Conrod v. Warden, Texarkana FCI
Petitioner: Ivory L. Conrod
Respondent: J. Baltazar
Case Number: 5:2020cv00092
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Sent Consent to Magistrate, Docket sheet and Prose guidelines, that include information regarding reporting change of address to court, to the Petitioner per Magistrate Judge (slo, )
June 2, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING HABEAS CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/2/2020. (slo, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00609. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 20, 2020 Receipt 4644087480 in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS on behalf of IVORY L. CONROD (CCAM) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk from Ivory Conrod re:filing fee (JAB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Mon May 18 11:27:48 CDT 2020 (Stamm, Katie) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. ( Case to be transferred after 6/1/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 5/18/20. (KKS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed May 6 08:33:54 CDT 2020 (Stamm, Katie) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (KKS) (KKS). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 5, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue May 5 16:01:22 CDT 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 5, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Petitioner Ivory L. Conrod. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Judge Assignment Label, #3 Envelope)(DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrod v. Warden, Texarkana FCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivory L. Conrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Baltazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?