, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Nestle S.A. (daj, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Nestle Nespresso S.A. (daj, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Nespresso USA, Inc. (daj, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
June 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Buffalo Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Nespresso S.A., Nestle S.A., Nestle USA, Inc., Societe des Produits Nestle S.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8971681.), filed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) Modified on 6/13/2022 (mec).
June 13, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mec)
June 13, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buffalo Patents, LLC v. Nestle S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffalo Patents, LLC
Represented By: Zachariah Harrington
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Pinckney
Represented By: Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Matthew J Antonelli
Represented By: Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle S.A.
Represented By: Wayne M Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe des Produtis Nestle S.A.
Represented By: Wayne M Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne M Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Nespresso S.A.
Represented By: Wayne M Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nespresso USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne M Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?