AdvanceMe Inc v. RapidPay LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff AdvanceMe Inc. alleges that defendant RapidPay LLC infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,941,281 entitled "Automated Payment." The patent covers systems and methods of automated loan repayment.

Plaintiff: AdvanceMe Inc
Defendant: Capital Business Corporation, Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash, Merchant Money Tree, Inc. and Reach Financial, LLC
Counter Claimant: Reach Financial, LLC and Merchant Money Tree, Inc.
Counter Defendant: AdvanceMe Inc
Case Number: 6:2005cv00424
Filed: November 9, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Received 5 CDs of Trial Exhibits per 360 Order: 3 CDs of sealed exhibits; 2 CDs of unsealed exhibits. (mll, ) (mll, ).
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting 359 Motion to Seal Identified Trial Exhibits. The Court orders AdvanceMe Inc to submit to the Clerk a disk containing all the unsealed exhibits and a disk containing all of the sealed exhibits by noon on 4-16-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/12/10. cc:attys 4-12-10 (mll, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemieux, Ronald)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 358 U S Court of Appeals Federal Circuit Order issuing the mandate of the court on 6/5/08 of costs inthe amount of $145.44 were finally determined and taxed in this matter. Signed by Jan Horbaly, Clerk on 6/13/08. (djh, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to 344 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Reach Financial, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., 343 Notice of Appeal filed by AdvanceMe Inc. AFFIRMED. (Circuit Judges Newman, Plager, and Schall). Issued as Mandate 6-5-08. (mll, )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit Judgment that the Court affirmed the judgment or decision that was appealed. None of the relief sought in the appeal was granted. No opinion accompanied the judgment. The mandate will issue in due course. (djh, )
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 344 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Reach Financial, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., dismissing the appeal on agreement of the parties. Issued as mandate 1/24/2008. (mjc ) Modified on 3/5/2008 (mjc ).
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 343 Notice of Appeal filed by AdvanceMe Inc,, 344 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc.,, Reach Financial, LLC,. USCA Case Number 2008-1036 (djh, )
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Delivery confirmation by Federal Express of delivering 343 Notice of Appeal,and 344 Notice of Cross Appeal to the U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 10/10/07 (djh, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Resending 343 Notice of Appeal and 344 Notice of Cross Appeal to Federal Circuit via Federal Express (Fed Circ. never rcvd them)(djh, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Bench Trial Exhibits (7.16.07 - 7.20.07) placed in the Clerk's Office (Tyler Division) for storage. Defendant's Exhibit 431 (Sealed) placed in the Vault. (rlf, )
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Exhibit List: Defendant's Final Exhibit List of Exhibit Admitted at Bench Trial 7.16.2007 - 7.20.2007. (rlf, )
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Exhibit List: Plaintiff's Final Exhibit List of Exhibit Admitted at Bench Trial 7.16.2007 - 7.20.2007. (rlf, )
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 349 BILL OF COSTS by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. Costs Taxed against Plaintiff in the amount of $34,042.37. (mjc)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting 345 Motion for Entry of Agreed Bill of Costs filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. Clerk of Court is instructed to enter the Bill of Costs agreed to by the parties and attached to the Motion as Exhibit 5. Costs in the amount of $34,042.37 are taxed against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/29/07. (mjc )
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 347 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AdvanceMe Inc re 343 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 9/28/2007. (Edelman, Michael)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Notice of mailed Cross Notice of Appeal to the U S Federal Circuit Court of Appeals with certified documents(djh, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 345 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutliff, Graham)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 182 Memorandum & Opinion, Order, 341 Memorandum & Opinion,, Order,, 342 Judgment by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1244534. (Schuurman, Willem)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Certified Docket Sheet and certified documents appealed sent to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (djh, )
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 341 Memorandum & Opinion,, Order,, 342 Judgment by AdvanceMe Inc. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1229310. (Race, Deborah)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 342 FINAL JUDGMENT that Plaintiff AdvanceMe, Inc., take nothing against Defendants. Further ordered that Defendants recover costs from Plaintiff. All relief not granted in this judgment is denied . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/14/07. (mjc )
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding the '281 patent is invalid as anticipated and obvious. AdvanceMe takes nothing from Reach and MMT, and Reach and MMT are entitled to their costs as the prevailing parties. The Court will issue a final judgment in accordance with these findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/14/07. (mjc )
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Judge John D. Love no longer assigned to case. (mjc )
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER re 24 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, vacating the referral as the case has now been tried to the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/9/07. (mjc )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bench Trial held on 7/20/07 P.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bnech Trial held on 7/20/07 A.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bench Trial held on 7/19/07 P.M. session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bench Trial held on 7/19/07 A.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bench Trial held on 7/18/07 P.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bench Trial held on 7/18/07 A.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Bench Trial held on 7/17/07 P.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/17/07 A.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/16/07 P.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/16/07 A. M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting.
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER that the trial brief be stricken. re 326 Trial Brief, filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/25/07. (fnt, )
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Bench Trial (DAY 5) held & completed on 7/20/2007. (Court Reporter Terese Casterline & Jana Bald [Sunbelt Reporting]) (rlf)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Bench Trial (DAY 4) held on 7/19/2007. Trial to resume on 7/20/2007 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Terese Casterline & Jana Bald [Sunbelt Reporting]) (rlf, )
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 326 STRICKEN BY COURT ORDERTRIAL BRIEF in Support of Corroborating Evidence by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Errata C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Sutliff, Graham) Modified on 7/25/2007 (fnt, ).
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying [] ORAL Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law at this time. Court to carry it along through trial. FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/18/2007. (rlf, )
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC made in open Court by Mr. McSwane. (rlf)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Bench Trial (DAY 3) held on 7/18/2007. Trial to resume on 7/19/2007 approximately at 10:30 am. (Court Reporter Therese Casterline & Jana Bald [Sunbelt Reporting]) (rlf)
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Bench Trial (DAY 2) held on 7/17/2007. Trial to resume at 9:00 am on 7/18/2007. (Court Reporters Therese Casterline & Jana Bald [Sunbelt Reporting]) (rlf ) Modified on 7/18/2007 to correct appearance of Counsel Sanders (rlf).
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Bench Trial (DAY 1) held on 7/16/2007. Trial to resume at 9:00 am on 7/17/2007. (Court Reporters: Therese Casterline & Jana Bald [Sunbelt Reporting].) (rlf) Modified on 7/18/2007 to correct appearance of Counsel Sanders (rlf).
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting 319 Motion to Withdraw 319 MOTION to Withdraw 318 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Tom Burnside . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/16/07. (mjc )
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6-27-07 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason.. (rem, )
July 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash (Lemieux, Ronald)
July 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MOTION to Withdraw 318 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Tom Burnside by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 322 *** MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Tom Burnside by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deborah Race# 2 Exhibit 1 to Dec of D Race# 3 Exhibit 2 to Dec of D Race# 4 Exhibit 3 to Dec of D Race# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) Modified on 7/16/2007 (mjc ).
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/9/07 before Judge John Love. Court Reporter: Sunbelt Reporting. (lss, )
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 316 The COURT ORDER the parties to provide the Court with each side's previously filed Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in Word Perfect format before trial begins. The Court would encourage the parties to carefully review their proposed findings so that they are succinct, to the point, not boilerplate, and helpful to the Court. Finally, the parties are ORDERED to individually contact the Mediator in this case immediately upon receipt of this order and explore all final options at resolving this case with a business resolution, rather than the unpredictable results which may result from trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/12/07. (fnt, )
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC Submission Regarding the Time Needed for Trial (McSwane, Douglas)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Plaintiff's Submission Regarding the Time Needed for Trial (Race, Deborah)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/9/2007. (Court Reporter Therese Casterline.) (mjm, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER dismissing 264 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Supplement Discovery Based on Newly Discovered Evidence. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/9/07. (mjc )
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 262 Sealed Motion for Sanctions or Alternative Relief. It is ordered that Defendant First Funds is severed from 6:05cv424 and added as a defendant in 6:06cv82; AdvanceMe is granted leave of court to amend its complaint in 6:06cv82 to add a claim against First Funds; First Funds shall produce to AdvanceMe all relevant documents in the two cases; AdvanceMe may obtain additional discovery against First Funds and third parties; AdvanceMe is permitted to supplement its infringement contentions and expert reports after follow-up discovery; parties are to assess deadlines for additional discovery outlined in this Order and submit an amended Docket Control Order by 8/1/07. All additional relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/2/07. (mjc )
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Corrected Trial Exhibit List (Matz, Robert)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List (Gray, Joseph)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2007 re 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds filed by AdvanceMe Inc, 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC, First Funds, LLC. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, )
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of Objections to Plaintiff's Counter Designations and Offers of Optional Completeness (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Gray, Joseph)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc regarding AdvanceMe's Objections to Defendants' Deposition Counter-Designations (Bhakar, Vid)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting 302 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendant's Sur-Reply to Motion for Sanctions. Defendants may submit a Sur-Reply of 12 pages . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/26/07. (mjc)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Williams, Shanee)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds filed by First Funds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38# 2 Exhibit 39# 3 Exhibit 40# 4 Exhibit 41# 5 Exhibit 42# 6 Exhibit 43# 7 Exhibit 44)(Gray, Joseph)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Sur-Reply by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 298 Notice (Other).. (Gray, Joseph)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Objections to Defendants' Affirmative Deposition Designations (Bhakar, Vid)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Rebuttal Designations of Deposition Testimony (Bhakar, Vid)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC re 286 Proposed Pretrial Order,, of Defendants' Objections, Counter-Designations, and Offers of Optional Completeness (Gray, Joseph)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 286 Proposed Pretrial Order,,.. (Gray, Joseph)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 286 Proposed Pretrial Order,,.. (Gray, Joseph)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting 292 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/19/07. (fnt, )
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED REPLY to in Support of [D.E. 262] SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of R. Matz#, Exhibit 65#, Exhibit 66#, Exhibit 67#, Exhibit 68#, Exhibit 69#, Exhibit 70#, Exhibit 71#, Exhibit 72#, Exhibit 73#, Exhibit 74#, Exhibit 75#, Exhibit #76(Matz, Robert)
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY to Response to Motion re 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Floyd Walker in Support# 2 Exhibit A)(Walker, R.)
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Robert)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 291 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Vincent Fazio, III for AdvanceMe Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-10068. Approved 6/15/07. (mjc )
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting 288 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery, 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds. Replies due by 6/18/2007. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/14/07. (mjc )
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Sealed Document - Plaintiff AdvanceMe, Inc.'s Amended Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Lemieux, Ronald)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery, 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs for Docket Entries 262 and 264)(Matz, Robert)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Sealed Document. (Matz, Robert)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Proposed Pretrial Order by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (AdvanceMe, Inc.'s Trial Witness List)# 2 Exhibit B to Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (AdvanceMe, Inc.'s Deposition Designations)# 3 Exhibit C to Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (Defendants' Trial Witness List)# 4 Exhibit D to Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (Defendants' Affirmative Deposition Designations)# 5 Exhibit E to Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (AdvanceMe, Inc.'s Exhibit List)# 6 Exhibit F to Joint Final Pre-Trial Order (Defendants' Exhibit List))(Bhakar, Vid) (SEE DOC 297 FOR ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS) Modified on 6/20/2007 (rvw, ).
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Proposed Findings of Fact by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Gray, Joseph)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery, 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2007 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mjc)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 283 Motion to Continue hearing on motions 262 and 264 from 6/22/07 to 6/27/07 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/12/07. (mjc )
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Joint MOTION to Continue June 22, 2007 Hearing (Dkt. No. 282) by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery, 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds: Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2007 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 280 Motion to Amend 201 Docket Control Order. Deadline for Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructins, Form of the Verdict, Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law with citation to authority for bench trials set for 6/12/2007.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/8/2007. (rvw, )
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 275 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Brief may not exceed 30 pages . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/7/07. (mjc )
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 278 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds filed by First Funds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37)(Gray, Joseph)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 276 Response in Opposition to Motion, 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1# 2 Exhibit Ex. 2# 3 Exhibit Ex. 3# 4 Exhibit Ex. 4# 5 Exhibit Ex. 5# 6 Exhibit Ex. 6# 7 Exhibit Ex. 7# 8 Exhibit Ex. 8# 9 Exhibit Ex. 9.1# 10 Exhibit Ex. 9.2# 11 Exhibit Ex. 10.1# 12 Exhibit Ex. 10.2# 13 Exhibit Ex. 10.3# 14 Exhibit Ex. 11)(Williams, Shanee)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 276 RESPONSE in Opposition re 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery Based On Newly Discovered Evidence filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Shanee)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, R.)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting 273 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 273 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Regarding Motion for Sanctions. Responses due by 6/6/2007. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/5/07. (mjc )
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Regarding Motion for Sanctions by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, R.)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury instructions due by 6/8/2007. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2007. (mjc )
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 271 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of the Verdict and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are due 6/8/07. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/1/07. (mjc )
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION and 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC, First Funds, LLC. Having considered the parties' written submissions and having heard argument of counsel on 5-22-07, the Court has determined it appropriate to carry these motions until trial on 7-16-07. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 05/25/07. cc:attys 5-25-07(mll, )
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC Of Request for Daily Transcript (Gray, Joseph)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Bhakar, Vid)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines (per 267 Order): Notice of Request for Daily Transcript or Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings due 5-25-07; Jury instructions due by 6/1/2007; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2007; Pretrial Disclosures due 6-12-07; Video and Stenographic Deposition Designations due 6-12-07; Rebuttal Designations and Objections to Deposition Testimony due 6-19-07; Objections to Rebuttal Deposition Testimony due 6-26-07; Pretrial Objections due 6-28-07. (mll, )
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 265 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 05/25/07. cc:attys 5-25-07 (mll, )
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 201 Scheduling Order, by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, R.)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2007 re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC,, First Funds, LLC, 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC, First Funds, LLC. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, )
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Supplement Discovery by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, R.)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Litle)(McSwane, Douglas)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions or Alternative Relief Against Defendant First Funds by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of S. Ellovich ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 2 Affidavit Declaration of D. Poon ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 3 Affidavit Declaration of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 4 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 5 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 6 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 7 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 8 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 9 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 10 Exhibit 7 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 11 Exhibit 8 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 12 Exhibit 9 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 13 Exhibit 10 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 14 Exhibit 11 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 15 Exhibit 12 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 16 Exhibit 13 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 17 Exhibit 14 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 18 Exhibit 15 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 19 Exhibit 16 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 20 Exhibit 17 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 21 Exhibit 18 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 22 Exhibit 19 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 23 Exhibit 20 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 24 Exhibit 21 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 25 Exhibit 22 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 26 Exhibit 23 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 27 Exhibit 24 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 28 Exhibit 25 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 29 Exhibit 26 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 30 Exhibit 27 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 31 Exhibit 28 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 32 Exhibit 29 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 33 Exhibit 30 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 34 Exhibit 31 - Part I to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 35 Exhibit 31 - Part II to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 36 Exhibit 31 - Part III to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 37 Exhibit 31 - Part IV to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 38 Exhibit 31 - Part V to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 39 Exhibit 31 - Part VI to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 40 Exhibit 32 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 41 Exhibit 33 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 42 Exhibit 34 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 43 Exhibit 35 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 44 Exhibit 36 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 45 Exhibit 37 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 46 Exhibit 38 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 47 Exhibit 39 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 48 Exhibit 40 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 49 Exhibit 41 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 50 Exhibit 42 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 51 Exhibit 43 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 52 Exhibit 44 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 53 Exhibit 45 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 54 Exhibit 46 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 55 Exhibit 47 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 56 Exhibit 48 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 57 Exhibit 49 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 58 Exhibit 50 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 59 Exhibit 51 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 60 Exhibit 52 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 61 Exhibit 53 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 62 Exhibit 54 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 63 Exhibit 55 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 64 Exhibit 56 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 65 Exhibit 57 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 66 Exhibit 58 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 67 Exhibit 59 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 68 Exhibit 60 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 69 Exhibit 61 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 70 Exhibit 62 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 71 Exhibit 63 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 72 Exhibit 64 to Decl. of R. Matz ISO AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions# 73 Text of Proposed Order Granting AdvanceMe's Motion for Sanctions)(Matz, Robert)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 259 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/17/07. (mjc )
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 257 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Sealed Motion for Sanctions . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/17/07. (mjc)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages AdvanceMe's surreply to defendants' 2nd motion for partial summary judgment.pdf by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting AdvMe's unopposed mtn. to file its surreply to defs.' 2nd partial summary judgment mtn. in excess of page limit.pdf)(Edelman, Michael)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Edelman, Michael)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Sealed Sanctions Motion by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting AdvanceMe, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Sealed Sanctions Motion in Excess of Page Limits)(Matz, Robert)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting 254 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief. Brief is limited to 21 pages . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/10/07. (mjc )
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U# 2 Exhibit V# 3 Exhibit W# 4 Exhibit X# 5 Exhibit Y# 6 Exhibit Z# 7 Exhibit AA)(Gray, Joseph)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Gray, Joseph)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Matthew Rowan on behalf of First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC (Rowan, James)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 247 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/3/07. (mjc )
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER denying 244 Expedited Motion for Hearing. The Court will hold a single hearing on both of Defendants' partial summary judgment motions, 215 and 232 , on 5/22/07 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/3/07. (mjc )
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 249 RESPONSE in Opposition re 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION AdvanceMe's Objections to Defendants' Evidence ISO Their Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Proposed Order filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Edelman, Michael)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of M. Edelman ISO Advanceme's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 4 Exhibit C to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 5 Exhibit D to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 6 Exhibit E to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 7 Exhibit F to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 8 Exhibit G to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 9 Exhibit H to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 10 Exhibit I to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 11 Exhibit J to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 12 Exhibit K to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 13 Exhibit L to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 14 Exhibit M to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 15 Exhibit N to Decl. of M. Edelman ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 16 Affidavit Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 17 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 18 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 19 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 20 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 21 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 22 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 23 Exhibit 7 to Decl. of M. Shamos ISO AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment# 24 Appendix A to AdvanceMe's opposition to defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment)(Edelman, Michael)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity in Excess of Page Limit by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity in Excess of Page Limit)(Williams, Shanee)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Sur-reply to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Evidence and Arguments filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Gray, Joseph)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 246 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daisy S Poon for AdvanceMe Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-9552. Approved 4/27/07 (mjc )
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION for Hearing re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order Setting Hearing# 3 Text of Proposed Order Setting Briefing Schedule)(Gray, Joseph)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Graham Eugene Sutliff on behalf of First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC (Sutliff, Graham)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 241 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 241 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity. Responses due by 5/2/2007. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/24/07. (mjc )
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Oppose Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity)(Edelman, Michael)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 240 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gisu S Sadaghiani for AdvanceMe Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-9495. Approved 4/20/07 (mjc )
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 239 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION AdvanceMe's Reply to Defendants' Response to Objections to Defendants' Evidence and Arguments ISO their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Edelman, Michael)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 238 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Edelman, Michael)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Edelman, Michael)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 233 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/16/07. (mjc )
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Y# 2 Exhibit Z# 3 Exhibit AA# 4 Exhibit BB# 5 Exhibit CC)(Gray, Joseph)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence and Argument in Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G)(Gray, Joseph)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Reply in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Defendants' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R# 20 Exhibit S# 21 Exhibit T)(Gray, Joseph)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 230 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/5/07. (mjc )
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as to Third-Party Northern Leasing Systems by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to plaintiff's unopposed motion to obtain docs and take deposition of NLS past cut-off date# 2 Exhibit B to plaintiff's unopposed motion to obtain docs and take deposition of NLS past cut-off date# 3 Exhibit C to plaintiff's unopposed motion to obtain docs and take deposition of NLS past cut-off date# 4 Text of Proposed Order Regarding plaintiff's unopposed motion to obtain docs and take deposition of NLS past cut-off date)(Matz, Robert)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 226 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F to Errata to Declaration of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit G to Errata to Declaration of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 3 Exhibit H to Errata to Declaration of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 4 Exhibit I to Errata to Declaration of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 5 Exhibit R to Errata to Declaration of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 6 Exhibit V to Errata to Declaration of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Matz, Robert)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Matz, Robert)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION AdvanceMe's Objections to Defendants' Evidence and Arguments in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Matz, Robert) Modified on 4/4/2007 (rvw, ).
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 2 Affidavit of Michael N. Edelman in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 3 Exhibit A to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 4 Exhibit B to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 5 Exhibit C to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 6 Exhibit D to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 7 Exhibit E to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 8 Exhibit F to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 9 Exhibit G to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 10 Exhibit H to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 11 Exhibit I to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 12 Exhibit J (Part One) to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 13 Exhibit J (Part Two) to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 14 Exhibit K to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 15 Exhibit L to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 16 Exhibit M to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 17 Exhibit N to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 18 Exhibit O to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 19 Exhibit P to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 20 Exhibit Q to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 21 Exhibit R to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 22 Exhibit S to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 23 Exhibit T (Part One) to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 24 Exhibit T (Part Two) to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 25 Exhibit U to Michael N. Edelman's Affidavit# 26 Affidavit of Michael I. Shamos in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 27 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Michael I. Shamos in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 28 Exhibit 2 of the Affidavit of Michael I. Shamos in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 29 Affidavit of Edward J. Hogan in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# 30 Exhibit 1 to the Affidavit of Edward J. Hogan in Support of AdvanceMe's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Matz, Robert)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc of Rebuttal Expert Reports (Matz, Robert)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC Pursuant to Local Rule CV-26(c) (Gray, Joseph)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 220 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re Opposition to defts' partial summary judgment motion of patent invalidity. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 04/02/07. cc:attys 4-2-07 (mll, )
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc Regarding AdvanceMe's Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Matz, Robert)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of their Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Gray, Joseph)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Opposition to Defendants' Partial Summary Judgment Motion by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Robert)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of their Trial Witnesses (Walker, R.)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc of its Trial Witnesses (Matz, Robert)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 216 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Designations, now due 4/2/07; Discovery Deadline for Expert Witnesses, now 4/11/07; and Dispositive Motions Due, now by 4/13/07. Briefing schedule for motion for partial summary judgment is also amended. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/23/07. (mjc )
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports, Take Expert Depositions, File Dispositive Motions, and File Opposition, Reply, and Sur-reply re Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports, Take Expert Depositions, File Dispositive Motions, and File Opposition, Reply, and Sur-reply re Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Matz, Robert)
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SEALED PATENT MOTION - Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W# 24 Exhibit X# 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 213 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defts may submit a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity of 32 pages, excluding attachments. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 03/12/07. cc:attys 3-12-07 (mll, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 212 "FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE, MOTION TO BE REFILED" MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: ? # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph) Modified on 3/9/2007 (rvw, ).
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc of the Report of Plaintiff's Expert, Michael I. Shamos, Ph.D, J.D., Concerning Infringement (Matz, Robert)
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 208 Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/7/07. (mjc )
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc AdvanceMe, Inc.'s Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Williams, Shanee)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 206 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeff Sanders for AdvanceMe Inc and Capital Business Corporation, Jeff Sanders for Capital Business Corporation and Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash. Fee paid, receipt 6-1-8766. Approved 2/16/07. (mjc)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER denying 203 Motion to Compel, denying 204 Motion for Protective Order, and instructing parties to seek relief from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia if they cannot seek favorable resolution on their own . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/6/07. (mjc )
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order re Scheduling of Deposition of John Konop by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ronald Lemieux in Support of Emergency Motion# 2 Affidavit of Michael Edelman in Support of Emergency Motion# 3 Affidavit of Vidya Bhakar in Support of Emergency Motion# 4 Affidavit of Robert Matz in Support of Emergency Motion# 5 Exhibit 1 to Matz Affadavit in Support of Emergency Motion# 6 Exhibit 2 to Matz Declaration in Support of Emergency Motion# 7 Exhibit 3 to Matz Affadavit in Support of Emergency Motion# 8 Exhibit 4 to Matz Affadavit in Support of Emergency Motion# 9 Exhibit 5 to Matz Declaration in Support of Emergency Motion# 10 Text of Proposed Order Granting AdvanceMe's Emergency Motion for a Protective Order)(Matz, Robert)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Emergency MOTION to Compel by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph Gray# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Willem Schuurman# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
January 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER re 189 MOTION for Reconsideration re 182 Memorandum & Opinion, Order (Corrected Defendants' Statement of Objections to and Motion for Modification of Magistrate Judge Love's Markman Memorandum Opinion and Order) filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC, First Funds, LLC, overruling Defendants objections and adopting the Memorandum Opinion and Order of the United States Magistrate Judge 182 at the Opinion and Order of this Court . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/29/07. (mjc )
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 7/16/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mjc )
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2007 09:00 AM before Judge John Love in Tyler. Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2007. Identify trial witnesses by 3/23/2007. Jury instructions due by 5/25/2007. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2007. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/26/07. (mjc )
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 197 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Modification of Judge Love's Markman Opinion . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/25/07. (mjc )
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 189 Motion for Reconsideration re 189 MOTION for Reconsideration re 182 Memorandum & Opinion, Order (Corrected Defendants' Statement of Objections to and Motion for Modification of Magistrate Judge Love's Markman Memorandum Opinion and Order) filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC, First Funds, LLC, . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/25/07. (mjc )
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Continue by AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Modification of Magistrate Judge Love's Markman Memorandum Opinion and Order by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Text of Opposition Exceeding Page Limits# 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Opposition in Excess of Page Limits)(Matz, Robert)
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying as moot 194 Motion to Quash . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/19/07. (mjc )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 195 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 194 Emergency MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas of C. Hardwick and J. Konop, or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 11)(Matz, Robert)
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Emergency MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoenas of C. Hardwick and J. Konop, or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas of C. Hardwick and J. Konop, or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order)(Matz, Robert)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond Floyd Walker on behalf of First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC (Walker, Raymond)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Disclosure by Reach Financial, LLC (Notice of Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures) (Gray, Joseph)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Disclosure by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (Notice of Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures) (Gray, Joseph)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC (Notice of Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures) (Gray, Joseph)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Reconsideration re 182 Memorandum & Opinion, Order (Corrected Defendants' Statement of Objections to and Motion for Modification of Magistrate Judge Love's Markman Memorandum Opinion and Order) by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 187 Motion for Reconsideration submitted by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. Lacks Certificate of Conference. See LR-CV-7. Attorney to refile Motion.(rvw, )
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 187 "DEFICIENT DOCUMENT-LACKS CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE" MOTION for Reconsideration re 182 Memorandum & Opinion, Order (Statement of Objections and Motion for Modification of Magistrate Judge Love's Markman Memorandum Opinion and Order) by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph) Modified on 1/10/2007 (rvw, ).
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC (Buss, Brian)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 12/21/06 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. (70 pages) (mjc)
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All parties shall designate expert witnesses by 1-29-07; Parties may designate rebuttal expert witnesses by 2-8-07; Discovery deadline reset for 3-5-07. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 01/05/07. cc:attys 1-5-07 (mll, )
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion to Amend Docket Control Order) by AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Compel, ORDERS Plaintiff to supplements its answer as per the Court?s instruction by January 12, 2007. denying 145 Sealed Patent Motion. ORDERS Plaintiff to conduct a further review pursuant to the Court?s instruction at the December 21, 2006 hearing and produce documents found, if any, by January 15, 2007. Finally, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to conduct a further review of board meeting minutes referenced in the deposition discussed at the December 21, 2006 hearing and produce those items as per the Court?s instruction by January 15, 2007. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 12/21/06. (fnt, )
December 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 12/21/06. (fnt, )
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPOSNES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, 143 MOTION to Compel:Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2006 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, 143 MOTION to Compel:Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2006 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 175 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply Brief. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 12/7/06. (mjc )
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RESPONSE to Motion re 143 MOTION to Compel SUR-REPLY filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Matz, Robert)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Declaration of Joseph Gray in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Gray, Joseph)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPLY to Response to Motion re 143 MOTION to Compel filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Gray, Joseph)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPLY to Response to Motion re 150 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Matz, Robert)
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 12/4/06. (mjc )
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 144 Motion to Seal Document 144 MOTION to Seal Document MTN TO FILE UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM OF MTN TO COMPEL; and MATZ DECLARATION . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 11/30/06. (mjc )
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 164 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Expedited Motion for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 11/30/06. (mjc )
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 162 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 11/29/06. (mjc )
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 161 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 11/29/06. (mjc )
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 142 Report and Recommendations. Ordered that Defendant Rapidpay, LLC, and all persons and entities acting in concert with Rapidpay be enjoined from making, using, selling or importing any products and/or services that infringe U.S. Patent No. 6,941,281 entitled "Automated Payment." Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/29/06. (mjc )
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re 141 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Gray, Joseph)
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A)(Gray, Joseph)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re 143 MOTION to Compel filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Errata 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Affidavit by Robert C. Matz)(Matz, Robert)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1 Proposed Opposition)(Matz, Robert)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion To File Opposition To Motion To Compel In Excess of Page Limit)(Matz, Robert)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPOSNES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Gray Declaration# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Preston, Hilary)
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Certified Mail, R&R 142 , sent to Stephanie Nimberg returned. Note: No Forward Order on File; Unable to Forward; Return to Sender (mjc )
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Certified Mail, R&R 142 , sent to Lawrence Morrison returned. Note: Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. (mjc)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 152 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 11/21/06. (mjc )
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 158 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 141 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions BY MICHAEL N. EDELMAN filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O)(Matz, Robert)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 158 *** AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 143 MOTION to Compel BY MICHAEL N. EDELMAN filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O)(Matz, Robert) Modified on 11/20/2006 (mpt, ).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ***PLEASE DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 153.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Robert) Modified on 11/20/2006 (mpt, ).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ***DUPLICATE OF 153 . PLEASE DISREGARD***RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Robert) Modified on 11/20/2006 (mjc).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***DUPLICATE OF 153 . PLEASE DISREGARD***RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Robert) Modified on 11/20/2006 (mjc).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matz, Robert)
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 143 MOTION to Compel filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Gray, Joseph)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DUPLICATE ENTRY OF 145 *** SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES# 2 Text of Proposed Order AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER)(Matz, Robert) Modified on 12/8/2006 (mjc ).
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT TEXT OF PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER. (Matz, Robert)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT TEXT OF PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES. (Matz, Robert)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPOSNES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES BY OTIS CARROLL filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Matz, Robert)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. MATZ IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RSPS TO INTERROGATORIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Matz, Robert)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Seal Document MTN TO FILE UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM OF MTN TO COMPEL; and MATZ DECL by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING MTN TO FILE UNDER SEAL MTN TO COMPEL AND MATZ DECLARATION)(Matz, Robert)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 143 "SEE DOC 152 FOR MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT" MOTION to Compel by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R# 20 Exhibit S# 21 Exhibit T# 22 Exhibit U)(Gray, Joseph) Modified on 11/15/2006 (rvw, ). Modified on 11/16/2006 (rvw, ).
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC filed by AdvanceMe Inc, recommending Rapidpay and its representatives be enjoined from producing, selling or importing any products and/or services that infringe U.S. Patent No. 6,941,281. Parties have 10 days to file objections. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 11/2/06. (mjc )
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Gray, Joseph)
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/06 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Patrick G. Thurmond. (102 pages) (mjc )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2006 re 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (mjm, )
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2006. (Court Reporter Patrick Thurmond.) (mjm, )
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart. Deadline is extended to 10/12/06 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/16/06. (mjc )
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Joint Claim Construction Chart Deadline extended to 10/13/06 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/16/06. (mjc )
October 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Joint MOTION To Extend Deadline To Submit Joint Claim Construction Chart by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart by AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/11/06. Brief already filed as 132 . (mjc ) Modified on 10/12/2006 (mjc ).
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF re 110 Claim Construction Brief, by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Lemieux, Ronald)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF)(Lemieux, Ronald)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc re 117 Claim Construction Brief, OF OBJECTION TO EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE OFFERED BY DEFENDANTS (Lemieux, Ronald)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF re 110 Claim Construction Brief, by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A# 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B# 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C# 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D# 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E)(Lemieux, Ronald)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AdvanceMe Inc. (Lemieux, Ronald)
October 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of Requested Length for Markman Hearing (Gray, Joseph)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE in Support re 101 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (mjc )
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply Brief . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/5/06. (mjc )
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Corrected) by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1)(Schuurman, Willem)
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 101 Motion for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/4/06. (mjc)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re 101 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Gray Declaration in Support# 2 Exhibit F# 3 Exhibit G# 4 Exhibit H# 5 Exhibit I# 6 Exhibit J)(Schuurman, Willem)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ***FILED IN ERROR, TO BE CORRECTED. SEE CORRECTED DOCKET # 124 WHICH REPLACES DOCKET # 121 *** MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Reply))(Schuurman, Willem) Modified on 10/4/2006 (fnt, ).
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER re 112 Order, appointing Michael McLemore, Houston atty, as technical advisor with costs to be assessed equally . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/3/06. (mjc )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC: Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2006 03:00 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 116 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Responsive Claim Construction Brief . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 9/28/06. (mjc )
September 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Gray, Joseph)
September 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Construction Brief# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Joseph)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Proposed Pretrial Order PRPOSED ORDER DENYING DEFS' MTN FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by AdvanceMe Inc. (Lemieux, Ronald)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 101 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions EDELMAN DECL filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Errata EXHS A-F# 2 Exhibit EXHS G-I# 3 Exhibit EXHS J-L# 4 Exhibit EXHS M-O# 5 Exhibit EXHS P-Q)(Lemieux, Ronald)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re 101 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Lemieux, Ronald)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER, The Court is considering appointing Mike McLemore, Attoney-at-Law, as technical advisior in this case. Any objections to the appointment of Mr. McLemore must be sent to chambers for an in camera review by September 27, 2006. Parties objections due by 9/27/2006. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 9/22/06. (fnt, )
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPORT of Mediation by Harry W. McKee. Mediation result: Ongoing(McKee, Harry)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed Opening Claim Construction Brief by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Opening Claim Construction Brief# 2 Exhibit Exhibits F-G To Opening Claim Construction Brief# 3 Exhibit Exhibits H-O To Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Lemieux, Ronald)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 102 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, granting 105 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 9/14/06. (fnt, )
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Disclosure by Reach Financial, LLC - Notice of Third Amended Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Disclosure by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. - Notice of Third Amended Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC - Notice of Third Amended Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Race, Deborah)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed Advanceme, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief Pursuant To Local Patent Rule 4-5(a) by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhs A-E# 2 Exhibit EHS F-G# 3 Exhibit EXHS H-O)(Lemieux, Ronald)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Plantiff's Unopposed Mtn For Leave To File Opening Claim Construction Brief In Excess of Page Limit by AdvanceMe Inc. (Lemieux, Ronald)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Opening Claim Construction Brief by AdvanceMe Inc. (Lemieux, Ronald)
September 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Amend Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Declaration in Support# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E)(Gray, Joseph)
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC: Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2006 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Tyler. Court requests any party knowing of an address where Rapidpay may be reached contact the Court with that information. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 9/8/06. (mjc )
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc Regarding Technical Advisors [Joint] (Carroll, Otis)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC Supplemental Disclosures under PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Preston, Hilary)
August 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc re AdvanceMe Inc.'s Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a) (Lemieux, Ronald)
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 "DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, No cert of svc, SEE DOC 97 FOR CORRECTION" NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a) (Lemieux, Ronald) Modified on 8/29/2006 (rvw, ).
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Shanee Y. Williams and Michael N. Edelman; Fee: $50, receipt number: 6-1-6387 (mjc)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael N Edelman for AdvanceMe Inc. Approved 8/17/06. (mjc )
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shanee Y Williams for AdvanceMe Inc. Approved 8/17/06. (mjc )
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reach Financial, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (Gray, Joseph)
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by First Funds, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery Deadline-Claim Construction Issues due by 9/8/2006. (rvw, )
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery Deadline-Claim Construction,9/8/2006. Filing of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, 8/2/2006. All other deadlines in the amended docket control order dated 6/2/2006 shall remain the same. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 8/3/2006. (rvw, )
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Disclosure by Reach Financial, LLC Notice of Second Amended Rule 26 Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Disclosure by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. Notice of Second Amended Rule 26 Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC Notice of Second Amended Rule 26 Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
August 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by Reach Financial, LLC, AdvanceMe Inc, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, AdvanceMe Inc, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., AdvanceMe Inc, Reach Financial, LLC, AdvanceMe Inc, AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC Joint Claim Construction andPrehearing Statement Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-3 (Lemieux, Ronald)
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc re 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC of Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Bankruptcy and Request for Consideration of Motion for Default Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Race, Deborah)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/27/06. (fnt, )
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Stipulated Protective Order)# 2 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas)
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of Compliance with PR 4-2 (Preston, Hilary)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Gray, Joseph)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC - Notice of Supplemental Disclosures Under P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Gray, Joseph)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Disclosure by Reach Financial, LLC - Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Disclosure by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. - Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC - Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Gray, Joseph)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC [Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4] (Gray, Joseph)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 72 First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against AdvanceMe Inc by Reach Financial, LLC.(Gray, Joseph)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 71 First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against AdvanceMe Inc by Merchant Money Tree, Inc..(Gray, Joseph)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 70 First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against AdvanceMe Inc by First Funds, LLC.(Gray, Joseph)
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Vid Bhakar and Robert C. Matz; Fee: $50.00, receipt number: 6-1-5884 (mjc)
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert C Matz for AdvanceMe Inc. Approved 7/7/06. (mjc )
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 74 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vid Bhakar for AdvanceMe Inc. Approved 7/7/06. (mjc )
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc (Carroll, Otis)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Disclosure by Reach Financial, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Disclosure by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (Gray, Joseph)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of CANCELATION of 6/15/2006 Motion for Default Judgment Hearing: (mjm, )
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Disclosure by Reach Financial, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Disclosure by Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (Gray, Joseph)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Disclosure by First Funds, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC: Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2006 09:30 AM in Ctrm 210 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, )
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines (per 60 Order): Bench Trial set for 3/26/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pre-Markman Hearing set for 10/16/2006 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Markman Hearing set for 10/19/2006 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, )
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines (per 60 Order): Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2007. Discovery due by 2/15/2007. Expert Witness List due by 1/8/2007. Identify trial witnesses by 2/5/2007 Jury instructions due by 2/19/2007 Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2007. Motions in limine due 3-19-07. (mll, )
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/06. cc:attys 6-2-06(mll, )
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The Docket Control Order is amended pursuant to the parties' proposed Amended Docket Control Order attached to the Joint Motion as Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/06. cc:attys 6-2-06 (mll, )
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order, by AdvanceMe Inc, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
May 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC: Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2006 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/25/06. (fnt, )
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss Business Capital Corporation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed as to Defendant Business Capital Corporation, without prejudice, and without attorney's fees or costs to either party. This order does not affect the rights of ADVANCEME, INC against any other party in this case . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/24/06. (fnt, )
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lawrence Morrison (Order #52) (fnt, )
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stephanie Nimberg (Order #52) (fnt, )
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Defendant Business Capital Corporation by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
May 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Capital Business Corporation to 5/15/2006. (fnt, )
May 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 23 Amended Complaint, Dft, Capital Business Corporation shall have to and including May 15, 2006 to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/5/06. (fnt, )
May 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 23 Amended Complaint, by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
April 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hilary Preston for First Funds, LLC; First Funds, LLC; Merchant Money Tree, Inc.; Reach Financial, LLC; Reach Financial, LLC and Merchant Money Tree, Inc.. Approved 4/26/06(fnt, )
April 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Hilary Preston; Fee: $25, receipt number: 614935 (fnt, )
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Business Capital Corporation to 5/4/2006. (fnt, )
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 23 Amended Complaint, It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Capital Business Corporation shall have to and including May 4, 2006 to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/25/06. (fnt, ) Modified on 4/25/2006 (fnt, ).
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Compliance (Carroll, Otis)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willem G Schuurman on behalf of Reach Financial, LLC (Schuurman, Willem)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willem G Schuurman on behalf of Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (Schuurman, Willem)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willem G Schuurman on behalf of First Funds, LLC (Schuurman, Willem)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Daniel Gray on behalf of Reach Financial, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Daniel Gray on behalf of Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (Gray, Joseph)
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Daniel Gray on behalf of First Funds, LLC (Gray, Joseph)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Reach Financial, LLC, Reach Financial, LLC (McSwane, Douglas)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of First Funds, LLC, First Funds, LLC (McSwane, Douglas)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Merchant Money Tree, Inc. (McSwane, Douglas)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First Funds, LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of AdvanceMe, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against AdvanceMe Inc by First Funds, LLC.(McSwane, Douglas)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Merchant Money Tree, Inc's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of AdvanceMe, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against AdvanceMe Inc by Merchant Money Tree, Inc..(McSwane, Douglas)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Reach Financial LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of AdvanceMe, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against AdvanceMe Inc by Reach Financial, LLC.(McSwane, Douglas)
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 23 Amended Complaint, for Defendant Business Capital Corporation by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Daniel B Pollack terminated . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/10/06. (fnt, ) Modified on 4/12/2006 (fnt, ).
April 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment as to RapidPay, LLC by AdvanceMe Inc. Responses due by 4/21/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Otis Carroll# 2 Affidavit of Alan Nussbaum# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Daniel Pollack by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
March 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Business Capital Corporation. AdvanceMe Inc served on 3/21/2006, answer due 4/10/2006. (fnt, )
March 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AdvanceMe Inc. Merchant Money Tree, Inc. served on 3/13/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (fnt, )
March 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AdvanceMe Inc. Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash served on 3/14/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (fnt, )
March 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AdvanceMe Inc. First Funds, LLC served on 3/14/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (fnt, )
March 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by AdvanceMe Inc of Additional Disclosures (Carroll, Otis)
March 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Disclosure by AdvanceMe Inc Pursuant to Local Rule CV 26(c) (Carroll, Otis)
February 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to AdvanceMe Inc (fnt, )
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Business Capital Corporation, Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC. (rvw, )
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/06. (fnt, )
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Business Capital Corporation, Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash, First Funds, LLC, Merchant Money Tree, Inc., Reach Financial, LLC, RapidPay LLC, filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Carroll, Otis) Modified on 2/28/2006 (fnt, ).
February 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/24/2006. (rvw, )
February 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER:Non-Jury Trial Scheduled for 12/7/2006, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2006. Discovery due by 10/1/2006. Expert Witness List due by 9/26/2006. Identify trial witnesses by 10/9/2006 Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/19/2006. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/24/2006. (rvw, )
February 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DISCOVERY ORDER . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/24/2006. (rvw, )
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Guy N Harrison terminated . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/23/06. (fnt, )
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by RapidPay LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
February 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/16/06. (fnt, )
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Harry W. McKee added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/1/06. (fnt, )
February 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Scheduling Conference & Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2006 re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer Subject Thereto filed by RapidPay LLC. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
January 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE/ORDER OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER, AND PROPOSED DATES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2006 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/19/06. (fnt, )
January 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer Subject Thereto: Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2006 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
December 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Ronald S Lemieux and Daniel B Pollack; Fee: $50, receipt number: 6-3462 (mll, )
December 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel B Pollack for AdvanceMe Inc. (mll, )
December 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ronald S Lemieux for AdvanceMe Inc. (mll, )
December 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer Subject Thereto Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by RapidPay LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Harrison, Guy)
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer Subject Thereto ; Replies due by 12/28/2005. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/05. cc:attys 12-21-05 (mll, )
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by RapidPay LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer Subject Thereto filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Carroll, Otis)
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RapidPay LLC (Harrison, Guy)
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer Subject Thereto by RapidPay LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AdvanceMe Inc. RapidPay LLC served on 11/10/2005, answer due 11/30/2005. (fnt, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William M. Steger recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William M. Steger on 11/16/05. cc:pltf 11-17-05(mll, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (fnt, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number 6-1-2961 (fnt, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to RapidPay LLC. (fnt, )
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RapidPay LLC (Filing fee $ 250.) , filed by AdvanceMe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fnt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AdvanceMe Inc v. RapidPay LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AdvanceMe Inc
Represented By: Shanee Y Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Business Corporation
Represented By: Jeff Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Transact, Inc. d/b/a Simple Cash
Represented By: Jeff Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchant Money Tree, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Floyd Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reach Financial, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Floyd Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Reach Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Merchant Money Tree, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AdvanceMe Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?