Davis v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: Fidel Davis
Defendant: T Evans, Dennis Martin, Jon Braun, FNU Standly and FNU Penny
Case Number: 5:2015cv00138
Filed: July 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Bowie
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims filed by T Evans, Kevin Pinney and ORDERED that Plaintiff's Claims against Warden Pinney are Dismissed Without Prejudice and ORDE RED that Plaintiff's claims against Officer Evans are Dismissed With Prejudice., T Evans (Field Officer at Telford Unit) and Kevin Pinney (Warden at Telford Unit) terminated.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2018. (sm, )
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Denying 36 MOTION to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status filed by T Evans, Kevin Pinney.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/21/2017. (sm, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Ordering that Plaintiffs claim concerning threats directed at him by Captain Martin is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for purposes of proceeding in forma pauperis for failure to state a claim. Dennis Martin (Captain at Telford Unit) now terminated.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/7/2017. (sm, )
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDERED that claims against Defendant Jon Braun is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for purposes of proceeding in forma pauperis as frivolous and for failure to state a claim which relief may be granted. Jon Braun is now terminated.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/20/2016. (sm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Standly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?