Ray v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerremy Ray |
Defendant: |
J Wilson, Lynne Sharp, C Oates, FNU Harris, Kelvin Scott and R Smallie |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00115 |
Filed: |
August 24, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Texarkana Office |
County: |
Bowie |
Presiding Judge: |
Caroline Craven |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert W. Schroeder |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 8, 2019 |
Filing
52
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 50 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED the Plaintiffs claims against the Defendant Captain Studdard are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to effect service of process. It is further ORDER ED the statute of limitations on the Plaintiffs claims against Captain Studdard is SUSPENDED for a period of 120 days following the date of entry of final judgment in this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/8/2019. (slo, )
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
42
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 31 Report and Recommendations. Claims against Lynne Sharp, R Smallie (Grievance Investigator at Telford Unit), J Wilson (Warden at Telford Unit) and Kelvin Scott (TDCJ Regional Director) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Major Harris be SEVERED from this case and TRANSFERRED to the United State District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Wichita Falls Division. In accordance with Local Rule 83, the Clerk of the Court is directed to transmit the severed case after 21 days from the date of the order transferring, if no timely motion for reconsideration has been filed. The dismissals and transfer shall have no effect on Plaintiffs claim of deliberate indifference against Captain Oakes. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/19/2018. (slo, )
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS overruling objections and FURTHER ORDERED that [11[ Motion for injunctive relief is denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/7/2017. (sm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?