Stephens v. The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity et al
Plaintiff: Clint Stephens
Defendant: The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity, The Afiya Center and Texas Equal Access Fund
Case Number: 5:2020cv00138
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Hartson Dustin Fillmore, III (Fillmore, Hartson)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OConnor Order)(Ecklund, Jennifer)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Clint Stephens. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Ecklund, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is therefore ORDERED that if the Court denies the plaintiffs motion to remand, then the plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss within 14 days of that order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 08/25/20. (lfs, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Clint Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Clint Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hartson Dustin Fillmore, III on behalf of Clint Stephens (Fillmore, Hartson)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity Notice of Related Cases (Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. In the interest of efficient management of its docket, the Court ORDERS the parties to replead as necessary to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Courts Local Rules. Plaintiffs amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Defendants amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendants answer shall be extended to the date set by this order. The Court also directs the parties attention to Local Rule CV-7. While the parties should be familiar with all the Federal and Local Court Rules, the Court points to this rule specifically as it renders moot all motions urged prior to removal. Accordingly, the Court will only consider. In the event that Plaintiff files a timely motion for remand, the deadlines set forth in this order are suspended pending resolution of the motion. If the Court denies the motion to remand, Plaintiffs amended complaint will be due 30 days from the date the order is signed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 08/17/20. (lfs, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REFERRAL ORDER RS-72-2 REFERRING 40% of CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/14/2020. (slo, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity filed by Clint Stephens. (* Filed in 62nd Judicial District Court of Franklin County, Texas; Cause No. 12678 *) (slo, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Bryan Hughes on behalf of Clint Stephens (Hughes, D.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F Mitchell on behalf of Clint Stephens (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
August 14, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity (Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity Certificate of Interested Parties (Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 State Court Records Filed by Texas Equal Access Fund, The Afiya Center, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity Index of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Original Petition, #2 Exhibit State Court Citations)(Ecklund, Jennifer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Afiya Center, Texas Equal Access Fund, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity from 62nd District Court, Franklin County, Texas, case number 12678. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7946097), filed by The Afiya Center, Texas Equal Access Fund, The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Index of Documents, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Citations)(Ecklund, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lilith Fund for Reproductive Equity
Represented By: Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Afiya Center
Represented By: Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Equal Access Fund
Represented By: Jennifer Rudenick Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Stephens
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: Hartson Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: D. Bryan Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?