Richardson v. The State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Keresa Richardson
Defendant: The State of Texas, Greg Abbott and Senator Jane Nelson
Case Number: 4:2022cv01041
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1971 Voting Right's Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Order by Keresa Richardson. (Pikl, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2023: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (las, ).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to #12 Plaintiffs Response to #14 Motion for Entry of Expedited Scheduling Order filed by Keresa Richardson. (Pikl, James) Modified on 2/3/2023 (las, ). Modified on 2/3/2023 (ljw, ).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Submission of Keresa Richardson Motion for Entry of Expedited Scheduling Order de#10 submitted by Keresa Richardson. Incorrect filing event used. Correction should be made by within one business day. (las, )
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Expedite Scheduling Order by Keresa Richardson. filed by Greg Abbott, Jane Nelson, The State of Texas. (Corbello, Courtney) Modified on 2/3/2023 (las, ).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Response to Motion, , #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), (6) Responses due by 2/7/2023. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/2/2023. (ch, )
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** Submission of by Keresa Richardson Motion for Entry of Expedited Scheduling Order. (Pikl, James) Modified on 2/3/2023 (las, ). Modified on 2/3/2023 (las, ).
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keresa Richardson.(Pikl, James)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keresa Richardson.(Pikl, James) Modified on 2/3/2023 (las, ).
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Response to Motion, by Greg Abbott, The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbello, Courtney)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2023. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/25/2023. (rpc, )
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), (6) Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt 4) filed by Keresa Richardson. (Pikl, James)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), (6) by Greg Abbott, The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbello, Courtney)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Greg Abbott to 1/10/2023; The State of Texas to 1/10/2023. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Greg Abbott, The State of Texas.( Corbello, Courtney)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Greg Abbott. (rpc, )
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greg Abbott, The State of Texas ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9265041.), filed by Keresa Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pikl, James)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. The State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keresa Richardson
Represented By: James Alan Pikl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Texas
Represented By: Courtney Brooke Corbello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Courtney Brooke Corbello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senator Jane Nelson
Represented By: Courtney Brooke Corbello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?