Sorsby et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gary Sorsby and Karen Sorsby
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Barry Bryant
Case Number: 5:2021cv00114
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Bryant. It is ORDERED that the parties shall mediate before the Honorable Barry A. Bryant. It is further ORDERED that such mediation shall be completed on or before February 25, 2022. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/23/2021. (slo, )
November 23, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Mediator Judge Bryant (slo, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Agreed by Plaintiffs and Defendant. (Pedigo, Ashley)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/2/2021. (slo, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #8 Amended MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order (Joint Motion by Plaintiffs and filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2022. Discovery due by 6/15/2022. Motions in Limine due by 8/25/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2022. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/2/2021. (slo, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The scheduling conference set on 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/2/2021. (slo, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order (Joint Motion by Plaintiffs and by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pedigo, Ashley)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pedigo, Ashley) Modified on 11/1/2021 (slo, ).
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Brenna Pedigo on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Pedigo, Ashley)
November 1, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Correction regarding the #7 Joint Motion submitted no attorney signature. Document has been refiled. See #8 Amended Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order.(slo, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Robert Mercy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mercy, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. This case is set for a scheduling conference on 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/8/21. (hma)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (Filed in County Court at Law, Bowie County, Texas; Cause No. 21C1078-CCL, entered now for docketing purposed only)(slo, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company filed by Karen Sorsby, Gary Sorsby. (Filed in County Court at Law, Bowie County, Texas; Cause No. 21C1078-CCL, entered now for docketing purposed only(slo, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from County Court of Bowie County, Texas, case number 21C1078-CCL. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8605789), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet - Case Summary Sheet, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Cover Letter and Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit B-2 - Citation and Return Receipt for Allstate Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit B-3 - Defendant's Original Answer and Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #6 Exhibit C - Parties to the Case, #7 Exhibit D - List of Counsel, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higgins, Roger)
September 30, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
September 30, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorsby et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Sorsby
Represented By: Errol N Friedman
Represented By: John Robert Mercy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sorsby
Represented By: Errol N Friedman
Represented By: John Robert Mercy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Dale Higgins
Represented By: Ashley Brenna Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Barry Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?