G.S. v. BlueCross BlueShield of Texas et al
Plaintiff: G. S.
Defendant: Bluecross Blueshield of Texas and AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The
Case Number: 4:2023cv00018
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is therefore ORDERED that the appearance of Nathanael J. Mitchell as counsel of record for BCBSTX is withdrawn. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/17/2023. (baf, )
February 14, 2023 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for N. Mitchell of Snow, Christensen & Martineau by Bluecross Blueshield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanson, Rebecca)
February 13, 2023 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE submitted DOCUMENT #30 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH THE LOCAL RULES. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
February 10, 2023 Filing 30 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for N. Mitchell of Snow, Christensen & Martineau by Bluecross Blueshield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Martin) Modified on 2/13/2023 (baf, ).
January 30, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca R. Hanson on behalf of Bluecross Blueshield of Texas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9332766. (Hanson, Rebecca)
January 24, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin James Bishop on behalf of Bluecross Blueshield of Texas (Bishop, Martin)
January 19, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Smith King on behalf of G. S.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9316869. (King, Brian)
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 1:22-cv-00100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Texas. The case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 1/7/2023. (mh) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
January 9, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Notified Attorney for Plaintiff, Brian S. King, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO BRIAN S. KING*** (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Notified Attorney for Defendant The AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, Kamie F. Brown, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO KAMIE F. BROWN*** (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Notified Attorney for Defendant The AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, Nathan L. Jepson, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO NATHAN L. JEPSON (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Notified Attorney for Plaintiff, Brent J. Newton, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO BRENT J. NEWTON*** (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Notified Attorney for Defendant, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, Rebecca R. Hanson, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO REBECCA R. HANSON*** (baf, )
January 9, 2023 Notified Attorney for Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, NATHANAEL J. MITCHELL, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO NATHANAEL J. MITCHELL*** (baf, )
January 7, 2023 Filing 24 Motions No Longer Referred: #23 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Texas. District Judge will decide. (cfm) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
January 6, 2023 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Texas filed by Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Mitchell, Nathanael) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #21 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to file Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties indicate they intend to file a stipulated motion to transfer venue by January 15, 2023. The parties must file an Attorney Planning Meeting Report and proposed scheduling order within fourteen days of any order denying the motion to transfer, or if no motion to transfer is filed, by January 27, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/30/2022. No attached document. (med) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff G. S.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint filed by AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The.(Brown, Kamie) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties must comply with Paragraph 2 of the #3 Order to Propose Schedule within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/16/2022. No attached document.(med) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Texas.(Mitchell, Nathanael) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all non-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 11/18/2022. (cfm) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 16 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff G. S.. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Texas. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for BlueCross BlueShield of Texas to 12/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/31/2022. (alf) Modified on 10/31/2022 fix typo (alf). [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Nathanael) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan L. Jepson on behalf of AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The (Jepson, Nathan) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kamie F. Brown on behalf of AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The (Brown, Kamie) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants The AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, Plaintiff G. S.. Form due by 11/18/2022. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants The AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan,, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, Plaintiff G. S.. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by G. S. as to AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The Waiver sent on 10/17/2022, answer due 12/16/2022. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathanael J. Mitchell on behalf of BlueCross BlueShield of Texas (Mitchell, Nathanael) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by G. S. as to BlueCross BlueShield of Texas Waiver sent on 9/15/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/9/22. (alf) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4410853) filed by G. S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff G. S. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks) [Transferred from Utah on 1/9/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.S. v. BlueCross BlueShield of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. S.
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluecross Blueshield of Texas
Represented By: Martin James Bishop
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMS Sensors USA Inc Benefits Plan, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?