Motorola Mobility, Inc. et al v. TiVo Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc. and General Instrument Corporation
Defendant: TiVo Inc.
Counter_claimant: TiVo Inc.
Counter_defendant: General Instrument Corporation and Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00053
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2013 Filing 507 Redaction of 501 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/5/13 Pretrial Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melissa Carson, CSR,Telephone number: 214/346-3434. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (mrm, )
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting 505 Motion to Redact re 501 Transcript,,,. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/31/2013. (sm, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 501 Transcript,,, by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 15, 2013 Filing 504 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Jennifer Haltom Doan re 501 Transcript,,,. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting 502 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/25/13. (bas, )
July 25, 2013 Filing 502 Joint MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 41 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2013 Filing 501 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/5/13 Pretrial Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melissa Carson, CSR,Telephone number: 214/346-3434. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2013. (lss, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER grantiang 499 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC, General Instrument Corporation, Attorney Shawn Alexander Latchford terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/10/13. (bas, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 499 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Latchford, Shawn)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting 496 Sealed Motion and staying all deadlines until further order of this court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/13. (bas, )
June 6, 2013 Filing 496 Joint SEALED MOTION (Joint Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order) by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 6, 2013 Filing 495 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 477 Emergency MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
June 5, 2013 Filing 498 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/5/2013. (Court Reporter Melissa Carson, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 494 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 477 Emergency MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Werner, Thomas)
June 5, 2013 Filing 493 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of TiVo Inc. (Truelove, Jennifer)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER granting 482 Motion to extend deadline to submit exhibit disputes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting 480 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed jury instructions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 490 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. re 484 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Responses to Motorola's and Time Warner Cable's Additional Objections to TiVo's Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A)(Werner, Thomas)
June 4, 2013 Filing 489 Sealed Document. Motorola and TWC's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Laches (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 488 Proposed Jury Instructions by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Verdict Form)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 487 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Jury Materials by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 486 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC Amended Joint Notice of Filing of Trial Exhibit Objections and Explanations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit A, # 10 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 485 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Jury Materials by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 484 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC re 483 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Motorola and Time Warner Cable's Additional Objections to TiVo's Exhibits (Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 483 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC Joint Notice of Filing of Trial Exhibit Objections and Explanations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 4, 2013 Filing 482 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Exhibit Disputes by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 3, 2013 Filing 481 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 472 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Strike Two Entries from the May 13, 2013 Errata to the Deposition of John Villasenor filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 3, 2013 Filing 480 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Jury Materials by Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 477 Emergency MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC, General Instrument Corporation ORDERING response & replies. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/31/2013. (sm, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 478 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 472 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Strike Two Entries from the May 13, 2013 Errata to the Deposition of John Villasenor filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Werner, Thomas)
May 30, 2013 Filing 477 Emergency MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 24, 2013 Filing 476 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC Notice of Trial Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 24, 2013 Filing 475 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. of Trial Subpoenas (Werner, Thomas)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/22/13. (bas, )
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER directing parties to file no later than JUNE 3, 2013, a SINGLE set of agreed upon proposed preliminary jury instructions, proposed final jury instructions, and a jury verdict form. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/21/13. (bas, )
May 21, 2013 Filing 472 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Strike Two Entries from the May 13, 2013 Errata to the Deposition of John Villasenor by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 20, 2013 Filing 471 Proposed Jury Instructions by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TiVo's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit TiVo's Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 3 Exhibit TiVo's Proposed Verdict Form)(Werner, Thomas)
May 20, 2013 Filing 470 Sealed Document. Motorola's and Time Warner Cable's Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Jury Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 17, 2013 Filing 469 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 407 SEALED MOTION To Strike Motorola Witness Paul Moroney From Trial Witness List filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
May 9, 2013 Filing 468 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 407 SEALED MOTION To Strike Motorola Witness Paul Moroney From Trial Witness List filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14)(Werner, Thomas)
May 6, 2013 Filing 467 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Notice of Filing of Joint Juror Questionnaire) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 3, 2013 Filing 466 Sealed Notice Of Supplemental Exhibits Re: TiVo's Motion In Limine No. 1 (Dkt. 409) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34, # 2 Exhibit 35, # 3 Exhibit 36)(Werner, Thomas)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER regarding exhibits signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/1/13. (bas, )
April 26, 2013 Filing 464 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 407 SEALED MOTION To Strike Motorola Witness Paul Moroney From Trial Witness List filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER denying 437 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/13. (bas, )
April 26, 2013 Filing 462 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/23/13 (Pre-trial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082 (shellyholmes@skynetcountry.com). <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2013. (sholmes, )
April 25, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Interim Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
April 24, 2013 Filing 461 RESPONSE to Motion re 437 MOTION to Continue Rescheduled Trial Due To Previously Scheduled Conflicting Trials filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,. (Mann, James)
April 23, 2013 Filing 458 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/23/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 23, 2013 Filing 457 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/23/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting 448 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline is MAY 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/22/13. (bas, )
April 22, 2013 Filing 455 Unopposed SEALED MOTION To Substitute Exhibit To Sealed Filing by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit K)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 22, 2013 Filing 454 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 387 SEALED MOTION To Realign Parties And Set Order Of Presentation filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
April 20, 2013 Filing 453 Sealed Document by Motorola and Counter Dft Time Warner. Notice of Correction to 432 Sealed Response (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Response (typos))(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/22/2013 (sm, ).
April 20, 2013 Filing 452 Sealed Document by Motorola and Counter Dft Time Warner. Notice of Correction and Additional Attachment to 408 Sealed Motion(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Motion with correction) # 2 Exhibit X - Additional attachment - new exhibit to Motion)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/22/2013 (sm, ).
April 19, 2013 Filing 451 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 334 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude TiVo's Damages Expert from Offering Opinions or Testimony About Lost Profits filed by TiVo Inc.. (Werner, Thomas)
April 19, 2013 Filing 450 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 335 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Two Improper Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Trautman filed by TiVo Inc.. (Werner, Thomas)
April 19, 2013 Filing 449 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Express License Defenses filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Responses to Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 25)(Lipner, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 448 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Verdict Form by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 19, 2013 Filing 447 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 342 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 6,233,389 is Not Entitled to a Priority Date of November 24, 1997 filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 19, 2013 Filing 446 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 347 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Storer filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
April 19, 2013 Filing 445 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 343 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion of Alleged Willful Infringement filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
April 19, 2013 Filing 444 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 337 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '195 Patent filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 19, 2013 Filing 443 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 338 Opposed MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Spar Regarding Patent Office Practice and Procedure filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Werner, Thomas)
April 19, 2013 Filing 442 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 336 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Appropriate Time Period for TiVo's Damages Counterclaim on the '389 Patent filed by TiVo Inc.. (Lipner, Joseph)
April 18, 2013 Filing 441 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 348 SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Expert Stephen Gray filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 18, 2013 Filing 440 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 352 Amended SEALED MOTION To Exclude In Part The Testimony Of Defendant's Damages Expert, Mr. Mark J. Hosfield filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 18, 2013 Filing 439 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 346 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Daubert And Motion To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Invalidity Expert Jeffrey Rodriguez filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
April 18, 2013 Filing 438 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 341 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action and Tenth Affirmative Defense filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit YY, # 2 Exhibit ZZ)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 17, 2013 Filing 437 MOTION to Continue Rescheduled Trial Due To Previously Scheduled Conflicting Trials by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Werner, Thomas)
April 17, 2013 Filing 436 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC Joint Notice of Agreed Motions in Limine and Other Objections (Doan, Jennifer)
April 16, 2013 Filing 435 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC re 431 Proposed Pretrial Order, Notice of Corrected Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting 428 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/16/13. (bas, )
April 15, 2013 Filing 433 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 408 SEALED MOTION MOTOROLA AND TIME WARNER CABLE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 432 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 409 SEALED MOTION In Limine (Nos. 1-14) SEALED MOTION In Limine (Nos. 1-14) SEALED MOTION In Limine (Nos. 1-14) filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 15, 2013 Filing 431 Proposed Pretrial Order by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 15, 2013 Filing 430 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 387 SEALED MOTION To Realign Parties And Set Order Of Presentation filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting 413 Motion to extend deadline. The new deadline is APRIL 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/15/13. (bas, )
April 15, 2013 Filing 428 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responses to Motions in Limine by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 12, 2013 Filing 427 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 341 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action and Tenth Affirmative Defense filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 25, # 11 Exhibit 26, # 12 Exhibit 27)(Lipner, Joseph)
April 12, 2013 Filing 426 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Express License Defenses filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O, # 2 Exhibit P, # 3 Exhibit Q, # 4 Exhibit R, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit U, # 8 Exhibit V)(Erickson, Brian)
April 12, 2013 Filing 425 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 346 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Daubert And Motion To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Invalidity Expert Jeffrey Rodriguez filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 12, 2013 Filing 424 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 348 SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Expert Stephen Gray filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 12, 2013 Filing 423 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 352 Amended SEALED MOTION To Exclude In Part The Testimony Of Defendant's Damages Expert, Mr. Mark J. Hosfield filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Werner, Thomas)
April 12, 2013 Filing 422 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 335 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Two Improper Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Trautman filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ducca, Marissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 421 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 334 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude TiVo's Damages Expert from Offering Opinions or Testimony About Lost Profits filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ducca, Marissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 420 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 347 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Storer filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Ducca, Marissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 419 REPLY to Response to Motion re 338 Opposed MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Spar Regarding Patent Office Practice and Procedure filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ducca, Marissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 418 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 343 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion of Alleged Willful Infringement filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Ducca, Marissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 417 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 337 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '195 Patent filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Ducca, Marissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 416 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 342 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 6,233,389 is Not Entitled to a Priority Date of November 24, 1997 filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Erickson, Brian)
April 12, 2013 Filing 415 REPLY to Response to Motion re 336 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Appropriate Time Period for TiVo's Damages Counterclaim on the '389 Patent filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
April 12, 2013 Filing 414 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Court's March 27, 2013 Order by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 12, 2013 Filing 413 Joint MOTION To Extend Deadline To File Proposed Jury Instructions And Proposed Verdict Form by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting 404 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/10/13. (bas, )
April 9, 2013 Filing 411 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alexander Latchford on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Latchford, Shawn)
April 9, 2013 Filing 410 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Wheeler Creekmore, IV on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Creekmore, Stephen)
April 9, 2013 Filing 409 SEALED MOTION In Limine (Nos. 1-14) by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33)(Werner, Thomas)
April 9, 2013 Filing 408 SEALED MOTION MOTOROLA AND TIME WARNER CABLE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-W, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 9, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #409). Document # 406, Sealed Motion in Limine is now Terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 9, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #405 Sealed Motion in limine submitted by General Instrument Corporation, Time Warner Cable Inc.,. No certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
April 8, 2013 Filing 407 SEALED MOTION To Strike Motorola Witness Paul Moroney From Trial Witness List by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Werner, Thomas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 406 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION In Limine (Nos. 1-14) by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33)(Werner, Thomas) Modified on 4/9/2013 (sm, ).
April 8, 2013 Filing 405 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION MOTOROLA AND TIME WARNER CABLE'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-W, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) Modified on 4/9/2013 (sm, ).
April 8, 2013 Filing 404 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Motions in Limine by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 8, 2013 Filing 403 Joint MOTION in Limine by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 8, 2013 Filing 402 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Joint Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings) (Doan, Jennifer)
April 3, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 6/10/2013 09:00AM in Texarkana before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
April 1, 2013 Filing 401 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 337 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '195 Patent filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L)(Iancu, Andrei)
April 1, 2013 Filing 400 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 347 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Storer filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 1, 2013 Filing 399 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 342 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 6,233,389 is Not Entitled to a Priority Date of November 24, 1997 filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 1, 2013 Filing 398 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Express License Defenses filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Chopra Decl, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21)(Lipner, Joseph)
April 1, 2013 Filing 397 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 341 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action and Tenth Affirmative Defense filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D, # 2 Exhibit E through J, # 3 Exhibit K through N, # 4 Exhibit O through Y, # 5 Exhibit Z, # 6 Exhibit AA through HH, # 7 Exhibit II, # 8 Exhibit JJ, # 9 Exhibit KK, # 10 Exhibit LL through PP, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 1, 2013 Filing 396 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 343 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion of Alleged Willful Infringement filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 1, 2013 Filing 395 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 348 SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Expert Stephen Gray filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Ducca, Marissa)
April 1, 2013 Filing 394 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 334 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude TiVo's Damages Expert from Offering Opinions or Testimony About Lost Profits filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Werner, Thomas)
April 1, 2013 Filing 393 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 335 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Two Improper Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Trautman filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Werner, Thomas)
April 1, 2013 Filing 392 RESPONSE in Opposition re 338 Opposed MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Spar Regarding Patent Office Practice and Procedure filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Werner, Thomas)
April 1, 2013 Filing 391 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 352 Amended SEALED MOTION To Exclude In Part The Testimony Of Defendant's Damages Expert, Mr. Mark J. Hosfield filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Ducca, Marissa)
April 1, 2013 Filing 390 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 346 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Daubert And Motion To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorola's Invalidity Expert Jeffrey Rodriguez filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Ducca, Marissa)
April 1, 2013 Filing 389 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 336 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Appropriate Time Period for TiVo's Damages Counterclaim on the '389 Patent filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Lipner, Joseph)
April 1, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #387). Document # 386, Sealed Motion to realign is now Terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 31, 2013 Filing 388 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/27/13 Telephone Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/4/2013. (lss, )
March 29, 2013 Filing 387 SEALED MOTION To Realign Parties And Set Order Of Presentation by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Birnholz, Richard)
March 29, 2013 Filing 386 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION To Realign Parties And Set Order Of Presentation by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard) Modified on 4/1/2013 (sm, ).
March 27, 2013 Filing 385 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2013. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
March 27, 2013 Filing 384 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4066483. (Verhoeven, Charles)
March 25, 2013 Filing 382 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 351 SEALED MOTION To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15)(Werner, Thomas)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting 378 Motion to take expert depositions after deadline. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/22/13. (bas, )
March 22, 2013 Filing 380 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 351 SEALED MOTION To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 21, 2013 Filing 378 Joint MOTION To Take Expert Depositions After Deadline by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
March 20, 2013 Filing 377 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/18/13 Motion Hearing before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2013. (lss, )
March 20, 2013 Filing 376 Unopposed SEALED MOTION To Expedite Briefing And For A Telephonic Hearing On TiVo's Motion To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER denying as MOOT 284 Sealed Motion for protective order; denying as MOOT 324 Sealed Motion to Compel ; denying as Moot 245 Sealed Motion for protective order; denying as Moot 248 Motion to Compel; denying as Moot 249 Sealed Motion; denying as Moot 251 Sealed Motion to Compel ; denying as Moot 252 Sealed Motion to Compel ; denying as Moot 253 Sealed Motion to Compel and CARRIES 220 Motion until a written ruling is entered. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2013. (sm, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 375 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2013 re 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS filed by TiVo Inc.. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 373 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anne Elizabeth Abramowitz on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4049039. (Abramowitz, Anne)
March 18, 2013 Filing 372 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey S Gerchick on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4048336. (Gerchick, Jeffrey)
March 17, 2013 Filing 371 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Joseph Fulghum on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Fulghum, Roger)
March 15, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sam Stake on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4047394. (Stake, Sam)
March 15, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Rudis on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Rudis, Alexander)
March 15, 2013 Filing 368 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J DeFranco on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (DeFranco, Edward)
March 15, 2013 Filing 367 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew A Traupman on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Traupman, Matthew)
March 15, 2013 Filing 366 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert B Wilson on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4047248. (Wilson, Robert)
March 15, 2013 Filing 365 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brett Nelson Watkins on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4046889. (Watkins, Brett)
March 15, 2013 Filing 363 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Aaron Nelson on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Nelson, David)
March 14, 2013 Filing 362 REPLY to Response to Motion re 284 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena filed by Arris Group Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
March 14, 2013 Filing 361 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L Bilsker on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Bilsker, David)
March 14, 2013 Filing 360 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 356 Emergency SEALED MOTION To Expedite And Include TiVo's Motion To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon During The Motions Hearing Scheduled For March 18, 2013 filed by TiVo Inc.. (Werner, Thomas)
March 14, 2013 Filing 359 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Carl G Anderson on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4044893. (Anderson, Carl)
March 14, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #358). Document # 357, Sealed Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 358 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 356 Emergency SEALED MOTION To Expedite And Include TiVo's Motion To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon During The Motions Hearing Scheduled For March 18, 2013 filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 13, 2013 Filing 357 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 356 Emergency SEALED MOTION To Expedite And Include TiVo's Motion To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon During The Motions Hearing Scheduled For March 18, 2013 filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) Modified on 3/14/2013 (sm, ).
March 13, 2013 Filing 356 Emergency SEALED MOTION To Expedite And Include TiVo's Motion To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon During The Motions Hearing Scheduled For March 18, 2013 by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Werner, Thomas)
March 12, 2013 Filing 355 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deepa Acharya on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Acharya, Deepa)
March 12, 2013 Filing 354 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Lee Whitehurst on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Whitehurst, Alan)
March 12, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marissa Rachel Ducca on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Ducca, Marissa)
March 12, 2013 Filing 352 Amended SEALED MOTION To Exclude In Part The Testimony Of Defendant's Damages Expert, Mr. Mark J. Hosfield by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Werner, Thomas)
March 12, 2013 Filing 351 SEALED MOTION To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Werner, Thomas)
March 12, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #350 Sealed Motion to exclude submitted by TiVo Inc.. No certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
March 12, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #351). Document # 344, Sealed Motion is now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 11, 2013 Filing 350 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION To Exclude In Part The Testimony Of Defendant's Damages Expert, Mr. Mark J. Hosfield by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Lipner, Joseph) Modified on 3/12/2013 (sm, ).
March 11, 2013 Filing 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Express License Defenses by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 348 SEALED MOTION To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Expert Stephen Gray by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Werner, Thomas)
March 11, 2013 Filing 347 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Storer by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 346 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Daubert And Motion To Strike Portions Of The Opinion Of Motorolas Invalidity Expert Jeffrey Rodriguez by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Werner, Thomas)
March 11, 2013 Filing 345 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Motorola filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit E)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 344 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION To Strike Late Produced Alleged Prior Art Evidence And New Supplemental Expert Reports Based Thereon by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Werner, Thomas) Modified on 3/12/2013 (sm, ).
March 11, 2013 Filing 343 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion of Alleged Willful Infringement by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 342 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment that U.S. Patent 6,233,389 is Not Entitled to a Priority Date of November 24, 1997 by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 341 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action and Tenth Affirmative Defense by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Werner, Thomas)
March 11, 2013 Filing 340 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14)(Werner, Thomas)
March 11, 2013 Filing 339 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo to Supplment Incomplete Privilege Log and TiVo's Deficient Response to Interrogatory No. 7 filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9)(Werner, Thomas)
March 11, 2013 Filing 338 Opposed MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Robert Spar Regarding Patent Office Practice and Procedure by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 337 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of the '195 Patent by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 336 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Appropriate Time Period for TiVo's Damages Counterclaim on the '389 Patent by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 335 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude Two Improper Opinions Offered by TiVo's Expert James Trautman by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 11, 2013 Filing 334 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Preclude TiVo's Damages Expert from Offering Opinions or Testimony About Lost Profits by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
March 8, 2013 Filing 333 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests filed by Arris Group Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
March 8, 2013 Filing 332 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 253 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Time Warner Cable filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Erickson, Brian)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 327 Motion to continue deadline. The new deadline is now MARCH 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/13. (bas, )
March 7, 2013 Filing 330 ANSWER to 86 Amended Complaint by TiVo Inc..(Werner, Thomas)
March 7, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS, 249 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo to Supplment Incomplete Privilege Log and TiVo's Deficient Response to Interrogatory No. 7, 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests, 245 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Protective Order Regarding Deposition Of Jeffrey Blatt, 252 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Motorola, 284 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena, 324 SEALED MOTION To Compel Motorola To Produce Non-Privileged Business Documents Improperly Clawed Back, 251 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo, 253 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Time Warner Cable : Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
March 6, 2013 Filing 329 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 245 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Protective Order Regarding Deposition Of Jeffrey Blatt filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G)(Erickson, Brian)
March 6, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 328, Sealed Document (surreply). PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 5, 2013 Filing 328 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Surreply in Opposition to TiVo's Emergency Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Jeffrey Blatt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G)(Erickson, Brian) Modified on 3/6/2013 (sm, ).
March 5, 2013 Filing 327 Joint MOTION To Continue Deadline To File Dispositive Motions or Motions to Strike Expert Testimony, Including Daubert Motions by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER re: letter briefs and the Court's ruling on whether leave is granted or denied. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/5/13. (mrm, )
March 4, 2013 Filing 325 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 284 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
March 1, 2013 Filing 324 SEALED MOTION To Compel Motorola To Produce Non-Privileged Business Documents Improperly Clawed Back by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Werner, Thomas)
March 1, 2013 Filing 323 SEALED AMENDED REPLY to Response to Motion re 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(Werner, Thomas)
March 1, 2013 Filing 322 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(Werner, Thomas) Modified on 3/1/2013 (sm, ).
March 1, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 322, Sealed Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 28, 2013 Filing 321 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 253 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Time Warner Cable filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19, # 6 Exhibit 20)(Werner, Thomas)
February 28, 2013 Filing 320 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Motorola filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19)(Werner, Thomas)
February 28, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 319, Sealed Additional attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 319 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 316 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (TiVo's Shortened Reply Brief))(Werner, Thomas) Modified on 2/28/2013 (sm, ).
February 26, 2013 Filing 318 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
February 26, 2013 Filing 317 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo to Supplment Incomplete Privilege Log and TiVo's Deficient Response to Interrogatory No. 7 filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2013 Filing 316 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(Werner, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Filing 314 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 277 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2013 Filing 313 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 279 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2013 Filing 312 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 278 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2013 Filing 311 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 275 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, General Instrument Corporation Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2013 Filing 310 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 274 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, General Instrument Corporation Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Filing 309 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 273 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, General Instrument Corporation Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Filing 308 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 272 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Filing 307 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 271 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Filing 306 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 270 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Filing 305 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 269 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 22, 2013 Filing 304 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 245 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Protective Order Regarding Deposition Of Jeffrey Blatt filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(Werner, Thomas)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER denying 282 Motion to extend discovery deadline. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/13. (bas, )
February 19, 2013 Filing 302 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 276 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 301 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 270 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 300 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 271 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 299 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 269 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 298 SEALED RESPONSE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. to 274 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 297 SEALED RESPONSE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. to 273 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 296 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 272 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TiVo Inc. Filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
February 19, 2013 Filing 295 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 279 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation re 389 Patent Priority Date Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 19, 2013 Filing 294 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 278 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation re 195 Patent Noninfringement Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 19, 2013 Filing 293 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 277 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation re Motorola License Defenses Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 19, 2013 Filing 292 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 276 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation re 465 Patent Noninfringement Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 19, 2013 Filing 291 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re 275 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., General Instrument Corporation re Damages Period Filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 15, 2013 Filing 315 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2013 re 282 Emergency MOTION TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF COMCAST AND CHARTER filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 290 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 252 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Motorola filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Erickson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
February 15, 2013 Filing 289 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 249 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo to Supplment Incomplete Privilege Log and TiVo's Deficient Response to Interrogatory No. 7 filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
February 15, 2013 Filing 288 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 251 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
February 15, 2013 Filing 287 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 253 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Time Warner Cable filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
February 15, 2013 Filing 286 RESPONSE in Opposition re 282 Emergency MOTION TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF COMCAST AND CHARTER filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
February 15, 2013 Filing 285 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC re 251 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo, 253 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Time Warner Cable, 252 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Motorola Of Withdraw Of Certain Motions To Compel (Werner, Thomas)
February 14, 2013 Filing 284 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena by Arris Group Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
February 14, 2013 Filing 283 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests filed by Arris Group Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Erickson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
February 14, 2013 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion 282 Emergency MOTION TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF COMCAST AND CHARTER : Motion Telephonic Hearing set for 2/15/2013 03:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. Parties are instructed to participate in the call on a land line, please do not use cell phone. Contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. The Court's conference telephone number is 903-938-8452.(bga, )
February 13, 2013 Filing 282 Emergency MOTION TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF COMCAST AND CHARTER by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 268 Motion to continue expert disclosure deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/13. (bas, )
February 11, 2013 Filing 280 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 245 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Protective Order Regarding Deposition Of Jeffrey Blatt filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
February 11, 2013 Filing 279 SEALED Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mann, James)
February 11, 2013 Filing 278 SEALED Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mann, James)
February 11, 2013 Filing 277 SEALED Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mann, James)
February 11, 2013 Filing 276 SEALED Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mann, James)
February 11, 2013 Filing 275 SEALED Letter Brief filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mann, James)
February 11, 2013 Filing 274 Letter Brief re Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '948 and '704 Patents filed by TiVo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 11, 2013 Filing 273 Letter Brief re Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '714 Patent filed by TiVo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 11, 2013 Filing 272 SEALED Letter Brief re Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of '948 Patent filed by TiVo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 11, 2013 Filing 271 SEALED Letter Brief re Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of '714 Patent filed by TiVo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 11, 2013 Filing 270 SEALED Letter Brief re Summary Judgment on Motorola's Claims filed by TiVo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 11, 2013 Filing 269 SEALED Letter Brief re Summary Judgment that Motorola's Claims are Time-Barred filed by TiVo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Werner, Thomas)
February 8, 2013 Filing 268 Joint MOTION To Continue Expert Disclosure Deadlines by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 266 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline is FEBRUARY 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/13. (bas, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 266 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Briefs Regarding Dispositive Motions by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Mann, James)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 264 Motion to extend deadline for certain depositions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/7/13. (bas, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 264 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Certain Depositions by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
February 5, 2013 Filing 263 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob D Anderson on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3985595. (Anderson, Jacob)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 259 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/13. (bas, )
January 31, 2013 Filing 260 CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL-SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 Agreed SEALED MOTION. (Mann, James)
January 31, 2013 Filing 259 MOTION to Continue TIVO's Motion for Sanctions Against Motorola Under Rule 11 by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Mann, James)
January 31, 2013 Filing 258 Agreed SEALED MOTION by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Mann, James)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting 255 Motion For Leave For TiVo To File, If Needed, Motions To Compel Regarding Asserted Privileges After The January 28, 2013 Deadline To File Motions To Compel. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/13. (mrm, )
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting 254 Motion to Extend Deadline for Certain Depositions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/13. (mrm, )
January 30, 2013 NOTICE CANCELLING Hearing on Motion 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS, 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING, 244 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of TiVo Fact Witnesses Thomas Rogers and Matthew Zin : Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2013 03:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap is CANCELLED.(bga, )
January 29, 2013 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION For Leave For TiVo To File If Needed Motions To Compel Regarding Asserted Privileges After The January 28 2013 Deadline To File Motions To Compel by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
January 29, 2013 Filing 254 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Certain Depositions by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
January 29, 2013 Filing 253 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Time Warner Cable by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Werner, Thomas)
January 29, 2013 Filing 252 SEALED MOTION TiVo's Second Motion To Compel Motorola by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Werner, Thomas)
January 29, 2013 Filing 251 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Errata C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
January 29, 2013 Filing 250 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery from Tivo by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) Modified on 1/29/2013 (sm, ).
January 29, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #251 MOTION). Document # 250, Sealed Motion to Compel is now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 29, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 244 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of TiVo Fact Witnesses Thomas Rogers and Matthew Zin : Motion Hearing RESET for 2/1/2013 03:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
January 29, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS, 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING : Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2013 03:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
January 28, 2013 Filing 249 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo to Supplment Incomplete Privilege Log and TiVo's Deficient Response to Interrogatory No. 7 by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
January 28, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION to Compel Third Party Arris Group, Inc. To Respond To Subpoenaed Document Requests by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Werner, Thomas)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING on Motion 244 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of TiVo Fact Witnesses Thomas Rogers and Matthew Zin : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 02:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/13. (bas, )
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/13. (bas, )
January 24, 2013 Filing 245 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Protective Order Regarding Deposition Of Jeffrey Blatt by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
January 23, 2013 Filing 244 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of TiVo Fact Witnesses Thomas Rogers and Matthew Zin by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
January 23, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Haber on behalf of TiVo Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3966848. (Haber, Benjamin)
January 23, 2013 Filing 242 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dennis Ni on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3966055. (Ni, Dennis)
January 22, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Hamilton on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3963495. (Hamilton, Kevin)
January 18, 2013 Filing 240 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stanley J Panikowski on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3961392. (Panikowski, Stanley)
January 16, 2013 Filing 239 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Falby on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3957956. (Falby, Bruce)
January 16, 2013 Filing 238 ANSWER to 209 Answer to Counterclaim, by TiVo Inc..(Baxter, Samuel)
January 15, 2013 Filing 237 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Michelle Jenkins on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Jenkins, Dawn)
January 15, 2013 Filing 236 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Jesse Hindman on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3954901. (Hindman, Thomas)
January 15, 2013 Filing 235 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Rudis on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3954397. (Rudis, Alexander)
January 11, 2013 Filing 234 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tamar Y Duvdevani on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3948425. (Duvdevani, Tamar)
January 9, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Patrick Kiley on behalf of TiVo Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3945841. (Kiley, Kevin)
January 4, 2013 Filing 232 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. re 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING - Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lipner, Joseph)
January 3, 2013 Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Xinlin Li on behalf of TiVo Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3936958. (Li, Xinlin)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2013 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 4/29/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 1/31/2013. Motions due by 3/8/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/21/12. (bas, )
December 19, 2012 Filing 229 REPLY to Response to Motion re 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Gundersen Declaration ISO Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Gundersen, Gunnar)
December 14, 2012 Filing 228 ANSWER to 73 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC.(Erickson, Brian)
December 14, 2012 Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS filed by AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
December 14, 2012 Filing 226 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Modify Court's Scheduling Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER directing payment to technical advisor. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/12. (bas)
December 12, 2012 Filing 224 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit T)(Erickson, Brian)
December 12, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 223, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 11, 2012 Filing 223 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Motorola Mobility, Inc. and General Instrument Corporation's Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Against Motorola Under Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit T)(Erickson, Brian) Modified on 12/12/2012 (sm, ).
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION MARKMAN ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/2012. (sm, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 215 Motion to hold in abeyance the 11/26/2012 Order (Docket No. 207). Order is Abated with respect to the production of an unredacted version of Sullivan Report until further order of this court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/2012. (sm, )
December 4, 2012 Filing 220 MOTION to Compel AT&T TO ALLOW PRODUCTION OF TIVO'S DAMAGES REPORT FROM THE AT&T CASE AND TO PRODUCE CERTAIN UNDERLYING DOCUMENTS by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration ISO MTC, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting TiVo's MTC AT&T)(Gundersen, Gunnar)
December 4, 2012 Filing 219 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/27/12 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Rondey Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2013. (sholmes, )
December 3, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY,. Document # 217, Sealed Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 30, 2012 Filing 218 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J Lipner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Lipner, Joseph)
November 30, 2012 Filing 217 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph M. Lipner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Lipner, Joseph) Modified on 12/3/2012 (sm, ).
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/30/12. (bas)
November 30, 2012 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION to Hold in Abeyance the Court's November 26, 2012 Order (Docket No. 207) with Respect to the Production of an Unredacted Version of the Sullivan Report by AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Fulghum, Roger)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER adopting parties' agreement regarding production of certain documents and depositions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/30/12. (bas)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER denying as moot 91 Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/30/12. (bas)
November 30, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection will be held on 4/29/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap, instead of 5/6/2013. (bga, )
November 29, 2012 Filing 212 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 11/29/2012. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
November 29, 2012 Filing 211 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 204 Sealed Patent Document. (Supplemental Order on Motorola's Motion to Compel TiVo's Production of Expert Reports and Deposition Transcripts From Other Litigations and Related Interrogatory Responses). (Mann, James)
November 28, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/12 (Motions Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/24/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2013. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2012 Filing 209 ANSWER to 73 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against TiVo Inc. by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Erickson, Brian)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 153 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/12. (bas)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 202 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/12. (bas)
November 26, 2012 Filing 205 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Cert of authority to seal): 204 Sealed Patent Document.. (Mann, James) Modified on 11/26/2012 (sm, ).
November 26, 2012 Filing 204 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (AGREED Sealed Order re 131 Sealed Motion - filed per Judges request). (Mann, James) Modified on 11/26/2012 (sm, ).
November 23, 2012 Filing 203 RESPONSE in Opposition re 202 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Tivo Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
November 21, 2012 Filing 202 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Tivo Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
November 21, 2012 Filing 201 Sealed Document. Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation, Time Warner Cable Inc. and Time Warner Cable LLC's Surreply to TiVo Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W, # 2 Exhibit X, # 3 Exhibit Y, # 4 Exhibit Z, # 5 Exhibit AA)(Erickson, Brian)
November 21, 2012 Filing 200 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation REGARDING MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION (Gillam, Harry)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying as moot 196 Motion entry of order on motion to compel. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2012. (sm, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2012 re 163 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond To Interrogatory No. 1 And Produce Source Code filed by TiVo Inc., 131 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo's Production of Expert Reports and Deposition Transcripts from Other Litigations and Related Interrogatory Responses filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation, 153 Opposed MOTION to Intervene to Protect Confidential Information filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 197 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 196 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER ON TiVo'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORY NO. 1 AND PRODUCE SOURCE CODE.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 20, 2012 Filing 196 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER ON TiVo'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORY NO. 1 AND PRODUCE SOURCE CODE by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 19, 2012 Filing 195 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 185 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Winston Liaw terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/16/12. (bas)
November 16, 2012 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gunnar Gundersen on behalf of TiVo Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3877500. (Gundersen, Gunnar)
November 16, 2012 NOTICE re 188 Order on Sealed Motion, Intervenor Microsoft Corporation is directed to appear at the hearing to be held on Tuesday, November 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. (bga, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 192 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Joint P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart)(Erickson, Brian)
November 14, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany C Miller on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3873545. (Miller, Tiffany)
November 14, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 11/27/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. **Notice that the LOCATION has changed**(bga, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 190 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT TiVo's P. R. 4-5(c) Reply Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Talin Gordnia, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Gordnia, Talin)
November 13, 2012 Filing 189 REPLY to 182 Claim Construction Brief, filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying 81 Sealed Motion to Dismiss. The parties are directed to again meet and confer (telephonically) as to the same and advise the Court no later than November 16, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. as to the status of such matters. In the event these pending motions are not resolved by the parties themselves, such matters are hereby set for argument before the Court in Marshall, Texas on November 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Each side shall have fifteen mintues per motion to present agruments. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2012. (ch, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 187 CORRECTED SEALED RESPONSE by Time Warner Cable Inc., General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC to 177 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Time Warner Cable Inc., General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Erickson, Brian)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 184 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/12. (bas)
November 9, 2012 Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Winston Liaw by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
November 8, 2012 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Reply Brief On Claim Construction by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gordnia, Talin)
November 6, 2012 Filing 183 SEALED RESPONSE by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC to 177 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V)(Erickson, Brian)
November 6, 2012 Filing 182 Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Talin Gordnia, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Gordnia, Talin)
November 5, 2012 Filing 181 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond To Interrogatory No. 1 And Produce Source Code filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 7)(Erickson, Brian)
November 2, 2012 Filing 180 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA UNDER RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR THE FILING OF A BASELESS PLEADING by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph M. Lipner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 31, 2012 Filing 179 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 163 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond To Interrogatory No. 1 And Produce Source Code filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Werner Declaration, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N, # 6 Exhibit O, # 7 Exhibit P, # 8 Exhibit Q)(Werner, Thomas)
October 26, 2012 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re 163 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond To Interrogatory No. 1 And Produce Source Code filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
October 24, 2012 Filing 177 Opening CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Talin Gordnia, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Gordnia, Talin)
October 24, 2012 Filing 176 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Delivery to the Court of Document 172 in Native Format (Mann, James)
October 24, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #177). Document # 174, Claim Construction Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 24, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 175, Additional Attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 175 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE****Additional Attachments to Main Document: 174 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Gordnia, Talin) Modified on 10/24/2012 (sm, ). Modified on 10/24/2012 (sm, ).
October 23, 2012 Filing 174 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Gordnia, Talin) Modified on 10/24/2012 (sm, ).
October 23, 2012 Filing 173 Opening CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Erickson, Brian)
October 23, 2012 Filing 172 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Submission of Technical Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
October 23, 2012 Filing 171 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. of TiVo's Submission of Technical Tutorial to the Court (Gordnia, Talin)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 168 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/12. (mrm, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 152 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference; granting in part 155 Sealed Motion to Continue Claim Construction Deadlines and Request for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 19, 2012 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines re 115 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,, by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
October 17, 2012 Filing 167 Joint PR 4-3 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART and Prehearing Statement filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Erickson, Brian)
October 16, 2012 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion 43 Motion To Consolidate, Motion 155 SEALED MOTION To Continue Claim Construction Deadlines and Request for Status Conference, 163 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond To Interrogatory No. 1 And Produce Source Code : Motion Telephonic Hearing set for 10/16/2012 05:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. Parties are instructed to participate in the call on a land line, please do not use cell phone. Contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. The Court's conference telephone number is 903-938-8452. (bga, )
October 15, 2012 Filing 166 Second Revised CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART and Prehearing Statement filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C)(Erickson, Brian)
October 15, 2012 Filing 165 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 164 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Werner, Thomas)
October 15, 2012 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Werner, Thomas)
October 12, 2012 Filing 163 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendants To Respond To Interrogatory No. 1 And Produce Source Code by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
October 10, 2012 Filing 162 Revised CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Erickson, Brian)
October 10, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE of Joinder by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC re 159 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Erickson, Brian)
October 9, 2012 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION to Intervene to Protect Confidential Information (Notice of NonOpposition) filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Fountain, Aaron)
October 9, 2012 Filing 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
October 9, 2012 Filing 158 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION To Continue Claim Construction Deadlines and Request for Status Conference filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4)(Werner, Thomas)
October 5, 2012 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re 155 SEALED MOTION To Continue Claim Construction Deadlines and Request for Status Conference filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
October 3, 2012 Filing 156 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit Evidence)(Erickson, Brian)
October 3, 2012 Filing 155 SEALED MOTION To Continue Claim Construction Deadlines and Request for Status Conference by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
September 19, 2012 Filing 154 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Gillam, Harry)
September 19, 2012 Filing 153 Opposed MOTION to Intervene to Protect Confidential Information by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Chad Campbell, # 2 Exhibit A-G, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
September 19, 2012 Filing 152 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Crawford)
September 17, 2012 Filing 151 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 131 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo's Production of Expert Reports and Deposition Transcripts from Other Litigations and Related Interrogatory Responses filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14)(Werner, Thomas)
September 10, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Thompson, Gregory)
September 10, 2012 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mann, James)
September 4, 2012 Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re 131 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo's Production of Expert Reports and Deposition Transcripts from Other Litigations and Related Interrogatory Responses filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Fountain, Aaron)
September 4, 2012 Filing 147 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Lee, Lance)
August 30, 2012 Filing 146 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC of Compliance with PR 4-1(a) and 4-2(a), (b) (Fountain, Aaron)
August 29, 2012 Filing 145 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1(a) and P.R. 4-2(a), (b) (Gordnia, Talin)
August 23, 2012 Filing 144 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 131 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo's Production of Expert Reports and Deposition Transcripts from Other Litigations and Related Interrogatory Responses filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Text of Proposed Order, # 14 Appendix A, # 15 Exhibit A-01, # 16 Exhibit A-02, # 17 Exhibit A-03, # 18 Exhibit A-04, # 19 Exhibit A-05, # 20 Exhibit A-06, # 21 Exhibit A-07, # 22 Exhibit A-08, # 23 Exhibit A-09, # 24 Exhibit A-10, # 25 Exhibit A-11, # 26 Exhibit A-12, # 27 Exhibit A-13, # 28 Exhibit A-14, # 29 Exhibit A-15, # 30 Exhibit A-16, # 31 Exhibit A-17, # 32 Exhibit A-18, # 33 Exhibit A-19, # 34 Exhibit A-20, # 35 Exhibit A-21, # 36 Exhibit A-22, # 37 Exhibit A-23, # 38 Exhibit A-24, # 39 Exhibit A-25, # 40 Exhibit A-26, # 41 Exhibit A-27, # 42 Exhibit A-28, # 43 Exhibit A-29, # 44 Exhibit A-30, # 45 Exhibit A-31, # 46 Exhibit A-32, # 47 Exhibit A-33, # 48 Exhibit A-34, # 49 Exhibit A-35, # 50 Exhibit A-36, # 51 Exhibit A-37, # 52 Exhibit A-38, # 53 Exhibit A-39, # 54 Exhibit A-40, # 55 Exhibit A-41, # 56 Exhibit A-42, # 57 Exhibit A-43, # 58 Exhibit A-44, # 59 Exhibit A-45, # 60 Exhibit A-46, # 61 Exhibit A-47, # 62 Exhibit A-48, # 63 Exhibit A-49, # 64 Exhibit A-50, # 65 Exhibit A-51, # 66 Exhibit A-52, # 67 Exhibit A-53, # 68 Exhibit A-54, # 69 Exhibit A-55, # 70 Exhibit A-56, # 71 Exhibit A-57, # 72 Exhibit A-58, # 73 Exhibit A-59, # 74 Exhibit A-60)(Werner, Thomas)
August 17, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allcock on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Allcock, John)
August 17, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward H Sikorski on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Sikorski, Edward)
August 15, 2012 Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean C Cunningham on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Cunningham, Sean)
August 10, 2012 Filing 140 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin P Gibson on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Gibson, Erin)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Trevor V Stockinger terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/12. (bas)
August 9, 2012 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Guaragna, John)
August 9, 2012 Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Erickson, Brian)
August 9, 2012 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd S Patterson on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Patterson, Todd)
August 9, 2012 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aleine Porterfield on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Porterfield, Aleine)
August 9, 2012 Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Neal Stein on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Stein, Andrew)
August 8, 2012 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Trevor Stockinger by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
August 8, 2012 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Fountain, Aaron)
August 3, 2012 Filing 131 SEALED MOTION to Compel TiVo's Production of Expert Reports and Deposition Transcripts from Other Litigations and Related Interrogatory Responses by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 1st Set of Rogs to TiVo, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Quash, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2/9/12 corres., # 4 Exhibit 4 - Order on Motion to Quash, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 1st Set Rogs to TiVo, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 2nd RFP to TiVo, # 7 Exhibit 7 - TiVo Responses to 1st Set Rogs, # 8 Exhibit 8 - TiVo Suppl Resp., # 9 Exhibit 9 - 4/9/12 corres., # 10 Exhibit 10 - 5/23/12 corres., # 11 Exhibit 11 - 6/25/12 corres., # 12 Exhibit 12 - 7/26/12 corres., # 13 Exhibit 13 - 7/26/12 email, # 14 Exhibit 14 - 7/30/12 email, # 15 Exhibit 15 - 7/30/12 corres., # 16 Exhibit 16 - 2nd RFP to TiVo, # 17 Exhibit 17 - 4/5/12 corres., # 18 Exhibit 18 - 3/20/12 corres., # 19 Exhibit 19 - Statement of Non-Opp., # 20 Exhibit 20 - Order on Motion to Compel, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Fountain, Aaron)
July 22, 2012 Filing 130 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/16/12 Motion Hearing before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2012. (lss, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Sever;. Accordingly, this Court finds that all Cisco-related issues as to its DVR boxes should be adjudicated in one action (the Cisco case - 2:12cv311) while all Motorola-related issues as to its DVR boxes should be adjudicated in this action. Also this order denies 110 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/18/12. (bas)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Discovery due by 2/11/2013. Jury Selection set for 5/6/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 12/25/2012. Claim Construction Hearing on 11/27/12 at 1:30 pm in Marshall, TX. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/12. (bas)
July 17, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Macclain Wells; Fee: $100, receipt number: TXE5-206 (bas)
July 17, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Edward Sikorski; Fee: $100, receipt number: TXE5-199 (bas)
July 16, 2012 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2012 re 110 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 126 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Crawford Maclain Wells for TiVo Inc.. (pkb, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELECONFERENCE MOTION HEARING held on 6/21/12 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carla A. Sims, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 517-5120. (15 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012. (tja, )
July 16, 2012 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice received from Macclain Wells. Check in the amount of $100.00 received. (bas)
July 13, 2012 Filing 124 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable filed by TiVo Inc.. (Lipner, Joseph)
July 12, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Robert Faulkner, filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
July 11, 2012 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 11, 2012 Filing 121 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motorola's Joinder 119 in Motion re 110 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
July 9, 2012 Filing 120 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 110 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lipner, Joseph)
July 9, 2012 Filing 119 Sealed Document. Motorola's Notice of Joinder in Counterclaim Defendants Time Warner Cable Inc.'s and Time Warner Cable LLC's Motion to Sever and Stay TiVo's Claims Against Time Warner Cable (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration)(Erickson, Brian)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Expedite briefing schedule regarding TWC's motion to sever and Tivo's claims against TWC. ORDERED that TIVO file and serve its opposition brief by 11:59 pm on July 9, 2012 and TWC file its reply by 11:59 pm on July 13, 2012 and FURTHER ORDERED that TWC's motion to sever and stay is set for hearing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/5/2012. (sm, )
July 5, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 110 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2012 03:00 PM in Marshall Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (sm, )
July 3, 2012 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite (TWC's Unopposed Motion for Expedited Briefing on TWC's Pending Motion to Sever and Stay TiVo's Claims against TWC) by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:( Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/23/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Jury Selection reset for 5/6/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 12/25/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2013.), DENYING as MOOT 112 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct 53 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/27/2012. (sm, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 114 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward H Sikorski for General Instrument Corporation,Edward H Sikorski for Motorola Mobility, Inc. (PHV FEE Paid). (rml, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct 53 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,, filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
June 26, 2012 Filing 112 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct 53 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 25, 2012 Filing 111 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 88 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Motorolas Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
June 21, 2012 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Telephone Conference held on 6/21/2012. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (bga, )
June 20, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Stay Tivo's Claim Against Time Warner Cable by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 20, 2012 Filing 109 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 89 MOTION to Dismiss Tivo's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
June 15, 2012 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Motorolas Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
June 15, 2012 Filing 107 ***PLEASE IGNORE, PER ATTY, REFILED CORRECTLY AS DOC 108***RESPONSE in Support re 88 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Motorolas Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard) Modified on 6/15/2012 (rml, ). Modified on 6/18/2012 (sm, ).
June 15, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 107, Response. Atty refiled as Reply to response Doc 108 PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
June 12, 2012 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re 89 MOTION to Dismiss Tivo's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
June 8, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Neal Stein on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Stein, Andrew)
June 8, 2012 NOTICE of Telephone Hearing: Telephone Status Conference RESET for 6/21/2012 10:45 AM (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. Contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. The Court's conference telephone number is 903-938-8452.(bga, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 104 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 88 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Motorolas Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - 1/25/95 email, # 3 Exhibit B - Business Plan, # 4 Exhibit C - Notebook excerpt, # 5 Exhibit D - 2/10/98 email, # 6 Exhibit E - 4/11/99 email, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 Filing 103 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Aleine Porterfield for General Instrument Corporation,Aleine Porterfield for General Instrument Corporation,Aleine Porterfield for General Instrument Corporation,Aleine Porterfield for Motorola Mobility, Inc.,Aleine Porterfield for Motorola Mobility, Inc.,Aleine Porterfield for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 PHV RECEIPT 6-8920)(rml, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 102 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Traupman,Edward J DeFranco for Time Warner Cable Inc.,,Matthew A Traupman,Edward J DeFranco for Time Warner Cable LLC.(PHV FEE PAID) (Attachments: # 1 PHV Traupman)(rml, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re 89 MOTION to Dismiss Tivo's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
June 1, 2012 Filing 100 ***DUPLICATE FILING PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 89 MOTION to Dismiss Tivo's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2012 (bas).
June 1, 2012 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc., Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
June 1, 2012 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Instrument Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc., Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility, Inc., Corporate Parent General Instrument Holdings, Inc. for General Instrument Corporation. (Erickson, Brian)
May 31, 2012 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION To Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines Pending Status Conference filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Motion to extend claim construction briefing deadlines pending status conference ORDERING that June 1, 2012 is deadline for parties to file opening briefs on claim constrution. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/31/2012. (sm, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION To Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines Pending Status Conference by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
May 24, 2012 NOTICE of Telephone Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/19/2012 03:30 PM Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for setting up conference call. Contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. The Court's conference telephone number is 903-938-8452.(bga, )
May 22, 2012 Filing 94 RESPONSE to Motion re 91 MOTION for Status Conference filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
May 21, 2012 Filing 93 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 81 SEALED MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Portions of TiVo's Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims filed by TiVo Inc.. (Birnholz, Richard)
May 18, 2012 Filing 92 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Charts, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence, # 3 Exhibit C - TiVo's Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence)(Erickson, Brian)
May 18, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION for Status Conference by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 17, 2012 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Cable Inc., for Time Warner Cable LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
May 17, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Tivo's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 17, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Motorolas Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
May 14, 2012 ***PLEASE IGNORE, DOCUMENT IS NOT DEFICIENT***NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #87 Reply submitted by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. No certificate of authority to seal was included in document. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, ) Modified on 5/14/2012 (sm, ).
May 14, 2012 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 87 Reply to Response to Motion. This entry is not deficient due to it is not sealed so no cert of authority is required. Please ignore the notice of deficiency entered previously by clerk. (sm, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re 81 SEALED MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Portions of TiVo's Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Excerpt from 6/1/11 Conference)(Erickson, Brian) Modified on 5/14/2012 (sm, ). Modified on 5/14/2012 (sm, ).
April 30, 2012 Filing 86 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Declaratory Judgment against TiVo Inc., filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Erickson, Brian)
April 30, 2012 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re 81 SEALED MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Portions of TiVo's Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Birnholz, Richard)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Hon. Judge Rodney Gilstrap for further consideration due to case is related to a previously filed case that is already before Judge Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/18/2012. (sm, )
April 19, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per order. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (sm, )
April 19, 2012 Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case as referral judge, per Judge. (sm, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT of engagement by David Keyzer. (rml, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER REGARDING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/16/2012. (sm, )
April 12, 2012 Filing 81 SEALED MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Portions of TiVo's Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Counterclaims by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 6/1/11 Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B - 1/4/12 Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Microsoft v TiVo docket, # 4 Bincy John Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 9, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Time Warner Cable Inc., to 5/17/2012; Time Warner Cable LLC to 5/17/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
April 6, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Wheeler Creekmore, IV on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Creekmore, Stephen)
April 6, 2012 Filing 79 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC.( Doan, Jennifer)
April 6, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC (Doan, Jennifer)
April 3, 2012 Filing 77 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Babak Redjaian for TiVo Inc.. (PAID FEE on 4/5/2012-Receipt attached) (sm, )
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER APPOINTING David Keyzer as TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/2/2012. (sm, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 75 SUMMONS Issued as to Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC. (Attachments: # 1 summons.Time Warner LLC)(sm, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 74 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 26, 2012 Filing 73 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc.,, Time Warner Cable LLC by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 21, 2012 Filing 72 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Winston Liaw for TiVo Inc. (RECEIPT 2-989) (rml, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 71 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hong Annita Zhong for TiVo Inc. (RECEIPT 2-988)(rml, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard M Birnholz for TiVo Inc. (RECEIPT 2-987)(rml, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Talin Gordnia for TiVo Inc. (RECEIPT 2-986) (rml, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 68 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas Fretty for TiVo Inc. (RECEIPT 2-985)(rml, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph M Lipner for TiVo Inc.,Joseph M Lipner for TiVo Inc.(RECEIPT 2-984). (rml, )
March 20, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. Notice of Asserted Claims (Fountain, Aaron)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MISC ORDER 12-1. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings and referred to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/16/12. (mrm, )
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PROTECTIVE ORDER, GRANTING 63 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/19/2012. (sm, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Proposed Protective Order)(Fountain, Aaron)
March 16, 2012 Filing 62 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Trevor V Stockinger for TiVo Inc. (PHV FEE PAID)(rml, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1(a) (Werner, Thomas)
March 15, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1(a) Disclosures (Erickson, Brian)
March 14, 2012 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa Sedrish Rabbani for TiVo Inc.,Melissa Sedrish Rabbani for TiVo Inc.(RECEIPT 2-972). (rml, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of General Instrument Corporation (Lee, Lance)
February 9, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. Of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Werner, Thomas)
January 30, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. of Subpoena to Grass Valley USA, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Subpoena to Grass Valley))(Yorks, Ben)
January 27, 2012 Filing 56 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas C Werner for TiVo Inc. (PHV RECEIPT 2-697)(rml, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/24/2012. (sm, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2013 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2012., Jury Selection set for 4/2/2013 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Dispositive/Daupert Motions due by 2/12/2013., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2013.), DENYING as moot 46 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/24/2012. (sm, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 4, 2012, Status Conference before The Honorable Caroline M. Craven. Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2012. (Crawford, Libby)
January 19, 2012 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ben J Yorks for TiVo Inc.,Ben J Yorks for TiVo Inc. (RECEIPT 2-882). (rml, )
January 18, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. Alternate Proposed Dates For Docket Control Order (Turner, Ellisen)
January 4, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Elisen Turner; Fee: $100, receipt number: 5-147 (rml, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ellisen S Turner for TiVo Inc. (PHV Fee paid) (rml, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Status Conference held on 1/4/2012. (Court Reporter Lynn Siebel, ECRO.) (lfs, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that parties shall meet and confer regarding issues to be addressed at status conference including scheduling deadlines. Parties shall notify Court of those issues via facsimile on or before 1/4/2012 at 12:00 pm.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/3/2012. (sm, )
January 3, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Erickson, Brian)
January 3, 2012 VERBAL ORDER LIFTING STAY per #34 Order (six month stay) and Magistrate Judge Craven (sm, )
November 30, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 1/4/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (lfs, )
November 18, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 10, 2011, Motion Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2012. (Crawford, Libby)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER overruling 37 Sealed, Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (mrm, )
November 10, 2011 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Hearing held on 11/10/2011. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (mrm, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ( 37 Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Craven's Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay reset for 11/10/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Each side shall have 15 minutes for argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/11. (mrm, )
October 19, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing re: 37 Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Craven's Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay RESET for 11/10/2011 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (mrm, )
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER, (Hearing re 37 Sealed Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge Craven's Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay set for 11/9/2011 02:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom) Each side shall have 15 minutes for argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/14/11. (mrm, )
August 29, 2011 Filing 40 RESPONSE to 37 Sealed Document, SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAVEN'S ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Chambers, Garret)
August 18, 2011 Filing 39 RESPONSE to 38 Response to Non-Motion (Reply In Support of Objections to Magistrate Judge Craven's Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay) by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Erickson Decl., # 2 Exhibit 1 - TiVo Reply ISO Mtn for Leave, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 8/5/11 email, # 4 Exhibit 3 - TiVo's Mtn for Status Conf, # 5 Exhibit 4 - subpoena, # 6 Exhibit 5 - TiVo Infringement Contentions)(Erickson, Brian)
August 8, 2011 Filing 38 RESPONSE to 37 Sealed Document, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge Craven's Order Granting TiVo's Motion to Stay by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, Jay)
July 20, 2011 Filing 37 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Trial Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Infringement Contentions, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Patent, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Transcript of Conference, # 7 Affidavit Fountain Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A - TiVo S-1, # 9 Exhibit B - TiVo 8-k, # 10 Appendix Authorities, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/20/11. (mrm, )
July 19, 2011 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Objection to Magistrate Order by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fountain, Aaron)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Stay cause of action for six months. Stay will automatically be lifted on January 3, 2012 and FURTHER ORDERED a status conference is hereby scheduled to begin at 10:00 am on January 4, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/6/2011. (sm, )
July 6, 2011 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Scheduling Order by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Scheduling Order)(Erickson, Brian)
July 6, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/4/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (sm, )
July 4, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 1, 2011, Rule 16 Management Conference before The Honorable Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven. Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2011. (Crawford, Libby)
June 28, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TiVo Inc. (Chambers, Garret)
June 27, 2011 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Stay filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Chambers, Garret)
June 20, 2011 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Stay filed by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 Excerpt of TiVo's Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 3 Strickland Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wayne Manford Harding terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/20/2011. (sm, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Erickson, Brian)
June 17, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Fountain, Aaron)
June 15, 2011 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Wayne M. Harding by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
June 10, 2011 Filing 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Morgan Chu for TiVo Inc. (Paid $100.00 phv fee - #02-562). (sm, )
June 10, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chambers, Garret)
June 9, 2011 Filing 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jay Chung for TiVo Inc. ($100.00 phv fee paid in Marshall; #02-562). (sm, )
June 1, 2011 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Rule 16 Management Conference held on 6/1/2011. (Court Reporter Lynn Siebel, ECRO.) (lfs, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 21 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrei Iancu for TiVo Inc.. (PHV fee of $100 paid in Marshall DIv - #TXE 2-543) (sm, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua B Gordon for TiVo Inc. (PHV fee paid in Marshall TXE 2-543) (sm, )
May 29, 2011 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Erickson, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
May 16, 2011 NOTICE of RESETTING of Rule 16 Managment Conference to 1:00 on June 1, 2011 before U. S. Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven. All other instructions of original notice of hearing remain the same. (lfs, )
April 20, 2011 Filing 17 ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Erickson, Brian)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The Court issues this Notice of Scheduling Conference and Proposed Deadlinesfor Docket Control Order Containing Discovery Order.Notice of Scheduling ConferencePursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16 and Local Rule CV-16, the Scheduling Conference in this caseis set for Wednesday, June 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m.1 The parties are directed to meet and confer inaccordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) no later than May 3, 2011, twenty-one (21) days before theconference.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on April 19, 2011. (rml, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TiVo Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for TiVo Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 18, 2011 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. by TiVo Inc..(Baxter, Samuel)
March 17, 2011 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TiVo Inc..( Chambers, Garret)
March 17, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TiVo Inc. to 4/18/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Lee, Lance)
March 10, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Filing fees paid by Sean Cunningham, John ALlcock, Eric Gibson; Fee: $100 each (Total $300), receipt numbers: TXE500000031-33 - 3 receipts. (sm, )
March 4, 2011 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Icahn Associates Corp. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
March 4, 2011 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Instrument Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility, Inc. for General Instrument Corporation. (Erickson, Brian)
March 2, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd S Patterson on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Patterson, Todd)
March 1, 2011 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean C Cunningham,Erin P Gibson,John Allcock for General Instrument Corporation,Sean C Cunningham,Erin P Gibson,John Allcock for Motorola Mobility, Inc.(Fees Paid). (Attachments: # 1 PHV Erin Gibson, # 2 PHV John Allcock)(rml, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation. TiVo Inc. served on 2/25/2011 via personal service, answer due 3/18/2011. (sm, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Guaragna, John)
February 25, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne Manford Harding on behalf of General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Harding, Wayne)
February 25, 2011 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2011 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to TiVo Inc.. (sm, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Declaratory Judgment against TiVo Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2905317.), filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., General Instrument Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING 40% OF CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for pretrial matters. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/25/2011. (sm, )
February 25, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge David Folsom. (sm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. et al v. TiVo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: John Allcock
Represented By: Sean C Cunningham
Represented By: Brian K Erickson
Represented By: Erin P Gibson
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Wayne Manford Harding
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Todd S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Instrument Corporation
Represented By: John Allcock
Represented By: Sean C Cunningham
Represented By: Brian K Erickson
Represented By: Erin P Gibson
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Wayne Manford Harding
Represented By: Todd S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TiVo Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Garret Wesley Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TiVo Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: General Instrument Corporation
Represented By: John Allcock
Represented By: Sean C Cunningham
Represented By: Brian K Erickson
Represented By: Erin P Gibson
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Wayne Manford Harding
Represented By: Todd S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: John Allcock
Represented By: Sean C Cunningham
Represented By: Brian K Erickson
Represented By: Erin P Gibson
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Represented By: Wayne Manford Harding
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Todd S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?