American Economy Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: American Economy Insurance Company Real Party in Interest, as Subrogee of Michael Mcknight agent of Real Party in Interest, as Subrogee of Michael Mcknight agent of Whirlpool Corporation agent of d/b/a Kitchen Aid and American Economy Insurance Company
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation and Whirlpool Corporation doing business as Kitchen Aid
Case Number: 4:2023cv00996
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Aileen Goldman Durrett
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Whirlpool Corporation.(Pendroff, Benjamin)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Rule 16 Management Conference is RESCHEDULED to occur on February 14, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. at the United States Courthouse Annex, located at 200 N. Travis Street, Sherman, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 12/27/2023. (jmb, )
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS this case to U. S. Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/20/2023. (jmb, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by American Economy Insurance Company.(Lawrence, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/12/2024. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 2/14/2024 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/8/2023. (jmb, )
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/14/2023. (jmb, )
November 8, 2023 Notified Attorney, Leon Kassab, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (jmb, )
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Crissman Lawrence on behalf of American Economy Insurance Company (Lawrence, Michael)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ORIGINAL ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation. (jmb, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION against Whirlpool Corporation, filed by American Economy Insurance Company.(jmb, )
November 6, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (jmb, )
November 6, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (jmb, )
November 6, 2023 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (jmb, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Whirlpool Corporation (Pendroff, Benjamin)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whirlpool Corporation d/b/a Kitchen Aid from District Court of the 380th Judicial District, Collin County, Texas, case number 380-05913-2023. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9798245), filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Pendroff, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Economy Insurance Company v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Economy Insurance Company Real Party in Interest, as Subrogee of Michael Mcknight agent of Real Party in Interest, as Subrogee of Michael Mcknight agent of Whirlpool Corporation agent of d/b/a Kitchen Aid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Crissman Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Todd Pendroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation doing business as Kitchen Aid
Represented By: Benjamin Todd Pendroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?