Graham v. Navistar Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Graham
Defendant: Navistar International Corporation and Navistar Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00083
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/8/2019. (slo, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brenda Graham (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Akerly, Bruce)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/2019. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Navistar Inc, Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Navistar International Corporation)(slo, )
June 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REFERRING 40% of CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/26/2019. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brenda Graham. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7325217.), filed by Brenda Graham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(Akerly, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Navistar Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Graham
Represented By: Bruce William Akerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?