Ferris v. Blucora, Inc. Key Leadership Change of Control Severance Plan et al
Plaintiff: Charles W. Ferris, III
Defendant: Blucora, Inc. Key Leadership Change of Control Severance Plan, Blucora, Inc. Leadership Change of Control Severance Plan Committee and Christopher Walters
Case Number: 4:2023cv01018
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 AGREED MOTION WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND SETTING OF RESPONSE DATE WITH SUPPORTING BRIEF re #1 Complaint (Supplemental) by Charles W. Ferris, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Haloftis, Douglas)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties shall supplement their Agreed Motion Concerning Waiver of Service of Process and Setting of Response Date, (Dkt. #2 ), with a copy of the completed waiver of service form. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/15/2023. (baf, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 2 AGREED MOTION WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND SETTING OF RESPONSE DATE WITH SUPPORTING BRIEF re #1 Complaint by Charles W. Ferris, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haloftis, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2023) (baf, ).
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9820628.), filed by Charles W. Ferris, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haloftis, Douglas)
November 15, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 15, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferris v. Blucora, Inc. Key Leadership Change of Control Severance Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Ferris, III
Represented By: Douglas Donald Haloftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blucora, Inc. Key Leadership Change of Control Severance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blucora, Inc. Leadership Change of Control Severance Plan Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?