Hullett v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee et al
Plaintiff: Ruthie Hullett
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE1, Hughes, Waters & Askanase, Select Portfolio Servicing, Judge Brian K. Gary and State Of Texas
Case Number: 4:2022cv00651
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruthie Hullett. Hughes, Waters & Askanase served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (rpc, )
September 13, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruthie Hullett. State Of Texas served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (rpc, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to State Of Texas and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Brian K. Gary and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Hughes, Waters & Askanase and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE1 and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE1, Select Portfolio Servicing. Responses due by 9/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE1, Brian K. Gary, Hughes, Waters & Askanase, Select Portfolio Servicing, State Of Texas, filed by Ruthie Hullett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Ruthie Hullett, #4 Affidavit of Citizenship)(rpc, )
August 10, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE1, Select Portfolio Servicing. Responses due by 8/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Hord, Michael)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Ruthie Hullett as to #4 Order. (rpc, )
July 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall prepare service of process on the named Defendant in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the Eastern District of Texas. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue process and the United States Marshal shall serve process upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/31/2022. (rpc, )
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ruthie Hullett. (rpc, )
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (rpc, )
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ruthie Hullett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rpc, )
July 28, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. *** Consent form mailed to Plaintiff. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hullett v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthie Hullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for the Registered Holders of Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2004-HE1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-HE1
Represented By: Michael Foster Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes, Waters & Askanase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing
Represented By: Michael Foster Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Brian K. Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Texas
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?