Alabrash et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH and OLA NONA ALABRASH
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE, MARIE HUMMERT, MATTHEW D. EMRICH, Director Christopher A. Wray and Ur M. Jaddou
Case Number: 4:2022cv01004
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lewis G Jubran on behalf of Mohamad Hazem Alabrash, Ola Nona Alabrash. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9245646. (Jubran, Lewis)
November 28, 2022 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-01875. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 28, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mmc)
November 28, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mmc)
November 28, 2022 ***ATTORNEY PATRICIA K MCBRIDE NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN TXED - ATTORNEY ADMISSION INFORMATION SENT VIA EMAIL*** Notified Attorney, PATRICIA K. MCBRIDE, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (mmc)
November 28, 2022 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (mmc)
November 28, 2022 ***ATTORNEY LEWIS JUBRAN NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN TXED - ATTORNEY ADMISSION INFORMATION SENT VIA EMAIL*** Notified Attorney, LEWIS JUBRAN, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (mmc)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH, OLA NONA ALABRASH (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/28/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #19 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/15/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/15/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case; MOTION to Dismiss filed by MATTHEW D. EMRICH, HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE, MARIE HUMMERT, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (McBride, Patricia) Modified on 9/27/2022 to add docket link (zjm). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MATTHEW D. EMRICH, HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE, MARIE HUMMERT, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (McBride, Patricia) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, in which Defendants seek an extension of time to file their reply in support of their #15 Motion to Transfer Case and to Dismiss, which was filed on September 6, 2022. Defendants seek an extension until September 29, 2022 to file their reply to allow additional time to confer with agency counsel, who is apparently out of the office until September 15, 2022. However, Defendants' request for this extension appears to be based on a misunderstanding that their reply deadline is September 15, 2022. Pursuant to the Court's September 6, 2022 Minute Order, Defendants must file a reply "by no later than SEPTEMBER 27, 2022." Considering the correct deadline (September 27, 2022) for Defendants reply and the fact that Plaintiffs filed their opposition on September 8, 2022 (12 days in advance of the September 20, 2022 deadline set by the Court), the Court finds it premature to grant Defendants an additional two-day extension based on the reasons described in their motion. Accordingly, Defendants' #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/14/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 8, 2022 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #15 Motion to Transfer Case,, Motion to Dismiss, filed by MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH, OLA NONA ALABRASH. (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case by MATTHEW D. EMRICH, HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE, MARIE HUMMERT, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (McBride, Patricia). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 9/6/2022 (zjm). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response to #15 due by 9/20/2022. Defendants' Reply to #15 due by 9/27/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #15 Motion to Transfer Case and to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response by no later than SEPTEMBER 20, 2022 and Defendants to file a reply by no later than SEPTEMBER 27, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/6/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/08/2022. (DM) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/5/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/3/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARIE HUMMERT served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/05/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
June 30, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9340241) filed by OLA NONA ALABRASH, MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabrash et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH
Represented By: Lewis G Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLA NONA ALABRASH
Represented By: Lewis G Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIE HUMMERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW D. EMRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?