McRae v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Travis McRae
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2018cv00125
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis McRae. Nancy A Berryhill served on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Giles, Gregory)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and given to Plaintiff's attorney for service (Attachments: #1 Summons-Attorney General, #2 Summons-US Attorney)(slo, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.The Clerk of the Court shall issue and Plaintiffs attorney shall serve process without prepayment of costs or fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/1/2018. (slo, )
September 28, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING SOCIAL SECURITY CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/28/2018. (slo, )
September 28, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis McRae. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Gregory)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill, filed by Travis McRae. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis McRae
Represented By: Gregory Ross Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?