John A. Mansour v. Morgan Stanley et al
Plaintiff: John A. Mansour
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2024cv00459
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Martin Buttaro on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Buttaro, Andrew)
June 18, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Israel Dahan on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10196028. (Dahan, Israel)
June 18, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeff Goldman on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10195198. (Goldman, Jeff)
June 18, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy P. Burke on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10195126. (Burke, Timothy)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #1) on or before August 12, 2024. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/7/2024. (dlw)
June 6, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Ingram Monteiro on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Monteiro, David)
June 6, 2024 Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zambrano, Angela)
June 4, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Joseph LeMay on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (LeMay, Taylor)
June 3, 2024 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.(Brown, Douglass)
June 3, 2024 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Brown, Douglass)
June 3, 2024 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Morgan Stanley.(Brown, Douglass)
June 3, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen Bush Sessions on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Sessions, Ellen)
June 3, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Vincent Leito, IV on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Leito, James)
June 3, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Christopher Govett on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Govett, Brett)
June 3, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglass Brown on behalf of Morgan Stanley, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Brown, Douglass)
June 3, 2024 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Morgan Stanley to 7/11/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(dlw)
June 3, 2024 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC to 7/11/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(dlw)
June 3, 2024 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC to 7/11/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(dlw)
May 29, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Mansour. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. served on 5/21/2024. (Wolinsky, Andrew)
May 21, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Mansour. Morgan Stanley served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Grauman, Edward) Modified on 5/21/2024 (jmb).
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Mansour. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Grauman, Edward) Modified on 5/21/2024 (jmb).
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Mansour. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Grauman, Edward) Modified on 5/21/2024 (jmb).
May 21, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Mansour. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Grauman, Edward) Modified on 5/21/2024 (jmb).
May 21, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Mansour. Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Grauman, Edward) Modified on 5/21/2024 (jmb).
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Morgan Stanley. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Chan Wolinsky on behalf of John A. Mansour (Wolinsky, Andrew)
May 20, 2024 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (dlw)
May 20, 2024 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (dlw)
May 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Maxwell Grauman on behalf of John A. Mansour (Grauman, Edward)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yavar Bathaee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bathaee, Yavar)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10146400.), filed by John A. Mansour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John A. Mansour v. Morgan Stanley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Taylor Joseph LeMay
Represented By: James Vincent Leito, IV
Represented By: Douglass Brown
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Taylor Joseph LeMay
Represented By: James Vincent Leito, IV
Represented By: Douglass Brown
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Angela C Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Timothy P. Burke
Represented By: Jeff Goldman
Represented By: David Ingram Monteiro
Represented By: Andrew Martin Buttaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Taylor Joseph LeMay
Represented By: James Vincent Leito, IV
Represented By: Douglass Brown
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Ellen Bush Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Mansour
Represented By: Andrew Chan Wolinsky
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Edward Maxwell Grauman
Represented By: Yavar Bathaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?