Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Mi Casita Social Club, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Blanca E. Garcia, Sandra R. Ramirez, Mi Casita Social Club, Inc. and Agustin Valle
Case Number: 5:2018cv00098
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sandra R. Ramirez.(Phillips, Jonathan)
August 30, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (sm, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #14***MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Mi Casita Social Club, Inc. (sm, ) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sm, ).
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Blanca E. Garcia. (sm, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Blanca E. Garcia. (sm, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan L A Phillips on behalf of Sandra R. Ramirez. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6920653. (Phillips, Jonathan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Mi Casita Social Club, Inc. served on 8/11/2018, answer due 9/3/2018. (King, Jamie)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Blanca E. Garcia served on 8/11/2018, answer due 9/3/2018. (King, Jamie)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Sandra R. Ramirez served on 8/11/2018, answer due 9/3/2018. (King, Jamie)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff is to file a notice that a case is ready for a scheduling conference when all defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/2/2018. (sm, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Blanca E. Garcia, Mi Casita Social Club, Inc., Sandra R. Ramirez, Agustin Valle and given to plaintiff attorney for service (Attachments: #1 Summons.Garcia, #2 Summons.Ramirez, #3 Summons.Valle)(sm, )
August 1, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (sm, )
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REFERRAL ORDER RS 72-1 REFERRING 40% OF CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/28/2015. (sm, )
July 31, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (sm, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6878502.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Mi Casita Social Club, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca E. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra R. Ramirez
Represented By: Jonathan L A Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Casita Social Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?