Hart v. Travelers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Donell Hart
Defendant: Travelers, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00073
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Donell Hart on 7/18/2019 as to #5 Report and Recommendations. (slo, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Donell Hart.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/9/2019. (slo, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Donell Hart on 6/19/2019 as to #3 Order to file more detailed pleading (slo, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the entry of this order in which to file a more detailed pleading. It is further ORDERED Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 is stayed until such time as the Court determines whether it has jurisdiction over this cause of action. It is further ORDERED that failure by Plaintiff to file an amended complaint which complies with this Order within fourteen days from the receipt of this Order may lead to a recommendation that this lawsuit be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute or to obey any Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2019. (slo, )
June 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING PRO SE CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/11/2019. (slo, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donell Hart. (slo, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers, Inc. filed by Donell Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Travelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donell Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?