Halbert v. BRP US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hailey Halbert
Defendant: BRP Inc., BRP US Inc. and Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00155
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/7/2019. (slo, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Hailey Halbert (Kirk, Dana)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Original Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. d/b/a BRP Inc. (Leonard, James) Modified on 1/24/2019 (slo, ).
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Bombardier Recreational Products Inc., filed by Hailey Halbert.(Kirk, Dana)
January 14, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BRP US Inc. to 1/24/2019. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BRP US Inc..( Holt, Michael)
January 14, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY. Document # 8, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney to refile. *** (slo, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE. Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BRP US Inc..( Holt, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2019 (slo, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael R. Holt on behalf of BRP Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7091205. (Holt, Michael)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Scott M Sarason on behalf of BRP Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7091177. (Sarason, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BRP US Inc. to 1/14/2019. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BRP US Inc..( Leonard, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Kelly Leonard on behalf of BRP US Inc. (Leonard, James)
January 4, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY. Document # 3, Stipulation. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney to enter Notice of Appearance and file Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer.*** (slo, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE. STIPULATION UNOPPOSED STIPULATION EXTENDING ANSWER DATE by BRP US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of proposed Order)(Leonard, James) Modified on 1/4/2019 (slo, ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to BRP US Inc. (slo, )
December 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hailey Halbert. (slo, )
December 10, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
December 10, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Hailey Halbert against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7054761.), filed by Hailey Halbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es))(Kirk, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halbert v. BRP US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Holt
Represented By: James Kelly Leonard
Represented By: Scott M Sarason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Holt
Represented By: James Kelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Represented By: James Kelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Halbert
Represented By: Dana Gareth Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?