UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Robert Clayton Strayhan, Jason Neil Hughes and Aimee Monette Hughes
Case Number: 5:2019cv00092
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/29/2019. (slo, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/29/19. (lfs, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wells, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aimee Monette Hughes, Jason Neil Hughes (Hughes, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wells, Robert)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Robert Clayton Strayhan Notice of Initial Disclosures (Rommel, Sean)
August 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Clayton Strayhan.(Rommel, Sean)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #16 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Defendant ChangePoint Counseling Services, PLLC ("ChangePoint"). The Court, having considered the notice, is of the opinion that the allegations against ChangePoint should be DISMISSED. It is therefore ORDERED that any and all claims for relief against Defendant ChangePoint are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/06/19. (lfs, )
August 6, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Robert Clayton Strayhan to 8/20/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( lfs, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Robert Clayton Strayhan.( Rommel, Sean)
August 6, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE WITHIN 1 BUSINESS DAY. 1ST APPLICATION CANNOT EXCEED 30 DAYS EXTENSION*** Document # 17, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (lfs, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 ***PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY TO REFILE WITHIN 1 BUSINESS DAY. Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Robert Clayton Strayhan.( Rommel, Sean) Modified on 8/6/2019 (lfs, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Dismissal of Defendant ChangePoint Counseling Services, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Jason and Aimee Hughes ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Jason Neil Hughes.(Hughes, Eric)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/01/19. (lfs, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion to Amend Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 10) and ENTERS this Amended Temporary Restraining Order and VACATES the previous Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 8). It is further ORDERED that service of a copy of this Amended Order be made upon whichever financial institution was served the original Temporary Restraining Order issued on July 12, 2019 (Docket No. 8). It is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order entered by the Court on July 12, 2019 (Docket No. 8) is VACATED and the preliminary injunction hearing set for July 22, 2019 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings within the time allowed from service. Following the Defendants filing of responsive pleadings, the parties shall proceed with expedited discovery under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1345(b). It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than August 21, 2019 to advise the Court of the necessity, if any, of a hearing on the United States request for preliminary injunction or the Defendants responsive motions to the Complaint, if any. Accordingly, this Order shall expire on August 22, 2019, unless extended by order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/22/19. (lfs, ) (lfs, ).
July 22, 2019 Status Conference held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III on 7/22/2019. Counsel in attendance were Robert Wells, Eric Hughes, and Sean Rommel. Upon oral motion from the government to unseal the case, the Court granted such motion and the case is now unsealed. (Court Reporter Cindy Donald) (bas)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Before the Court is the parties Joint Motion to Amend Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 10). In light of this filing, the Court hereby CANCELS the hearing on the Governments request for a Preliminary Injunction, which was set for Monday, July 22, 2019 at 2 p.m. in Texarkana, TX. Instead, the Court SETS a telephonic conference for the same date and time in order to discuss the instant Joint Motion to Amend Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 10). The parties are instructed call chambers once counsel for all parties are on the line. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/19/19. (lfs, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION to AMEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Aimee Monette Hughes, Jason Neil Hughes, Robert Clayton Strayhan, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lfs, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric G. Hughes for Aimee Monette Hughes, Jason Neil Hughes. Filing fee $ 100 paid (RECEIPT # TXE 100018924). (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.), Motions terminated: Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/12/19. (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint and all documents related to the request for injunctive relief. It hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that theMotion to Seal the Complaint and all documents related to the request forinjunctive relief, including this motion (Docket No. 1) and Order, besealed until personal service has been perfected.Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/12/19. (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Aimee Monette Hughes. (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Jason Neil Hughes. (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Clayton Strayhan. (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lfs, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal the Complaint and all documents related to Request for Injunctive Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lfs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Clayton Strayhan
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Neil Hughes
Represented By: Eric G. Hughes
Represented By: Eric Glen Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Monette Hughes
Represented By: Eric G. Hughes
Represented By: Eric Glen Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert Austin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?