Code Utah v. iCode Franchise
Plaintiff: Code Utah
Defendant: iCode Franchise
Case Number: 4:2022cv00657
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that, by no later than Wednesday, September 28, 2022, iCode must file an amended notice of removal that alleges facts sufficient to invoke federal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/20/2022. (baf, )
August 12, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by iCode Franchise.(McLain, Matthew)
August 5, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Thomas McLain on behalf of iCode Franchise (McLain, Matthew)
July 29, 2022 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:22-cv-00353. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2022 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2022 re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by iCode Franchise. All parties appeared via ZOOM.The court heard argument from counsel.The case will be transferred to the eastern district of Texas. Attorney for Plaintiff: Matthew Morrison for Code Utah, Attorney for Defendant: Thomas Rollins for iCode. Court Reporter: ZOOM recording.(ksm) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
July 29, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mmc)
July 29, 2022 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (mmc)
July 29, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mmc)
July 29, 2022 Notice of ECF Requirement: Vincent J. Velardo and Thomas J. Rollins are not admitted to Eastern district of Texas. Emailed instructions for admission requirements or for Pro Hac Vice appearance. Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (mmc)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion to Dismiss. The case should not be dismissed but transferred to the Eastern District of Texas.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/28/22. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting ZOOM Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 at 04:00 PM in Judges Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/7/22. (ksm) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Oral Argument Requested filed by Defendant iCode Franchise. (Rollins, Thomas) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 APPENDIX to #15 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion filed by Defendant iCode Franchise . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - BMF Advance LLC v Litiscape LLC, #3 Exhibit C - In re Bambu Franchising LLC)(Rollins, Thomas) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant iCode Franchise. (Rollins, Thomas) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Code Utah. (Morrison, Matthew) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Code Utah, Defendant iCode Franchise. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Code Utah. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support . Plaintiff's Response due by 6/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/3/22. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 Modification of Docket re #8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : Error: The document should have been filed once as a Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, then linked to appropriate motion. Correction: Event type corrected, docket text modified to correct filing. No further action is needed. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response/Reply Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #3 and Memorandum of Support , Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Code Utah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Morrison, Matthew) Modified on 6/3/2022 to correct event type (alf). [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Code Utah, Defendant iCode Franchise. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant iCode Franchise. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Code Utah, Defendant iCode Franchise. Form due by 6/7/2022. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Code Utah, Defendant iCode Franchise. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant iCode Franchise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(Rollins, Thomas) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 220902655, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4339972) filed by iCode Franchise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 1 - Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Rollins, Thomas) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant iCode Franchise is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 7/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Code Utah v. iCode Franchise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Code Utah
Represented By: Matthew J. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iCode Franchise
Represented By: Matthew Thomas McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?