Dunbar v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Keith Dunbar
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00194
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Bowie
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 Received acknowledgement of transfer from California NDistrict ((New Case number in that district is 5:12cv03305, filed on 6/27/2012) (sm, )
June 22, 2012 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California San Jose Division per order. (sm, )
June 7, 2012 177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Scheduling Conference held on 6/7/2012. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (lgp, )
June 5, 2012 176 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
June 5, 2012 175 Featured Case ORDER granting 174 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer. Sur-replies due by 6/5/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/5/12. (mrm, )
June 1, 2012 174 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 172 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 31, 2012 173 Sealed Document. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan filed by Keith Dunbar Rommel (Rommel, Sean)
May 29, 2012 172 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
May 29, 2012 171 Featured Case ORDER granting 168 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. Rule 26 Report due by 5/31/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/28/12. (bas)
May 29, 2012 170 Featured Case ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Reply due by 5/29/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/28/12. (bas)
May 24, 2012 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 23, 2012 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 18, 2012 167 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 166 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Rommel, Sean)
May 17, 2012 166 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 17, 2012 165 Featured Case ORDER granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer. Responses due by 5/17/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/17/12. (mrm, )
May 16, 2012 164 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 11, 2012 163 Featured Case ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Responses due by 5/16/2012 Replies due by 5/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/11/2012. (sm, )
May 7, 2012 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Google's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
April 23, 2012 161 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer.. (Babcock, Charles)
April 20, 2012 160 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 12, 2012 159 Featured Case ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.) Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/11/12. (mrm, )
March 22, 2012 Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case. (sm, )
March 22, 2012 158 Featured Case ORDER VACATING 157 REFERRAL OF PRETRIAL MATTERS to Judge Craven. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/22/2012. (sm, )
March 20, 2012 157 Featured Case MISC ORDER 12-1. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings and referred to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (REFERRAL TO CRAVEN VACATED PER ORDER) Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/16/12. (mrm, ) Modified on 3/22/2012 (sm, ).
March 16, 2012 156 Sealed ORDER; denying 100 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, denying as moot 122 Plaintiff's Objections to and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix and Linda S. Mullenix as Google's Expert (mrm, )
January 9, 2012 155 Sealed Transcript for Class Certification Hearing dated 12/8/11. (mrm, )
December 8, 2011 154 Class Certification Hearing Exhibit List. (Exhibits in Texarkana vault) (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff Exhibit List)(mrm, )
December 8, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Mediation Conference held on 12/8/2011. (Court Reporter none.) (lfs, )
December 8, 2011 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Class Certification Hearing held on 12/8/2011. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
December 2, 2011 152 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
December 2, 2011 151 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar of Counter-Designations (supplemental) (Mann, Peter)
December 2, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #147 Notice submitted by Keith Dunbar. No certificate of servicewas included and there was no signature by atty. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
December 1, 2011 150 Featured Case ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Defendant's Deadline to Designate Experts and Serve Expert Reports. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/1/11. (mrm, )
December 1, 2011 149 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Google Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs Exhibits (Babcock, Charles)
December 1, 2011 148 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Google Inc.'s Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Babcock, Charles)
December 1, 2011 147 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Keith Dunbar of Counter-Designations (supplement) (Mann, Peter) Modified on 12/2/2011 (sm, ).
December 1, 2011 146 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar of Counter-Designations (Rommel, Sean)
November 30, 2011 145 Featured Case ORDER, ( Class Certification Hearing set for 12/8/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom). The Court further hereby sets a time limit of 90 minutes per side. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/11. (mrm, )
November 22, 2011 144 SEALED Sur-REPLY to Motion re 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Christopher W. Clifton, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, Pt. 1, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, Pt. 2)(Babcock, Charles)
November 22, 2011 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
November 22, 2011 142 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2011 141 NOTICE by Keith Dunbar Class Certification Hearing Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Witness List)(Rommel, Sean)
November 21, 2011 140 Witness List by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2011 139 Exhibit List for Class Action Hearing by Google, Inc... (Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2011 138 NOTICE by Google, Inc. of Filing Google Inc.'s Deposition Designations (Babcock, Charles)
November 18, 2011 137 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Deadline to Exchange Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/18/11. (mrm, )
November 17, 2011 136 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 134 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Linda Mullenix, Pt. 1, # 2 Declaration of Linda Mullenix, Pt. 2, # 3 Declaration of Linda Mullenix, Pt. 3)(Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2011 135 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Deadline to Exchange Witness Lists, Exhibit Lists and Deposition by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2011 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix and Linda S. Mullenix as Google's Expert filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 14, 2011 133 RESPONSE to Motion re 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Mediation Conference held on 11/14/2011. (lfs, )
November 10, 2011 132 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Craven. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/10/11. (mrm, )
November 10, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Mediation Conference held on 11/10/2011. (Court Reporter none.) (lfs, )
November 9, 2011 131 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to seal) : 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion.. (Rommel, Sean) Modified on 11/9/2011 (sm, ).
November 8, 2011 130 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W)(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 129 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit S, # 4 Exhibit T, # 5 Exhibit U, # 6 Exhibit V)(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 128 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(l-n), # 2 Exhibit N(o-q), # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P)(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 127 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(i), # 2 Exhibit N(j-k))(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 126 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(e-f), # 2 Exhibit N(g-h))(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 125 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 124 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N(c), # 2 Exhibit N(d))(Rommel, Sean)
November 8, 2011 124 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N(a-b))(Rommel, Sean)
November 7, 2011 123 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Third Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
October 31, 2011 122 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Linda S. Mullenix and Linda S. Mullenix as Google's Expert by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
October 27, 2011 121 AMENDED ANSWER to 117 Google Inc's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Second Amended Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Keith Dunbar. (Mann, Peter)
October 27, 2011 120 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
October 25, 2011 119 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Teicher, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Teicher Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2-3 to Teicher Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4-24 to Teicher Declaration, # 5 25-39 to Teicher Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Dr. Christopher Clifton, Pt. 1, # 7 Declaration of Dr. Christopher Clifton, Pt. 2, # 8 Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal, # 9 Declaration of Jack Weixel, Pt. 1, # 10 Declaration of Jack Weixel, Pt. 2, # 11 Declaration of John Collins, # 12 Declaration of Steve Crossan, # 13 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 1, # 14 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 2, # 15 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 3, # 16 Declaration of Linda Mullinex, Pt. 4, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 17, 2011 118 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Expert Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
October 13, 2011 117 RESPONSE to 91 Sealed Document, Google Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Second Amended Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
October 11, 2011 116 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. Second Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
October 6, 2011 115 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension of Defendants Deadline to Designate Experts and Serve Expert Reports by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 4, 2011 114 Featured Case ORDER granting 112 Motion to Unseal Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Exhibits; 96 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 91 Sealed Document Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 93 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 95 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 92 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 97 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/4/11. (mrm, )
October 3, 2011 113 Featured Case ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 91 Sealed Document. Responsive Pleading due by 10/13/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (mrm, )
October 3, 2011 112 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document 96 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 91 Sealed Document, 93 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 95 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 92 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 97 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
September 27, 2011 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 91 Sealed Document by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 23, 2011 110 Featured Case ORDER re 109 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google, Inc. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff respond to Google's motion no later than September 28, 2011, at 5:00 P.M. Google's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than September 30, 2011, at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/23/11. (mrm, )
September 21, 2011 109 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Protective Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 2 Exhibit A1-A5 of Buzter Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A6-A11 of Buzter Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 19, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion for an Extension of Page Limitation for Class Certification briefing. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/19/11. (mrm, )
September 16, 2011 107 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification.. (Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 106 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification.. (Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 105 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to seal): 91 Sealed Document.. (Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 104 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K-2, # 2 Exhibit K-3, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 103 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K-1)(Rommel, Sean)
September 16, 2011 102 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 101 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 100 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Class Certification by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Class Certification Briefing by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
September 15, 2011 98 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit T-4, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit V)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 97 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T-3)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 96 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit T-2)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 95 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit T-1)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 94 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 93 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 92 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 91 Second Amended Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2011 91 Second Amended Complaint by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Rommel, Sean) Modified on 9/16/2011 (sm, ). Modified on 10/4/2011 (mrm, ).
September 1, 2011 90 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:( Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2011., Mediation Completion due by 11/2/2011.), granting 89 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Google, Inc., Keith Dunbar. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/31/11. (mrm, )
August 24, 2011 89 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
August 22, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER granting 86 Motion regarding objections under protective order and to disquality plaintiff experts ORDERING that dft shall not be required to show cause and FURTHER ORDERED that no fees or expenses shall be awarded to dft pursuant to courts order (#62) regarding pla motion to compel and no fees or expenses shall be awarded to pla pursuant to courts order (#83) regarding dfts objection and motin to disqualify. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/22/2011. (sm, )
August 17, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER granting as modified 80 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. The parties are further hereby ORDERED to confer and to jointly file a revised proposed scheduling based on the foregoing within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/11. (mrm, )
August 17, 2011 86 Joint MOTION To Resolve The Courts Order On Defendant Google Inc.s Objection Under Protective Order And Motion To Disqualify Plaintiffs Experts, And Alternatively To Conduct Disqualification Discovery re 83 Order, Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
August 11, 2011 85 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
August 1, 2011 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
July 25, 2011 83 Featured Case ORDER, granting in part and denying in part 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Google, Inc.; ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written brief to be filed within 45 days of this Order, why it should not pay Plaintiff's expenses, including attorney's fees, in opposing Google's motion ( Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2011.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/25/11. (mrm, )
July 25, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the Alternative, to Strike Prayer for Relief; denying 58 Motion to Dismiss Google, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/25/11. (mrm, )
July 22, 2011 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
July 20, 2011 80 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Babcock, Charles)
July 20, 2011 79 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery And Request For Expedited Review filed by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
July 14, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery SurReplies due by 7/20/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/14/2011. (sm, )
July 13, 2011 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
July 11, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery. Sur-replies due by 7/13/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/11/11. (mrm, )
July 7, 2011 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 71 Response in Opposition to Motion, 74 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
June 28, 2011 74 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bennet Yee)(Babcock, Charles)
June 28, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #73 Sealed Reply submitted by Google, Inc.. Exceeds the page limit for filing a reply per local rules. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled (sm, )
June 27, 2011 73 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bennet Yee)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 6/28/2011 (sm, ).
June 27, 2011 72 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc. First Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
June 16, 2011 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rommel, Sean)
June 13, 2011 70 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Experts and Objection Under Protective Order, and Alternatively for Leave to Conduct Disqualification Discovery by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Teicher pt. 1, # 2 Declaration of Shannon Teicher pt. 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
June 7, 2011 69 RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 27, 2011 68 Featured Case ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim. Responses due by 6/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/27/11. (mrm, )
May 26, 2011 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 25, 2011 66 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 10, 2011, Motion Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2011. (aec, )
May 25, 2011 65 Featured Case REDACTED ORDER dkt # 60 ; denying 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Dunbar. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/25/11. (mrm, )
May 24, 2011 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion to Seal 60 Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/24/11. (mrm, )
May 24, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 60 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This order has now been sealed per Motion for leave to seal. (sm, )
May 23, 2011 63 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Preliminary Injunction Order (Dkt No 60) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 23, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER denying 45 Motion to Compel Google to Provide Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/23/11. (mrm, )
May 23, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/23/11. (mrm, )
May 18, 2011 59 Answer to 50 First Amended Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Rommel, Sean) Modified on 5/19/2011 (sm, ).
May 13, 2011 58 MOTION to Dismiss Google Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar(Individually as a representative on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
May 10, 2011 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2011 re 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google filed by Keith Dunbar, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc., 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Dunbar, 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief filed by Keith Dunbar. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
May 9, 2011 56 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/11. (mrm, )
May 9, 2011 55 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 54 Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Babcock, Charles)
May 9, 2011 54 RESPONSE to Motion re 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 6, 2011 53 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(Rommel, Sean)
May 6, 2011 52 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Keith Dunbar, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
April 29, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have five (5) minutes for oral argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/11. (mrm, )
April 28, 2011 50 Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Keith Dunbar by Google, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
April 28, 2011 49 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
April 28, 2011 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
April 25, 2011 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 22, 2011 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Rommel, Sean)
April 22, 2011 45 Opposed MOTION to Compel Initial Disclsoures from Google by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rommel, Sean)
April 21, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER Re-setting Hearing on Motions 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint, 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief :( Motion Hearing reset for 5/10/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/21/11. (mrm, )
April 20, 2011 43 NOTICE of Disclosure by Keith Dunbar Notice of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Rommel, Sean)
April 20, 2011 42 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
April 19, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint, 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief : Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have a total of 20 minutes for oral argument as to all of the abovementioned motions (for a total hearing length of 40 minutes). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/19/11. (mrm, )
April 11, 2011 40 ANSWER to 29 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Keith Dunbar.(Mann, Peter)
April 11, 2011 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim or, in the alternative, to Strike Claim for Relief by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Case - Madry v Fina Oil & Chemical Co.)(Mann, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 8, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss PlaintiffsFirst Amended Class Action Complaint and its Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction until 4/28/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on April 8, 2011. (rml, )
April 7, 2011 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Sur-Reply Briefs by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 6, 2011 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Redacted Version per 4/5/11 Order [Dkt # 35] filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Crossan)(Babcock, Charles)
April 5, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to File Unsealed, Redacted Version of Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/5/11. (mrm, )
April 4, 2011 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's proposed docket control order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Defendant's proposed docket control order)(Rommel, Sean)
April 1, 2011 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Keith Dunbar)(Rommel, Sean)
April 1, 2011 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit C to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit H to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit I to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit J to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit N to Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit O to Complaint, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit P to Complaint)(Rommel, Sean)
April 1, 2011 31 Unopposed MOTION to File Unsealed, Redacted Version of Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 24, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Replies due by 4/1/2011. 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, Responses due by 4/1/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/11. (mrm, )
March 23, 2011 29 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Keith Dunbar by Google, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
March 23, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for extension of time to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference. ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference shall be up to and including March 28, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/23/11. (mrm, )
March 23, 2011 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Motion to Dismiss by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
March 21, 2011 26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
March 14, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 3/24/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/14/11. (mrm, )
March 11, 2011 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
March 10, 2011 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 8, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Seal Documents; Defendant shall be permitted to file its Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and the exhibits attached thereto under seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/8/11. (mrm, )
March 7, 2011 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Declaration of Carl Butzer): 20 Sealed Response to Motion.. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 3/8/2011 (sm, ).
March 7, 2011 20 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Crossan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 7, 2011 19 Agreed MOTION to Seal Documents by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 1, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/4/2011.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/28/11. (mrm, )
February 21, 2011 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Google, Inc., filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, # 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, # 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT M, # 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT N, # 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT O, # 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT P)(Rommel, Sean)
February 18, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responses due by 3/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/18/11. (mrm, )
February 17, 2011 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 4, 2011 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
February 4, 2011 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 2 Exhibit 1-8 to the Declaration of Carl C. Butzer, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 3, 2011 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
February 3, 2011 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Keith Dunbar. (Rommel, Sean)
December 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 2/4/2011. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 15, 2010 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Babcock, Charles)
December 15, 2010 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Zmud Teicher on behalf of Google, Inc. (Teicher, Shannon)
December 15, 2010 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Christof Butzer on behalf of Google, Inc. (Butzer, Carl)
December 15, 2010 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Moran on behalf of Google, Inc. (Moran, David)
December 15, 2010 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L Babcock on behalf of Google, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
December 15, 2010 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of Google, Inc. (McWilliams, George)
December 10, 2010 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Dunbar. Google, Inc. served on 11/30/2010 via certified mail, answer due 12/21/2010. (sm, )
November 22, 2010 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 6-734 (dlk, )
November 17, 2010 3 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher L Travis for Keith Dunbar ($100 phv fee paid - Receipt #6-735). (sm, )
November 17, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (sm, )
November 17, 2010 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc.. (sm, )
November 17, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Check for Filing fee of $350 received), filed by Keith Dunbar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dunbar
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?