Hart v. Maxwell

Plaintiff: Donell Hart
Defendant: Jeffrey Maxwell
Case Number: 5:2019cv00087
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 INITIAL Partial Filing fee paid per court order: $ 100, receipt number TXE600048692. (ksd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Maxwell due to Defendant Maxwell no longer lives at address listed. Current address unknown by Defendant's father. (slo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeffrey Maxwell and forwarded to USM for service (slo, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue and the United States Marshal shall serve process without cost to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/12/2019. (slo, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Donell Hart on 7/18/2019 as to #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (slo, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting in part #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that Donell Harts Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is hereby GRANTED IN PART. It is further ORDERED that within thirty days from the date of entry of this Order, Hart shall pay the Clerk of the Court a partial filing fee of $100.00. It is further ORDERED that failure to comply with this Order may result in a recommendation the above-entitled and numbered cause of action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/9/2019. (slo, )
June 28, 2019 PRO SE Guidelines provided to Plaintiff which include instructions to notify Court of address change (slo, )
June 28, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING PRO SE CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/28/2019. (slo, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donell Hart. (slo, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Maxwell filed by Donell Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accident Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(slo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donell Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?