Torrey et al v. Infectious Diseases Society of America et al
Plaintiff: Kristine Woodard, Kathryn Kocurek, Lana Barnes, Christopher Valerio, Alarie Bowerman, Lisa Torrey, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Jessica McKinnie, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jane Powell, Carol Fisch, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Rosetta Fuller, Amy Hanneken, Gail Meads, Steven Ward, Randy Sykes, Mike Peacher, Allison Lynn Caruana, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Dr. Michael Fundenberger, Gayle Clarke and John Valerio
Defendant: Dr. Leonard Sigal, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, Anthem Inc, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Dr. John J. Halperin, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Dr. Robert B. Nadelman, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. Allen Steere, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Aetna Inc., and Cigna Corporation
Intervenor Plaintiff: Caitlin McGrory, Amber Boyles and Steve Hepler
Not Classified By Court: Hon. David Folsom (Ret.)
Case Number: 5:2017cv00190
Filed: November 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Bowie
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 285 RESPONSE to Motion re #282 MOTION to Bifurcate Case Schedule filed by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Egdorf, Eugene)
February 19, 2020 Filing 284 RESPONSE in Opposition re #281 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order regarding Plaintiffs' proposed depositions of their designated experts filed by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
February 18, 2020 Filing 283 RESPONSE in Opposition re #277 Opposed MOTION Substitute Independent Medical Examiner re #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, filed by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
February 12, 2020 Filing 282 MOTION to Bifurcate Case Schedule by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 12, 2020 Filing 281 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order regarding Plaintiffs' proposed depositions of their designated experts by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Low, Ronald)
February 11, 2020 Filing 280 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lisa Torrey for proceedings held on 02/05/2020 Scheduling Conference before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Egdorf, Eugene) (Transcript request forwarded to Ed Reed, Court Reporter on 02/12/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER. The Court GRANTS-IN-PART and DENIES-IN-PART Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 192). Plaintiffs fraudulent concealment claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Doctor Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 151) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/10/20. (lfs, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 278 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 02/05/2020 before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ed Reed,Telephone number: 409/330-1605. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 2/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2020. (lfs, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 277 Opposed MOTION Substitute Independent Medical Examiner re #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, by Anthem Inc, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Declaration of Edward L. Goodman, M.D., #2 Ex. 2 - January 22, 2020 Email Regarding Plaintiffs' Objection to Substitution, #3 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER. The Court SETS the following briefing schedules for the motions discussed during the scheduling conference on February 5, 2020. For Defendants Motion to Substitute IME Physician: Defendants Motion is due onFebruary 7, 2020; Plaintiffs Opposition is due on February 18, 2020; and Defendants Reply in support of the Motion is due on February 24, 2020.For Defendants Motion to Bifurcate Discovery and Motion for Protective Order:Defendants Motions are due on February 12, 2020; Plaintiffs Oppositions are due on February 19, 2020, and Defendants Replies in support of the Motions are due on February 26, 2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/05/20. (lfs, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 275 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Aetna Inc., for proceedings held on 2/5/2020 Scheduling Conference before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Roeser, Jeffrey) (Transcript Request forwarded to Ed Reed, Court Reporter on 02/05/20)
February 5, 2020 Filing 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Scheduling Conference held on 2/5/2020. (Court Reporter Ed Reed) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #272 Sealed Amended Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Plaintiffs and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (sued as Cigna Corporation). It is ORDERED that all deadlines between Plaintiffs and Cigna are STAYED for 30 days from the date of this order, pending the parties submission of appropriate dismissal papers. This Order shall not impact the status of or deadlines concerning any other defendant in the case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/04/20. (lfs, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 272 Amended SEALED MOTION Amended Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Cigna Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 (SEALED))(Fee, R.)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #268 Joint Motion to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Plaintiffs and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. It is therefore ORDERED that all deadlines between Plaintiffs and Kaiser are STAYED for 30 days from the date of this Order, pending the parties submission of appropriate dismissal papers. This Order shall not impact the status of or deadlines concerning any other defendant in the case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/04/20. (lfs, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 270 SEALED MOTION Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Cigna Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 (SEALED))(Fee, R.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 269 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Anthem Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ridley, Eileen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 268 Joint SEALED MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Kaiser Permanente, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Sealed Motion to Stay and Notice of Settlement)(Law, Alan)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Sealed Joint Motion Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Plaintiffs and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. It is ORDERED that all deadlines between Plaintiffs and BCBST are STAYED for 30 days from the date of this order, pending the parties submission of appropriate dismissal papers. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/30/2020. (slo, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 266 Joint SEALED MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
January 14, 2020 Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III per Order (Dkt. No. 265). (slo, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Order granting #264 Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Stay of the Case. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the stay of the case shall be extended up through and including February 14, 2020, with the exceptions of: 1) third party document discovery, as ordered in the Courts initial stay of the case, and 2) a scheduling conference to be scheduled, as set forth below. It isfurther ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Joint Report to the Court by January 31, 2020. The Joint Report shall include the parties agreements and/or differences concerning the case schedule, the amount of time necessary to finish discovery and trial timing and length. The Court SETS a scheduling conference for February 5, 2020 at 10 a.m. in Texarkana,Texas to take up the matters addressed in the Joint Report so that a case schedule can be put inplace. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/19. (lfs, ) (lfs, ).
December 16, 2019 Filing 264 Joint MOTION to Extend Stay of the Case and Joint Notice Regarding Case Status by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Extend Stay of the Case.)(Chassman, Peter)
December 16, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 263, Notice. Attorney to refile using correct MOTION event. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (slo, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 262 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom (Ret.). Mediation result: settled (Kaiser Permanente, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 261 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom (Ret.). Mediation result: suspended (Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, Dr. Leonard Sigal, Dr. Allen Steere, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Aetna Inc., Anthem, Inc., Cigna Corporation, United Healthcare Services, Inc. and United Healthcare Group Incorporated.)(Folsom, David)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Stay. It is therefore ORDERED that this matter shall be STAYED up and through December 31, 2019. During the stay period, there will be no litigation activities between the parties,including discovery, but the parties are not restricted from serving and enforcing document subpoenas against non-parties or participating in mediation.On December 16, 2019, the parties shall submit to the Court a Joint Notice regarding the status of this matter and requesting additional relief, either in the form of an extension of the stay or a termination of the stay and the entry of an amended docket control order, which would request a new trial date and associated dates (e.g., close of discovery, motion dates, expert disclosures, etc.). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/12/19. (lfs, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 259 Joint MOTION to Stay by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #256 Stipulation. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Defendants counsel shall continue their meet-and-confer efforts and shall provide the Court with the ordered notice providing the times and dates for theindependent medical examinations by October 2, 2019 unless the matter has been stayed in the interim time period. If a stay has been issued, the parties shall provide the Court with notice of the dates and times of the IMEs within two weeks after the stay has been lifted. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/05/19. (lfs, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/22/19 before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Edward L. Reed,Telephone number: 409-330-1605. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 9/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2019. (lfs, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 256 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATE TO PROVIDE COURT NOTICE OF INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION DATES by Anthem Inc, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #219 Motion to Compel; granting #226 Motion for Protective Order; granting #228 Motion for Protective Order. It isORDERED that the Doctors shall produce their emails from the current work email accounts. It is further ORDERED that the questioning of the IDSA and Aetnas corporate representatives is limited in scope to the timeframe and subject-matter restrictions set forth in the Joint Order (Docket No. 181) and the Courts Order (Docket No. 190). It is further ORDERED that the questioning of the IDSAs corporate representative shall not include the 2019 IDSA Lyme Disease Guidelines.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/29/19. (lfs, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 254 NOTICE by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser Doctor Defendants Third Notice Regarding Employers Email Policies in Opposition to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel (Dunn, Alvin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 253 NOTICE by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser Doctor Defendants Second Notice Regarding Employers Email Policies in Opposition to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel (Dunn, Alvin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser re #248 Notice (Other), Doctor Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority In Opposition To Plaintiffs Emergency Motion To Compel (Low, Ronald)
August 26, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser Defendants' Notice of Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 20190822 Demonstratives for MTC and Protective Order Hearing)(Low, Ronald)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL/SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference reset for 2/4/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Selection reset for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial reset for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2020.), Motions terminated: #247 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #207 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/26/19. (lfs, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 249 RESPONSE to #248 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Response to Doctor Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Lisa Torrey. (Egdorf, Eugene)
August 23, 2019 Filing 248 NOTICE by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser re #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery Doctor Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority In Opposition To Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In re Grand Jury Subpoena, 646 F.2d 963, #2 Exhibit Dotson v. Edmonson)(Low, Ronald)
August 23, 2019 Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #207 Scheduling Order,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Steve Hepler, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 246 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Aetna Inc., for proceedings held on 8/22/2019 Motion Hearing before Judge Schroeder, III. (Roeser, Jeffrey) (Transcript Request forwarded to Ed Reed, Court Reporter on 08/22/19)
August 22, 2019 Filing 245 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2019 re #226 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America and #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Lisa Torrey. (Court Reporter Ed Reed) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, John Valerio, Kristine Woodard re #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery JOINT REPORT ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL (Lee, Lance)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 241 Joint Notice. Joint pleadings require signatures of all parties. Correction should be made by 1 business day. (lfs, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE by Infectious Diseases Society of America re #226 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Notice Regarding IDSA's Motion for Protective Order (Low, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 241 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, John Valerio, Kristine Woodard re #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery JOINT REPORT ON PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL (Lee, Lance) Modified on 8/21/2019 (lfs, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 240 NOTICE by Aetna Inc., re #228 MOTION for Protective Order From Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b) Joint Notice Regarding Aetna Inc.'s Motion for Protection from Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) (Doan, Jennifer)
August 20, 2019 Filing 239 RESPONSE to Motion re #228 MOTION for Protective Order From Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b) filed by Lisa Torrey. (Dutko, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion re #228 MOTION for Protective Order From Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b) filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America. (Low, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 237 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by Infectious Diseases Society of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 236 Motion for leave submitted does not comply with LR CV7(k) Motions for Leave. Correction should be made by 1 business day. (lfs, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 236 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, ATTORNEY WILL REFILE. PLEASE IGNORE.***Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by Infectious Diseases Society of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Plaintiff's response to Motion for PO, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald) Modified on 8/20/2019 (lfs, ).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #232 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Insurance Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/14/19. (lfs, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER. The Court hereby SETS Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel Discovery (Docket No. 219), Defendant Infectious Diseases Society of Americas Motion for Protective Order (Docket No. 226), and Defendant Aetnas Motion for Protection from Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition (Docket No. 228) for a hearing on Thursday, August 22, 2019, at 10 a.m. in Texarkana, Texas.Plaintiffs response to Defendant Aetnas Motion for Protection from Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition (Docket No. 228) shall be due Tuesday, August 20, 2019, at 12 p.m. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Request for Status Conference (Docket No. 229) to be held during the above-set hearing.The parties are reminded of their responsibility to comply with the Courts Standing Order Regarding Meet and Confer Obligations Relating to Discovery Disputes. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/14/19. (lfs, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dutko, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Insurance Defendants' Response to Emergency Motion to Compel by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 PLEASE IGNORE #231. NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 231 Motion for Leave to File submitted. Not filed per LR CV 7(a) and (k). Attorney to refile within 1 business day.(lfs, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 231 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, ATTORNEY WILL HAVE 1 BUSINES DAY TO REFILE. PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Insurance Defendants' Response to Emergency Motion to Compel by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Reply to Insurance Defendants' Response to Emergency Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A)(Dutko, Daniel) Modified on 8/14/2019 (lfs, ).
August 14, 2019 Filing 230 RESPONSE to Motion re #226 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lisa Torrey. (Dutko, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 229 MOTION Request for Status Conference by Lisa Torrey. (Dutko, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 228 MOTION for Protective Order From Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b) by Aetna Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE ATTACHING PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO LR CV 5(A)(10) Document # 227, Motion for Protective Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (lfs, ) Modified on 8/12/2019 (lfs, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 227 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY TO REFILE IN 1 BUSINESS DAY.*** MOTION for Protective Order from Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30 (b) (6) by Aetna Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sheridan, Matthew) Modified on 8/12/2019 (lfs, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 226 MOTION for Protective Order by Infectious Diseases Society of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Deposition Topics, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Objections and Responses)(Low, Ronald)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #223 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is thereforeORDERED that the Insurance Defendants response to Docket No. 219 shall not exceed 15 pages and attachments thereto shall not exceed 32 pages.Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/06/19. (lfs, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery on behalf of the Insurance Defendants filed by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - September 5, 2018 Letter from Plaintiffs, #2 Ex. B - October 5, 2018 Anthem Response, #3 Ex. C - May 10, 2019 Letter from Plaintiffs, #4 Ex. D - June 6, 2019 Anthem Response, #5 Ex. E - July 1, 2019 Email, #6 Ex. F - July 19, 2019 Email, #7 Ex. G - Deposition Excerpts, #8 Ex. H - Declaration - Aetna, #9 Ex. I - Declaration - Anthem, #10 Ex. J - Declaration - Cigna, #11 Ex. K - Declaration - Kaiser, #12 Ex. L - Declaration - United)(Brown, Sara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #13 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in the Insurance Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara)
August 5, 2019 Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re #219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Email, #3 Exhibit B - 5/17/19 letter, #4 Exhibit C - Email, #5 Exhibit D - Email, #6 Exhibit E - Email)(Low, Ronald)
August 2, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Ann Brown on behalf of Anthem Inc (Brown, Sara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 220 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 07/17/19 before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Theresa Sawyer,Telephone number: 479-866-0140. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2019. (lfs, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 219 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery by Lisa Torrey. (Higgins, Ryan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING #216 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs Further Amended Motion to Compel Discovery. It is therefore ORDERED that:1.Plaintiffs shall file a further amended motion to compel discovery on or before July 24, 2019, limiting the issues presented in their prior Amended Motion to Compel Discovery (Docket No. 211) to only those issues that remain in dispute between the parties.2.Defendants shall file their response(s) to Plaintiffs Further Amended Motion on or before August 5, 2019.3.Pursuant to the Courts standing discovery order, no further briefing shall be allowed on Plaintiffs Further Amended Motion absent a request from the parties and order from the Court. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/23/19. (lfs, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Order GRANTING Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Al Barnes,Steven Ward, Gail Meads, Dr. Michael Fundenberger and Max Shindler with Prejudice (Docket No. 215). It is therefore ORDERED that all claims asserted in this lawsuit by Plaintiffs Al Barnes, Steven Ward, Gail Meads, Dr. Michael Fundenberger, and Max Shindler be, and they are hereby DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the parties each bear their respective attorneys fees, costs and expenses incurred in connection with this matter. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/23/19. (lfs, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 216 STIPULATION re #210 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY, #213 Motion Hearing,,, Briefing Schedule on Motion to Compel by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Steve Hepler, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 215 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiffs Al Barnes, Steven Ward, Gail Meads, Dr. Michael Fundenberger, and Max Schindler by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE by Lisa Torrey (Dutko, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2019 re #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Allen Steere, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Leonard Sigal, Gary P. Wormser, #192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - Corrected filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Allen Steere, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Cigna Corporation, Leonard Sigal, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Gary P. Wormser, Robert B. Nadelman, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Anthem Inc, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Aetna Inc. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (SMC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
July 15, 2019 Filing 211 Amended MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 210 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael John Forbes on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Forbes, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER resetting Hearing on Motion #192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - Corrected, #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction :( Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/01/19. (lfs, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 DOCKET CONTROL/SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference reset for 2/4/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Selection reset for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial reset for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2020.), Motions terminated: #205 Joint MOTION to rule on disputed docket control order filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Allen Steere, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Cigna Corporation, Leonard Sigal, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Gary P. Wormser, Robert B. Nadelman, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Anthem Inc, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Aetna Inc.,., ( Pretrial Conference reset for 2/4/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Selection reset for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial reset for 2/24/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 06/26/19. (lfs, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - Corrected, #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/25/2019. (slo, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 205 Joint MOTION to rule on disputed docket control order by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Disputed Docket Control Order)(Low, Ronald)
June 6, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 204, Joint Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE*** (lfs, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 204 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE***Joint MOTION to rule on disputed docket control order by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Amber Boyles, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Steve Hepler, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Caitlin McGrory, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Disputed Docket Control Order)(Low, Ronald) Modified on 6/6/2019 (lfs, ).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #148 MOTION to Continue. The Court RESETS the trial setting in this case for February 2020. The parties are ORDERED to submit, within seven (7) days from the date of this order, a joint proposed docket control order incorporating the following schedule of deadlines:Jury Trial: February 24, 2020 at 9:00 a.m., Jury Selection: February 18, 2020 at 9:00 a.m., Pre-Trial Conference: February 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., Dispositive Motions Deadline: December 10, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/30/19. (lfs, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd on behalf of Cigna Corporation (Floyd, Nicholaus)
May 23, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Mooar Chiaviello on behalf of Cigna Corporation (Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 200 RESPONSE to #199 Notice (Other),, Defendants' Notice Regarding IME Meet-and-Confer filed by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, John Valerio, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dutko, Daniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE by Anthem Inc, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser re #198 Order, #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Declaration of Nina Torten, M.D., #2 Ex. B - Excerpts of Plaintiffs' Expert Designations, #3 Ex. C - March 22, 2019 Email)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. Defendants are ORDERED to file a notice by May 17, 2019 explaining the outcome of the parties meet and confer and identifying the time, place, manner, conditions, and scope of the examination, as well as the person or persons who will perform it. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/10/19. (lfs, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - Corrected filed by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email Communication re Custodians, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2008.05.01 CT AG press release)(Low, Ronald)
April 23, 2019 Filing 196 RESPONSE to Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - Corrected filed by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, John Valerio, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Replead #123 is DENIED-AS-MOOT. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/19. (lfs, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 194 SEALED SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION to #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin,. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Declaration of Robert L. Pinsky, M.D.)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
April 12, 2019 Filing 193 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #178 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Ex. P [Corrected] - Brienna, Reed, #2 Ex. T [Corrected] - Torrey, Lisa, #3 Ex. U [Corrected] - Valerio, Christopher)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
April 10, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint - Corrected by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order on Texas Medical Board Opposed Motion to Quash Subpoena)(Low, Ronald)
April 10, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #191 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint submitted. Exhibit not identified with specificity and proposed order. not attached separately to document. Attorney to refile. Correction should be made by One Business Day. (slo, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 191 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE. MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Low, Ronald) Modified on 4/10/2019 (slo, ).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery (Docket No. 138) is GRANTED-AS-MODIFIED. At the hearing, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to produce all relevant documents with no limit on the timeframe. Docket No. 177 at 102:1216. Accordingly, and to the extent Plaintiffs have not yet produced these documents, Defendants Motion to Compel Deposition Dates and Damages (Docket No. 146) is GRANTED. Prior to the hearing, the Parties indicated they reached agreement on Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Email Production (Docket No. 152). Docket No. 168 at 3. Accordingly, that motion (Docket No. 152) is DENIED-AS-MOOT.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/09/19. (lfs, )
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER. Defendants are ORDERED to filed supplemental briefs under seal explaining, with particularity, why each plaintiffs medical history demonstrates good cause for the requested IME. Where appropriate, Defendants should explain, with particularity, why any prior Lyme disease tests fail to eliminate the need for an IME now, and what additional and otherwise unavailable information the requested IME will provide. Defendants briefs shall not exceed one (1) page and shall be filed by Friday, April 12, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/09/19. (lfs, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Kristine Woodard - Notice of Compliance Regarding Plaintiffs' Supplemental Additional Disclosures and Initial Production (Dutko, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 187 STATUS REPORT - Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Date Discovery Period Should Commence by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dutko, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 186 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser, filed by Michael Fundenberger, Gayle Clarke, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Lisa Torrey, Kathryn Kocurek, Kristine Woodard, Rosetta Fuller, Randy Sykes, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Amy Hanneken, Gail Meads, Chloe Lohmeyer, Carol Fisch, Christopher Valerio, Jessica McKinnie, Alarie Bowerman, Max Shindler, Mike Peacher, Allison Lynn Caruana, Tawnya Dawn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Dutko, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 185 STATUS REPORT - Insurance Defendants' Statement Concerning Discovery Issues by Anthem Inc. (Klinsport, Kimberly)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs and the Insurance Defendants to file separate statements explaining the substantive reasons for their positions on the areas of disagreement (identified in #181 Joint Status Report) by Monday, March 25, 2019. Each statement shall not exceed five pages. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2019. (slo, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties may report their status as ordered during the March 11, 2019 hearing by March 20, 2018. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2019. (slo, )
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #176 MOTION to Withdraw #170 MOTION to Intervene. It is ORDERED that Docket No. 170 is WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to refiling. The Court GRANTS Proposed Plaintiff-Intervenors LEAVE TO REFILE their motion to intervene once they have complied with all relevant Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2019. (slo, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 181 STATUS REPORT Joint Report of the Parties Following March 11, 2019 Motions Hearing by Aetna Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 180 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by Aetna Inc.,. (Sheridan, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 179 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #178 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ((Bowerman, Anais), #2 Exhibit B ((Bowerman, Elise), #3 Exhibit C (Bowerman, Emory), #4 Exhibit D (Caruana, Allison), #5 Exhibit E - Part 1 (Clarke, Gayle), #6 Exhibit E - Part 2 (Clarke, Gayle), #7 Exhibit E - Part 3 (Clarke, Gayle), #8 Exhibit F (Fisch, Carol), #9 Exhibit G - Part 1 (Fuller, Rosetta), #10 Exhibit G - Part 2 (Fuller, Rosetta), #11 Exhibit H - Part 1 (Hanneken, Amy), #12 Exhibit H - Part 2 (Hanneken, Amy), #13 Exhibit H - Part 3 (Hanneken, Amy), #14 Exhibit H - Part 4 (Hanneken, Amy), #15 Exhibit I (Lohmeyer, Chloe), #16 Exhibit J (Meads, Gail), #17 Exhibit K (McKinnie, Jessica), #18 Exhibit L (Moreira, Adriana), #19 Exhibit M (Peacher, Ashley), #20 Exhibit N (Pitre, Monet), #21 Exhibit O (Powell, Jane), #22 Exhibit P (Reed, Brienna), #23 Exhibit Q (Shindler, Max), #24 Exhibit R (Smith, Tawnya), #25 Exhibit S (Sykes, Randy), #26 Exhibit T (Torrey, Lisa), #27 Exhibit U (Valerio, Christopher), #28 Exhibit V (Ward, Steven), #29 Exhibit W (Woodard, Kristine))(Klinsport, Kimberly)
March 18, 2019 Filing 178 RESPONSE to Motion (Supplemental Submission In Support of IME filed by Anthem Inc) re #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, (Klinsport, Kimberly) Modified on 3/19/2019 (slo, ).
March 18, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 03/11/19 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christy Sievert,Telephone number: 469-600-5074. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (lfs, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 176 MOTION to Withdraw #170 MOTION to Intervene by Caitlin McGrory. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gewirtz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2019 Filing 175 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Egdorf, Eugene) (Transcript request forwarded to Christy Sievert, Court Reporter.) (Main Document 175 replaced with flattened image on 3/14/2019) (lfs)
March 13, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser Defendants' Notice of Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 13, 2019 Filing 173 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Aetna Inc., for proceedings held on 3/11/19 Status Conference before Judge Schroeder. (Doan, Jennifer) (Transcript request forwarded to Christy Sievert, Court Reporter)
March 11, 2019 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2019 re #123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations filed by Alarie Bowerman, Michael Fundenberger, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Christopher Valerio, Allison Lynn Caruana, Rosetta Fuller, Gayle Clarke, Gail Meads, Kristine Woodard, Jessica McKinnie, Lana Barnes, Lisa Torrey, Mike Peacher, Randy Sykes, Amy Hanneken, Max Shindler, Carol Fisch, Kathryn Kocurek, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Steven Ward, Chloe Lohmeyer, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, filed by Anthem Inc, #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Gary P. Wormser, Allen Steere, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Leonard Sigal, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, #146 MOTION to Compel Deposition Dates and Damages Computations filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America, Cigna Corporation, Gary P. Wormser, Robert B. Nadelman, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Allen Steere, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Leonard Sigal, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., Anthem Inc, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Aetna Inc.,, #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Alarie Bowerman, Michael Fundenberger, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Christopher Valerio, Allison Lynn Caruana, Rosetta Fuller, Gayle Clarke, Gail Meads, Kristine Woodard, Jessica McKinnie, Lana Barnes, Lisa Torrey, Mike Peacher, Randy Sykes, Amy Hanneken, Max Shindler, Carol Fisch, Kathryn Kocurek, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Steven Ward, Chloe Lohmeyer, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, #148 MOTION to Continue filed by Alarie Bowerman, Michael Fundenberger, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Christopher Valerio, Allison Lynn Caruana, Rosetta Fuller, Gayle Clarke, Gail Meads, Kristine Woodard, Jessica McKinnie, Lana Barnes, Lisa Torrey, Mike Peacher, Randy Sykes, Amy Hanneken, Max Shindler, Carol Fisch, Kathryn Kocurek, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Steven Ward, Chloe Lohmeyer, Adriana Monteiro Moreira. (Court Reporter Christy Sievert) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE by Aetna Inc., re #152 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Email Production - Defendants' Withdrawal of Motion (Sheridan, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 170 *WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to refiling per #182 Order* MOTION to Intervene by Caitlin McGrory, Steve Hepler, Amber Boyles. (Gewirtz, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ). Modified on 3/21/2019 (slo, )
March 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Jeffrey E. Gweirtz; Fee: $100, receipt number: TXE100018098 (aam, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey E. Gewirtz Filing fee $ 100 (aam, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 168 STATUS REPORT OF THE PARTIES IN ADVANCE OF MARCH 11, 2019 MOTIONS HEARING by Aetna Inc.,. (Sheridan, Matthew)
March 4, 2019 Filing 167 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #166 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibit B. (Klinsport, Kimberly)
March 4, 2019 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, filed by Anthem Inc, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Report of Dr. Pinsky, #2 Exhibit B - Medical Records (filed separately under seal), #3 Exhibit C - California Medical Board Accusation)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
March 1, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE by Aetna Inc., Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Designation of Experts and Service of Expert Reports (Sheridan, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Low, Ronald)
February 28, 2019 Filing 163 RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Higgins, Ryan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert C.K. Boyd on behalf of Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7160146. (Boyd, Robert)
February 28, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan F. Law (Law, Alan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motions #123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations, #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin,, #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction, #146 MOTION to Compel Deposition Dates and Damages Computations, #148 MOTION to Continue :( Motion Hearing reset for 3/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the following expedited briefing schedule on Docket No. 154: Plaintiffs responsive brief is due February 28, 2019 before 5 p.m.; Defendants reply brief, if any, is due March 4, 2019 before 5 p.m.; and Plaintiffs sur-reply brief, if any, is due March 8, 2019 before 5 p.m. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/26/19. (lfs, ) Modified on 2/26/2019 (slo, ).
February 22, 2019 Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #152 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Email Production filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 158 RESPONSE to Motion re #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Julia B. Hartley on behalf of Anthem Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7149107. (Hartley, Julia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lucile H. Cohen on behalf of Anthem Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7149100. (Cohen, Lucile)
February 21, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John D. Martin on behalf of Anthem Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7149037. (Martin, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 154 MOTION For Independent Medical Examinations of Those Plaintiffs Who Claim to Have Lyme Disease by Anthem, Inc., The Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, Dr. Leonard Sigal, and Dr. Allen Steere; filed by Anthem Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Appendix of Non-Legal Authorities, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #152 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Email Production, #123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations, #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery, #151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction, #146 MOTION to Compel Deposition Dates and Damages Computations, #148 MOTION to Continue :( Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/11/19. (lfs, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 152 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Email Production by Anthem Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
February 7, 2019 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Low, Ronald)
January 18, 2019 Filing 150 RESPONSE to Motion re #148 MOTION to Continue filed by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Raymond Dutko (Dutko, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION to Continue by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 147 RESPONSE to Motion re #146 MOTION to Compel Deposition Dates and Damages Computations filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION to Compel Deposition Dates and Damages Computations by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
December 14, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Cameron Ginder on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7063362. (Ginder, Cameron)
November 15, 2018 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 15, 2018 Filing 143 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 142, Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (lfs, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 142 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE*** RESPONSE to Motion re #138 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Chassman, Peter) Modified on 11/15/2018 (lfs, ).
November 12, 2018 Filing 141 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. (Chassman, Peter)
November 5, 2018 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion re #123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dutko, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 139 REDACTION to #137 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 1, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 137 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations filed by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Anthem Rog Resp, #2 Exhibit 2 BCBSTX Rog Resp, #3 Exhibit 3 Aetna Rog Resp, #4 Exhibit 4 Cigna Rog Resp, #5 Exhibit 5 Kaiser Rog Resp, #6 Exhibit 6 United Rog Resp, #7 Exhibit 7 BCBSA Rog Resp, #8 Exhibit 8 IDSA Rog Resp, #9 Exhibit 9 Wormser Rog Resp, #10 Exhibit 10 Dattwyler Rog Resp, #11 Exhibit 11 Shapiro Rog Resp, #12 Exhibit 12 Halperin Rog Resp, #13 Exhibit 13 Sigal Rog Resp, #14 Exhibit 14 Steere Rog Resp, #15 Exhibit 15 Anthem Letter, #16 Exhibit 16 Aetna Letter, #17 Exhibit 17 Cigna Letter, #18 Exhibit 18 IDSA Letter, #19 Exhibit 19 Klecka Email, #20 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
October 23, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew James Piehl on behalf of United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6994693. (Piehl, Matthew)
October 23, 2018 Filing 135 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 22, 2018 Filing 134 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthem Inc. (Klinsport, Kimberly)
October 22, 2018 Filing 133 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kaiser Permanente, Inc.. (Law, Alan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 132 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Donnell, Sarah)
October 22, 2018 Filing 131 Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s (Improperly sued as Kaiser Permanente, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Kaiser Permanente, Inc..(Law, Alan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 130 Defendants Infectious Diseases Society of America's and Doctors' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser.(Low, Ronald)
October 22, 2018 Filing 129 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas.(Sheridan, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 128 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 22, 2018 Filing 127 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aetna Inc.,. (Doan, Jennifer)
October 22, 2018 Filing 126 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Aetna Inc.,.(Sheridan, Matthew)
October 22, 2018 Filing 125 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association.(Donnell, Sarah)
October 22, 2018 Filing 124 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Anthem Inc.(Klinsport, Kimberly)
October 22, 2018 Filing 123 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Replead RICO and Fraudulent Concealment Allegations by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
October 22, 2018 Filing 122 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Cigna Corporation.(Fee, R.)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DR. ROBERT B. NADELMAN re: #119 Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant DR. ROBERT B. NADELMAN, filed by Alarie Bowerman, Michael Fundenberger, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Christopher Valerio, Allison Lynn Caruana, Rosetta Fuller, Gayle Clarke, Gail Meads, Kristine Woodard, Jessica McKinnie, Lana Barnes, Lisa Torrey, Mike Peacher, Randy Sykes, Amy Hanneken, Max Shindler, Carol Fisch, Kathryn Kocurek, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Steven Ward, Chloe Lohmeyer, Adriana Monteiro Moreira. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/18. (lfs, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #117 Stipulation of Schedule for Conducting Jurisdictional Discovery, filed by Alarie Bowerman, Michael Fundenberger, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Christopher Valerio, Allison Lynn Caruana, Rosetta Fuller, Gayle Clarke, Gail Meads, Kristine Woodard, Jessica McKinnie, Lana Barnes, Lisa Torrey, Mike Peacher, Randy Sykes, Amy Hanneken, Max Shindler, Carol Fisch, Kathryn Kocurek, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Steven Ward, Chloe Lohmeyer, Adriana Monteiro Moreira. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/18. (lfs, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO ONLY DEFENDANT DR. ROBERT B. NADELMAN by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard (Dutko, Daniel) Modified on 10/12/2018 (lfs, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Extension of Deadline. It is ORDERED that Defendants have up to and including 10/22/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint, to the extent any such response is required. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/11/2018. (slo, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 117 STIPULATION Schedule for Conducting Jurisdictional Discovery by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dutko, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 1, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Gerald Sheridan on behalf of Aetna Inc., (Sheridan, Matthew)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion to Dismiss; denying #38 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/27/18. (lfs, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AGREED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE LOGGING. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/8/2018. (slo, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 112 Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Order Regarding E-Discovery and Privilege Logging by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 16, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES (Jones, Michael)
July 13, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE by Anthem Inc of Service of Additional Disclosures (Klinsport, Kimberly)
July 13, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association of Compliance Regarding Additional Disclosures (Donnell, Sarah)
July 13, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser Notice of Compliance (Low, Ronald)
July 13, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE by Kaiser Permanente, Inc. Compliance serving Additional Disclosures (Law, Alan)
July 13, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cigna Corporation Notice of Compliance Regarding Additional Disclosures (Fee, R.)
July 13, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE by Aetna Inc., Notice of Compliance (Doan, Jennifer)
July 13, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Notice of Compliance (Sheridan, William)
July 11, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard Additional Disclosures and Initial Production (Dutko, Daniel)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL/SCHEDULING ORDER:, re: #101 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #82 Scheduling Order regarding designation of rebuttal expert witnesses filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Allen Steere, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Cigna Corporation, Leonard Sigal, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Gary P. Wormser, Robert B. Nadelman, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Anthem Inc, John J. Halperin, Eugene Shapiro, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Aetna Inc.,.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/9/2018. (sm, )
June 29, 2018 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #82 Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Motions,, by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 29, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Jones, Michael)
June 28, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE by Infectious Diseases Society of America Notice of Compliance by Defendants Infectious Diseases Society of America, Dr. Gary P. Wormser, Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler, Dr. Eugene Shapiro, Dr. John J. Halperin, Dr. Leonard Sigal, Dr. Allen Steere, and Estate of Dr. Robert B. Nadelman (Low, Ronald)
June 28, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard Initial Disclosures (Dutko, Daniel)
June 28, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE by Anthem Inc Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Klinsport, Kimberly)
June 28, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Notice of Compliance (Sheridan, William)
June 28, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE by Kaiser Permanente, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Law, Alan)
June 28, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association Notice of Compliance (Donnell, Sarah)
June 28, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE by Cigna Corporation Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Axelrod, Crystal)
June 28, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE by Aetna Inc., Notice of Compliance (Doan, Jennifer)
June 12, 2018 Filing 91 Joint NOTICE Regarding a Mediator by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser (Doan, Jennifer)
May 30, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser Defendants' Notice of Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 22, 2018 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2018 re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants filed by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Aetna Inc.,, #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America, Allen Steere, Raymond J. Dattwyler, Leonard Sigal, Gary P. Wormser, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, John J. Halperin. (Court Reporter Karen Tyler) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
May 15, 2018 Filing 88 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief (Doc 1353-1) filed in MDL No. 2406 IN RE: Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation Master File 2:13-CV-20000, #2 Exhibit The Blue Cross and Blue Shield System's Commitment to Fighting Opiod Use Disorder)(Egdorf, Eugene)
May 15, 2018 Filing 87 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Order re: Hope Alison McIntyre, MD)(Egdorf, Eugene)
May 15, 2018 Filing 86 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IDSA Guidelines)(Egdorf, Eugene)
May 15, 2018 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the documents #83-#85, Sur- Replies, submitted by Plaintiff. Exhibits were not identified with specificity per local rules. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 85 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Egdorf, Eugene) Modified on 5/15/2018 (sm, ).
May 15, 2018 Filing 84 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Egdorf, Eugene) Modified on 5/15/2018 (sm, ).
May 15, 2018 Filing 83 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Egdorf, Eugene) Modified on 5/15/2018 (sm, ).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DOCKET CONTROL/SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Discovery due by 3/19/2019., Jury Selection set for 6/17/2019 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial set for 6/24/2019 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2019.), Terminating #79 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Docket Control Order and #68 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Docket Control Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/11/2018. (sm, )
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER re #67 Motion for Discovery. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/11/2018. (sm, )
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/11/2018. (sm, )
May 10, 2018 Filing 79 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Docket Control Order by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 10, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin F. Holt on behalf of United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6772374. (Holt, Benjamin)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/2/2018. (sm, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Low, Ronald)
May 1, 2018 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Donnell, Sarah)
May 1, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTORNEY MUST REFILE. Document # 71, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants filed by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Klinsport, Kimberly)
May 1, 2018 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Reply Briefs by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
May 1, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held 4/19/2018 before the Honorable Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. (sms, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 71 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Low, Ronald) Modified on 5/1/2018 (sm, ).
May 1, 2018 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions #38 MOTION to Dismiss, #40 MOTION to Dismiss , #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2018 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/1/2018. (sm, )
April 30, 2018 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Docket Control Order by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
April 30, 2018 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by Lisa Torrey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
April 30, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Brunsting Hartle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartle, James)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying as Moot #52 Motion for entry of disputed docket control order; #53 Motion to Amend/Correct; #54 Motion for entry of disputed docket control order and parties are ORDERED to resubmit, within seven (7) days from the date of this order, a joint proposed docket control and discovery order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/23/2018. (sm, ) Modified on 4/23/2018 (sm, ).
April 20, 2018 Filing 64 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. for proceedings held on 04/19/18 (Scheduling Conference) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Boyce, Maria)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual, #40 MOTION to Dismiss , #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants Replies due by 5/1/2018 and Sur-Replies up to and including May 15, 2018.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/19/2018. (sm, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Scheduling Conference held on 4/19/2018. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
April 18, 2018 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 17, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants Plaintiff's Response to Insurance Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egdorf, Eugene)
April 17, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egdorf, Eugene)
April 17, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Motion to Amend Docket Control Order Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Amend Docket Control Order filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egdorf, Eugene)
April 17, 2018 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Motion to Dimiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egdorf, Eugene)
April 17, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Wyckoff Boyce on behalf of United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Boyce, Maria)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that Plaintiff's are to respond to #53 Defendant's MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order no later than 3:00 pm on April 17, 2018. The scheduling conference remains scheduled on April 19, 2018. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/12/2018. (sm, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Discovery Order by Plaintiffs and Defendants by Anthem Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Disputed Proposed Discovery Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
April 12, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
April 12, 2018 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Entry of Disputed Docket Control Order by Plaintiffs and Defendants by Anthem Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Disputed Proposed Docket Control Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
April 9, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Thames, Earl)
April 4, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Randall Roeser on behalf of Aetna Inc., (Roeser, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Aetna Inc., (Doan, Jennifer)
April 3, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alvin Dunn on behalf of Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6724439. (Dunn, Alvin)
March 22, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alan F. Law on behalf of Kaiser Permanente, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6710869. (Law, Alan)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Setting a Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2018 01:45 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/22/2018. (sm, )
March 2, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Raymond Dutko on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dutko, Daniel)
February 27, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Kees Higgins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Higgins, Ryan)
February 26, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Lana Barnes, Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Michael Fundenberger, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Gail Meads, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Max Shindler, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, Christopher Valerio, Steven Ward, Kristine Woodard (Lee, Lance)
February 16, 2018 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Boyce, Maria)
February 16, 2018 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America (Low, Ronald)
February 16, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 39 submitted by Casey Low. No Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by 1 business day. (lfs, )
February 16, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Robert B. Nadelman, Eugene Shapiro, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, Gary P. Wormser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christopher D. Busky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Gary P. Wormser, M.D., #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Raymond J. Dattwyler, M.D., #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Eugene Shapiro, M.D., #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of John J. Halperin, M.D., #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Robert B. Nadelman, M.D., #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Leonard Sigal, M.D., #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Allen C. Steere, M.D., #9 Exhibit I - Press Release, #10 Exhibit J - Final Report of Review Panel, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
February 16, 2018 Filing 39 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE, PLEASE IGNORE***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Infectious Diseases Society of America (Low, Ronald) Modified on 2/16/2018 (lfs, ).
February 16, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Individual by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Donnell, Sarah)
February 16, 2018 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Insurance Defendants by Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Klinsport, Kimberly)
February 16, 2018 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aetna Inc., (Austin, Earl)
February 15, 2018 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Permanente, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Permanente, Inc. for Kaiser Permanente, Inc.. (Davis, Derek)
February 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 15, 2018 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association (Donnell, Sarah)
February 15, 2018 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthem Inc (Hetherington, Thomas)
February 15, 2018 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cigna Corporation (Fee, R.)
February 15, 2018 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Chassman, Peter)
February 13, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Benjamin Lawrence on behalf of Aetna Inc., (Lawrence, John)
February 13, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl B Austin on behalf of Aetna Inc., (Austin, Earl)
January 11, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Ann Klinsport on behalf of Anthem Inc (Klinsport, Kimberly)
January 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eileen Regina Ridley on behalf of Anthem Inc (Ridley, Eileen)
January 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Tuteur on behalf of Anthem Inc (Tuteur, Michael)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Complaint to February 16, 2018; granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and submit two omnibus responsive briefs of no more than 40 pages in length. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/8/2018. (sm, )
January 5, 2018 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Briefing on Plaintiffs' Original Complaint to Coordinate Defendants' Response Deadlines, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Briefing by Defendants by Anthem Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hetherington, Thomas)
January 5, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Hetherington on behalf of Anthem Inc (Hetherington, Thomas)
January 5, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas to 1/22/2018. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 5, 2018 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas.( Chassman, Peter)
December 11, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to R. Brendan Fee on behalf of Cigna Corporation (Fee, R.)
December 11, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Amy M. Dudash on behalf of Cigna Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6582924. (Dudash, Amy)
December 11, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by R. Brendan Fee on behalf of Cigna Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6582578. (Fee, R.)
December 8, 2017 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for United Healthcare Group Incorporated to 1/11/2018; United Healthcare Services, Inc. to 1/11/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 8, 2017 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kaiser Permanente, Inc. to 1/10/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 8, 2017 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Healthcare Group Incorporated.(Thompson, Blayne)
December 8, 2017 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Healthcare Services, Inc.(Thompson, Blayne)
December 8, 2017 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cigna Corporation to 1/10/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 8, 2017 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association to 1/10/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 8, 2017 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kaiser Permanente, Inc..( Davis, Derek)
December 8, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek Shane Davis on behalf of Kaiser Permanente, Inc. (Davis, Derek)
December 8, 2017 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cigna Corporation.( Axelrod, Crystal)
December 8, 2017 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association.( Donnell, Sarah)
December 8, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sarah J. Donnell on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6581431. (Donnell, Sarah)
December 8, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel E. Laytin on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6581423. (Laytin, Daniel)
December 8, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Crystal Rose Axelrod on behalf of Cigna Corporation (Axelrod, Crystal)
December 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by William Sheridan on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6574586. (Sheridan, William)
December 4, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Debra H. Dermody on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6574570. (Dermody, Debra)
December 4, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lee, Lance)
November 29, 2017 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas to 1/8/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 29, 2017 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas.(Chassman, Peter)
November 29, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter John Chassman on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Chassman, Peter)
November 29, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin James Bishop on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Bishop, Martin)
November 13, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Aetna Inc.,, Anthem Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Cigna Corporation, Raymond J. Dattwyler, John J. Halperin, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Kaiser Permanente, Inc., Robert B. Nadelman, Leonard Sigal, Allen Steere, United Healthcare Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Gary P. Wormser and given to plaintiff attorney for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons.Dr.Nadelman, #2 Summons.Dr.Shapiro, #3 Summons.Dr.Sigal, #4 Summons.Dr.Steere, #5 Summons.InfectiousDiseasesSociety, #6 Summons.KaiserPermanente, #7 Summons.USHealthcareGroupInc., #8 Summons.UnitedHealthcareServices, #9 Summons.Dr.Wormser, #10 Summons.AetnaInc., #11 Summons.AnthemInc., #12 Summons.BlueCrossBlueShieldofTexas, #13 Summons.BlueCrossBlueShieldAssoc, #14 Summons.CignaCorp, #15 Summons.Dr.Dattwyler)(sm, )
November 13, 2017 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (sm, )
November 13, 2017 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (sm, )
November 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6548225.), filed by Michael Fundenberger, Gayle Clarke, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Lisa Torrey, Kathryn Kocurek, Kristine Woodard, Rosetta Fuller, Randy Sykes, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Amy Hanneken, Steven Ward, Gail Meads, Chloe Lohmeyer, Carol Fisch, Christopher Valerio, Jessica McKinnie, Alarie Bowerman, Max Shindler, Mike Peacher, Allison Lynn Caruana, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Lana Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Egdorf, Eugene) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/5/2018) (sm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrey et al v. Infectious Diseases Society of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Woodard
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kocurek
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Barnes
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Valerio
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alarie Bowerman
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Torrey
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawnya Dawn Smith
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McKinnie
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chloe Lohmeyer
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Powell
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Fisch
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brienna Reed
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Shindler
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Fuller
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hanneken
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Meads
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ward
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Sykes
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Peacher
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Lynn Caruana
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Monteiro Moreira
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Michael Fundenberger
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Clarke
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Valerio
Represented By: Eugene Roger Egdorf
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Represented By: Ryan Kees Higgins
Represented By: James Brunsting Hartle
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Leonard Sigal
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin F. Holt
Represented By: Matthew James Piehl
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Blayne R Thompson
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infectious Diseases Society of America
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gary P. Wormser
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Group Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin F. Holt
Represented By: Matthew James Piehl
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Blayne R Thompson
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Inc
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Lucile H. Cohen
Represented By: Michael James Tuteur
Represented By: John D. Martin
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Represented By: Thomas Hetherington
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Klinsport
Represented By: Sara Ann Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Raymond J. Dattwyler
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Martin James Bishop
Represented By: William Sheridan
Represented By: Debra H. Dermody
Represented By: Michael John Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John J. Halperin
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Alan F. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert B. Nadelman
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Eugene Shapiro
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Allen Steere
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Robert C.K. Boyd
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Represented By: Alvin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Represented By: Sarah J. Donnell
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Cameron Ginder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc.,
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Sheridan
Represented By: Earl B Austin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Represented By: Amy M. Dudash
Represented By: R. Brendan Fee
Represented By: Peter John Chassman
Represented By: Crystal Rose Axelrod
Represented By: Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd
Represented By: Elizabeth Mooar Chiaviello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Caitlin McGrory
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Amber Boyles
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Steve Hepler
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hon. David Folsom (Ret.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?