Kirkendoll v. Warden
Petitioner: Bobby B. Kirkendoll
Respondent: FCI Texarkana Warden
Case Number: 5:2023cv00142
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Boone Baxter
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-66251 (jbe, 6)
December 11, 2023 Filing 2 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Bobby B. Kirkendoll.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(psm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (request for statutory interpretation) filed by Bobby B. Kirkendoll. (Filing fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(slo) Modified on 1/5/2024 to reflect filing fee status (jbe, 6).
November 30, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING HABEAS CASES to Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/30/2023. (slo)
November 30, 2023 Sent Consent to Magistrate, Docket sheet and Prose guidelines, that include information regarding reporting change of address to court, to the Petitioner per Magistrate Judge (slo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkendoll v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby B. Kirkendoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Texarkana Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?