Ahrens v. City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas
Plaintiff: Michael Ahrens
Defendant: City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas
Case Number: 5:2020cv00126
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Ahrens. City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Hommel, William)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. The notice must include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of any related cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 07/27/20. (lfs, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas. (lfs, )
July 23, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (lfs, )
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/23/20. (lfs, )
July 23, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7907661.), filed by Michael Ahrens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahrens v. City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ahrens
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mt. Pleasant, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?