Glover v. Warden Geter/FCI Texarkana
Petitioner: Calvin Glover
Respondent: Warden Geter/FCI Texarkana
Case Number: 5:2019cv00110
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #8 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by AUSA on 10/15/19. (lfs, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Calvin Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(slo, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR***Summons Issued as to Warden Geter/FCI Texarkana, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lfs, ) Modified on 10/10/2019 (lfs, ).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process and the respondent shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service of process to answer the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and show cause why relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/08/19. (lfs, ) (Mailed order and petition to US Attorney with acknowledgement card.)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER withdrawing #5 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/08/19. (lfs, )
October 4, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5, receipt number 6-49426 (gsg)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COURT re: New Document in support of Petitioner's Request for Stay or Expedition of Court Decision by Calvin Glover (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -USPC Notice of Action, #2 Envelope(s))(slo, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Withdrawn per #7 Order) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Glover.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 09/16/19. (lfs, ) Modified on 10/8/2019 (lfs, ).
August 22, 2019 PRO SE GUIDELINES which contains instructions to notify court of any address change, CONSENT TO PROCEED, DOCKET SHEET, and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY forwarded to Petitioner. (slo, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus submitted by Calvin Glover. The pleading was not signed by Petitioner. Correction should be made and pleading returned to Clerk by 9/9/2019. (slo, )
August 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING HABEAS CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/22/2019. (slo, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with account balance sheet attached by Calvin Glover. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(slo, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Calvin Glover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-18, #2 Envelope(s))(slo, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/9/2019-Signed Petition replaced per #3 Notice of Deficiency) (slo, ). Modified on 9/9/2019 (slo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Warden Geter/FCI Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Geter/FCI Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Calvin Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?