Williams v. Texarkana Independent School District
Plaintiff: Amena Williams
Defendant: Texarkana Independent School District
Case Number: 5:2019cv00062
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Amena Williams on 5/23/2019 as to #3 Order (slo, )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Docket Entry # 2) is GRANTED. It is furtherORDERED that to the extent Plaintiff desires to proceed with this case on behalf of her minor son, she must retain legal counsel to represent and protect her sons interests. Plaintiff is advised that if counsel has not entered an appearance on behalf of the minor child within thirty (30)days from the date of this order, the Court will recommend the claims on behalf of her son bedismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall be withheld pending appearance of counsel. Finally, it isORDERED that Plaintiffs failure to obtain counsel may result in a recommendation of dismissal of the claims filed by Plaintiff on behalf of her minor son without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 05/16/19. (lfs, ) (Mailed to Amena Williams via USPS Certified Mail #7002 2410 0003 5613 6884 on 05/16/19)
May 10, 2019 Pro Se Guidelines, which includes instructions to notify Court of change of address, provided to Plaintiff. (slo, )
May 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING PRO SE CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/10/2019. (slo, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amena Williams. (slo, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Texarkana Independent School District filed by Amena Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Texarkana Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amena Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texarkana Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?