Mirror Worlds, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

On October 1, 2010, a jury found that Apple violated three Mirror Worlds patents, awarding damages of $208.5 for each patent violation. The document display lawsuit involved Apple's Cover Flow, Time Machine, and Spotlight displays. Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC alleges that Defendant Apple, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent Nos. 6,006,227 and 6,638,313 B1 entitled "Document Stream Operating System" and 6,725,427 B2 entitled "Document Stream Operating System with Document Organizing and Display Facilities," 6,768,999 B2 entitled "Enterprise, Stream-Based Information Management System"

Plaintiff: Mirror Worlds, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2008cv00088
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2011 Filing 479 FINAL JUDGMENT that Mirror Worlds take nothing against Apple. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/04/11. cc:attys 4-04-11(mll, )
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 432 Sealed Motion: GRANTED as to Apple's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 as to Apple's direct infringement of the 227, 313, and 427 patents; DENIED as to invalidity, and DENIED AS MOOT as to the request for a new trial or remittitur; denying 433 Sealed Motion for a Finding of Inequitable Conduct and Good Cause to Reopen the Record for a Bench Trial; denying 435 Sealed Motion; granting 446 Sealed Motion to Strike the Declaration of Walter Bratic and Documents Not in Evidence; denying 465 Sealed Motion Regarding Mirror Worlds' Waiver of Privilege for Documents Listed on the Privilege Log. All other pending motions not previously resolved are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/04/11. cc:attys 4-04-11 (mll, )
February 18, 2011 Filing 477 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Post-Verdict Motion Hearing held on 12/9/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan,Telephone number: shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 146 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2011. (sms, )
February 18, 2011 Filing 476 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Inequitable Conduct held on 12/8/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 70 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2011. (sms, )
February 9, 2011 Filing 475 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Notice of Intent To Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate Issued by the USPTO In the Reexamination of the 227 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Intent To Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate)(Solo, Alexander)
January 31, 2011 Filing 474 SEALED Sur-Reply by Mirror Worlds, LLC to 473 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
January 27, 2011 Filing 473 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 465 SEALED MOTION Regarding Mirror Worlds' Waiver of Privilege for Documents Listed on the December 9, 2010 Privilege Log filed by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2011 Filing 472 SEALED RESPONSE by Mirror Worlds, LLC to 467 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
January 24, 2011 Filing 471 SEALED RESPONSE by Mirror Worlds, LLC to 466 Sealed Document, filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
January 24, 2011 Filing 470 *** INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT - TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY *** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 1/24/2011 (gsg).
January 24, 2011 Filing 469 *** INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT - TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY *** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 435 SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest, 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 1/24/2011 (gsg).
January 24, 2011 Filing 468 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 465 SEALED MOTION Regarding Mirror Worlds' Waiver of Privilege for Documents Listed on the December 9, 2010 Privilege Log filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
January 10, 2011 Filing 467 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Randall, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2011 Filing 466 Sealed Document. Additional Briefing on Mirror Worlds' Objectionable Use of and Reliance on Exhibits Not Shown to the Jury in Its Responsive Briefing to Apple's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Docket No. 432) and Its Motion for Entry of Judgment (Docket No. 435) (Randall, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2011 Filing 465 SEALED MOTION Regarding Mirror Worlds' Waiver of Privilege for Documents Listed on the December 9, 2010 Privilege Log by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2010 Filing 464 Sealed Document. Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Trial Exhibit No 1126 (DX1126). (mll, )
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting 439 Transcript Redaction Request. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/10. cc:attys 12-14-10(mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 462 ***FILED IN ERROR (Wrong Case) - DISREGARD***11.30.10 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/30/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) Modified on 12/6/2010 (rlf, ).
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 : Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/10. cc:attys 11-30-10(mll, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 460 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8)(Solo, Alexander)
November 29, 2010 Filing 459 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 433 SEALED MOTION for a Finding of Inequitable Conduct and Good Cause to Re-Open the Record for a Bench Trial filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit A)(Solo, Alexander)
November 29, 2010 Filing 458 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 435 SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10)(Randall, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2010 Filing 457 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 446 SEALED MOTION to Strike the October 29, 2010 Declaration of Walter Bratic and Documents Not in Evidence filed by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2010 Filing 455 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 435 SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Solo, Alexander)
November 19, 2010 Filing 454 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 446 SEALED MOTION to Strike the October 29, 2010 Declaration of Walter Bratic and Documents Not in Evidence filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
November 19, 2010 Filing 453 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 433 SEALED MOTION for a Finding of Inequitable Conduct and Good Cause to Re-Open the Record for a Bench Trial filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Randall in support, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)(Randall, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2010 Filing 452 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Randall in support, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13)(Randall, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2010 ***NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF Document # 415 , Motion to Seal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
November 17, 2010 Filing 451 Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File a Corrected Opposition (D.I. 445) by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
November 17, 2010 Filing 450 Received flash drive containing two videos, Exhibits 4 & 6, to the Declaration of Jeffrey G Randal in Support of Apple Inc's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur pursuant to FRCP 50 and 59 432 . Filed per 448 Order. (mll, )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting 441 Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/10. cc:attys 11-16-10 (mll, )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting 434 Motion for Leave to File Videos Non-Electronically. Apple shall submit a flash drive with the videos to the Clerk's office and provide a courtesy copy to Chambers. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/10. cc:attys 11-16-10 (mll, )
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 323 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 324 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 325 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 334 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 243 Sealed Motion; denying 389 Motion to Strike ; denying 394 Sealed Motion; denying 221 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 223 Sealed Motion; denying 224 Sealed Motion; denying 225 Sealed Motion; denying 226 Sealed Motion; denying 228 Sealed Motion; denying 229 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-15-10 (mll, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 446 SEALED MOTION to Strike the October 29, 2010 Declaration of Walter Bratic and Documents Not in Evidence by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 443 , Motion to Strike. PLEASE IGNORE. Should have been filed under seal.*** (gsg)
November 12, 2010 Filing 445 SEALED Response to Motion re 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Solo, Alexander)
November 12, 2010 Filing 444 SEALED Response to Motion re 433 SEALED MOTION for a Finding of Inequitable Conduct and Good Cause to Re-Open the Record for a Bench Trial filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
November 12, 2010 Filing 443 *** FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY *** MOTION to Strike the October 29, 2010 Declaration of Walter Bratic and Documents Not in Evidence by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/15/2010 (gsg).
November 12, 2010 Filing 442 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 435 SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Randall, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
November 10, 2010 Filing 441 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2010 Filing 440 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Withdrawal of Its Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits (Docket No. 415) (Randall, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2010 Filing 439 Transcript Redaction Request re 418 Transcript,,, by attorney Jeffrey G Randall. (Randall, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting 437 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 415 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits; Responses due by 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/04/10. cc:attys 11-04-10 (mll, )
November 4, 2010 Filing 437 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 415 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER re 430 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/10. cc:attys 11-03-10(mll, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 435 SEALED MOTION For (1) Entry of Judgment, (2) Prejudgment Interest, (3) Post Verdict and Prejudgment Damages, (4) Post Judgment Royalties, (5) Enhanced Damages, (6) Attorneys and Experts Fees, (7) Costs and (8) Post Judgment Interest by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Affidavit Walter Bratic, # 9 Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 6, # 15 Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit 10 (Part 1 of 2), # 19 Exhibit 10 (Part 2 of 2), # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
October 29, 2010 Filing 434 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Videos Non-Electronically by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2010 Filing 433 SEALED MOTION for a Finding of Inequitable Conduct and Good Cause to Re-Open the Record for a Bench Trial by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2010 Filing 432 SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial and Motion for Remittitur Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50 and 59 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8A-C, # 10 Exhibit 9A-C, # 11 Exhibit 10A-C, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting 429 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 415 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits; Responses due by 11/4/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/10. cc:attys 10-29-10 (mll, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 430 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Intent to Request Redaction (Randall, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2010 Filing 429 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 415 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
October 25, 2010 Filing 428 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Proceedings held on 9/7/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 69 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2011. (sms, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 427 Sealed Transcript. Partial Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on 8/26/10. 14 pages. (sms, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 426 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Proceedings held on 8/26/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 69 pages NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 425 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 10/1/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 145 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 424 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/30/10 - Afternoon Session Part 2 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 206 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 423 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/30/10 - Afternoon Session - Part 1 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 157 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 422 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/30/10 - Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 117 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 421 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/29/10 - Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 252 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 420 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/29/10 - Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 113 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 419 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/28/10 - Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 181 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 418 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of REDACTED Trial Proceedings held on 9/28/10 - Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 155 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, ) (Main Document 418 replaced on 12/17/2010 per Order 463 entered on 12.13.2010) (rlf, ). Modified on 12/17/2010 (rlf, ).
October 20, 2010 Filing 417 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/27/10 - Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 155 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 416 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 9/27/10 - Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan/Shelly Holmes, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 131 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2011. (sms, )
October 11, 2010 Filing 415 ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 440 .*** MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/17/2010 (mjc, ).
October 5, 2010 Filing 414 Exhibit Lists: Exhibit Lists tendered to Clerk, but not marked nor admitted by the Court: Main Document - Plaintiff's Unmarked List 1 (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Unmarked List 2, # 2 Defendant's Unmarked List 1)(rlf, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 413 Apple's Exhibit Lists of Exhibits Admitted at Trial 9.20.2010 - 10.1.2010. Main Document - Defendant's Exhibit List #1. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit List #2)(rlf, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER that all post-verdict motions and briefs be filed by 10-29-2010; responses by 11-12-2010; replies by 11-19-2010; and surreplies by 11-29-2010. All post-verdict relief shall be sought in these motions. The Court will not consider any additional motions or briefing after entering the final judgment. The Court will allow briefing to address equitable issues based on the evidence submitted during trial and to address whether there is good cause for re-opening the record. If the Court finds good cause, a hearing will be held on 12-08-2010 at 1:30 p.m. The Court sets all remaining post-verdict motions for hearing on 12-09-2010 at 9:00 a.m. Motion to Stay Entry of the Jury Verdict and Judgment 405 is DENIED as moot. Page limits are also set by this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/05/10. cc:attys 10-05-10 (mll, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 411 Mirror Worlds Exhibit Lists of Exhibits Admitted at Trial 9.20.2010 - 10.1.2010. Main Document - Plaintiff's Exhibit List #1. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List #2, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List #3, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List #4)(rlf, )
October 3, 2010 Filing 405 Emergency MOTION to Stay Entry of Jury Verdict and Judgment by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2010 Filing 410 Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY. (rlf, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 409 JURY VERDICT. (rlf, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 408 SEALED Jury Notes. (rlf, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 407 Jury Instructions. (rlf, )
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER denying [] ORAL Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law presented in Open Court on 10/1/2010.FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/1/2010. (rlf, )
October 1, 2010 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Apple, Inc against all of Mirror Worlds' claims and counterclaims and for judgment as a matter of law in favor of Apple's declaratory judgment and counterclaims and defenses.1) Apple renews its former motions for judgment as a matter of law submitted to the Court on September 29 and 30 of 2010; 2) on non-infringement as to Claims 13 and 22 of the '227 patent and Claim 2 of the '313 patent based on accused products not implementing a mainstream; 3) willful infringement claim on the following additional bases: claims of the '227 and '313 should be dismissed with prejudice as method claims for which there can be no direct infringement by Apple. The sole remaining patent in this case would then be the '427; 4) non-infringement for Claims 1, 8, 16, 20 18, and 25 of the '427 patent.; 5) Mirror Worlds has failed to rebut Apple's clear and convincing evidence of anticipation and invalidity of the patents-in-suit; 6) Mirror Worlds has failed to rebut Apple's clear and convincing evidence of anticipation by statutory bars and invalidity of the patents-in-suit should be granted. 7) Mirror Worlds has failed to rebut Apple's clear and convincing evidence of obviousness, and invalidity of the patents-in-suit should be granted; 8) Mirror Worlds has failed to rebut Apple's claim by clear and convincing evidence of improper inventorship, and invalidity of the patents-in-suit should be granted. (rlf, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 406 10.1.10 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 5: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 10/1/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
September 30, 2010 Filing 404 9.30.10 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 4: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 9/30/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
September 30, 2010 Filing 403 BRIEF filed PLAINTIFF MIRROR WORLDS, LLCS BRIEF REGARDING METHOD CLAIMS 13 AND 22 OF THE 227 PATENT AND CLAIMS 1-3 AND 9-11 OF THE 313 PATENT AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING THE COURTS GRANT OF JMOL OF NO INDUCEMENT OR CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
September 30, 2010 Filing 402 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Brief Regarding Non-Infringement of Method Claims 13 and 22 of the '227 Patent and Method Claims 1, 2, 3, 9 and 11 of the '313 Patent (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Apple's oral motion for judgment as a matter of law on doctrine of equivalents under independent claim 16 and dependent claim 18 of the 427 patent. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/10. cc:attys 9-30-10(mll, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part [] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law: Court grants directed verdict as to the 271(f) claim and as to inducement and contributory infringement; and grants as to literal infringement as to Claims 16 & 18 of '427 Patent; and takes under advisement the issue on Doctrine of Equivalents; in all other respects, Court denies motion. FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/2010. (rlf, )
September 29, 2010 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Apple on: 1)Failure to establish literal infringement; 2) Failure to establish infringement under doctrine of equivalent; 3) Failure to present evidence of induced infringement; 4) Failure to present evidence of contributory infringement; 5) Failure to present evidence of infringement; 6) Failure to present evidence of willful infringement; 7) Failure to meet burden of proof on damages. (rlf, )
September 29, 2010 Filing 401 9.29.10 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 3: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 9/29/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
September 29, 2010 Filing 399 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.s Supplemental Brief Regarding Non-Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents for Claims 16 and 18 of the 427 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2010 Filing 398 BRIEF filed PLAINTIFF MIRROR WORLDS, LLCS OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OF NON-INFRINGEMENT UNDER THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Kenneth)
September 28, 2010 Filing 397 9.28.10 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 2: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 9/28/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 395 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 394 SEALED MOTION for a Finding that Mirror Worlds, LLC, Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., and Yale University Waived Attorney-Client Privilege Regarding Inventorship of the 227 Patent filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Kenneth)
September 28, 2010 Filing 394 SEALED MOTION for a Finding that Mirror Worlds, LLC, Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., and Yale University Waived Attorney-Client Privilege Regarding Inventorship of the 227 Patent by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2010 Filing 396 9.27.10 Minute Entry - JURY TRIAL - DAY 1: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 9/27/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 393 STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding iPod Classic and iPod Nano by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
September 26, 2010 Filing 392 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Withdrawal of Opposed Motions in Limine Nos. 10, 11, 13 and 17 (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2010 Filing 391 REPLY to Response to Motion re 389 MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report of John Levy, Ph.D. Regarding Validity and To Preclude Dr. Levy from Testifying at Trial About His New Opinions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2010 Filing 390 RESPONSE in Opposition re 389 MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report of John Levy, Ph.D. Regarding Validity and To Preclude Dr. Levy from Testifying at Trial About His New Opinions filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Solo, Alexander)
September 18, 2010 Filing 389 MOTION to Strike the Untimely Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report of John Levy, Ph.D. Regarding Validity and To Preclude Dr. Levy from Testifying at Trial About His New Opinions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2010 Filing 388 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Juliana Tanase for Mirror Worlds, LLC. (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Jury Trial reset for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis (per 387 Order). (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER denying 379 Sealed Request for Continued Pre-trial Conference. Jury Trial is set for 9-27-2010 at 9:00 a.m. Parties shall have 30 minutes for Opening Statements; 12 hours for Direct and Cross Examination; and 45 minutes for Closing Arguments. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10(mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER denying 363 Sealed Motion to Exclude Late Produced Documents and to Preclude the Testimony of Mr Bud Tribble. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 350 Sealed Patent Motion Regarding Independent Claims 8, 16, and 32 of the 427 Patent and Independent Claim 9 of the 313 Patent. The Court holds that independent claims 8, 16, and 32 of the 6,725,427 Patent, and independent claim 9 of the 6,638,313 Patent do not require a "stream" limitation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER denying 309 Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER denying 236 Sealed Motion to Exclude and Strike the Testimony and Expert Report of Walter Bratic. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER denying 227 Sealed Motion to Strike portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Keith R Ugone, PhD and to Exclude Ugone's Testimony regarding Apple's Survey Instruments and Marketing Research. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER denying 220 Sealed Motion Under Daubert and Rule 26 to Limit the Testimony and Expert Reports of John Levy. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting 376 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/10. cc:attys 9-15-10 (mll, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 379 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Request for Continued Pre-Trial Conference (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/14/2010. (gsg)
September 13, 2010 Filing 377 REPLY to Response to Motion re 309 MOTION To Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J)(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2010 Filing 376 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 32 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER)(Solo, Alexander)
September 13, 2010 Filing 373 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond W Yu for Apple, Inc.. (mll, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 371 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Kelley on behalf of Mirror Worlds, LLC (Kelley, James)
September 9, 2010 Filing 370 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kim Moore for Apple, Inc.. (mll, )
September 8, 2010 Filing 369 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 363 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Late Produced Documents and To Preclude the Testimony of Mr. Bud Tribble filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
September 7, 2010 Filing 375 Sealed Document. Jury Questionnaires (rlf, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 374 9.7.10 Minute Entry (JURY SELECTION): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 9/7/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 368 Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Defenses to Apple Inc.'s Patent Infringement Claim of [D.I. 322] Apple Inc.'s Third Amended ANSWER to Complaint ,Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc..(Solo, Alexander)
September 7, 2010 Filing 367 Mirror Worlds' Reply to [D.I. 322] Apple Inc.'s Third Amended ANSWER to Complaint ,Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Mirror Worlds, LLC.(Solo, Alexander)
September 7, 2010 Filing 366 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles E Cantine for Mirror Worlds, LLC. (mll, )
September 6, 2010 Filing 365 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Asserted Prior Art for Trial (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2010 Filing 364 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 363 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Late Produced Documents and To Preclude the Testimony of Mr. Bud Tribble filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2010 Filing 363 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Late Produced Documents and To Preclude the Testimony of Mr. Bud Tribble by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
September 3, 2010 Filing 362 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 361 Sealed Response to Motion, Exhibit 6 to the Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall. (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2010 Filing 361 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 354 MIRROR WORLDs, LLC'S BRIEF REGARDING WHETHER ALL OF MIRROR WORLDS'CLAIMS REQUIRE A "STREAM" filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall)(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2010 Filing 360 RESPONSE in Opposition re 309 MOTION To Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
September 1, 2010 Filing 359 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC of Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Infringement Claims (Solo, Alexander)
September 1, 2010 Filing 358 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC re 349 Stipulation of Withdrawal of Docket No. 349 (Solo, Alexander)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER that Apple file a response to Mirror Worlds' 354 Brief regarding whether all Mirror Worlds' Claims Require a Stream, by 9-03-2010 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/01/10. cc:attys 9-01-10 (mll, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 356 STIPULATION Regarding Exchange of Exhibits by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2010 Filing 355 Sealed Objections by Apple Inc. to the Proposed Stipulated Withdrawal with Prejudice of Certain Infringement Claims (Dkt. No. 349). (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2010 Filing 354 BRIEF filed Regarding Whether All of Mirror Worlds' Claims Require a "Stream" by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
August 31, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 349, Stipulation Withdrawal. Should be filed as Opposed Motion for Withdrawal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
August 31, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 327, Motion Regarding Whether all of Mirror Worlds Claims Require a Stream. Document titled as "Brief" and should be filed as such. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 353 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC of Asserted Claims for Trial (Supplemental) (Solo, Alexander)
August 30, 2010 Filing 352 Sealed Document. Stipulation Regarding Apple's Pending Motion for Partial Summary Judgment To Establish Non-Infringement of Apple's Foreign Products and Exclude Foreign Sales from any Potential Damages Award (Doc. No. 224) (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER that Mirror Worlds shall supplement the Notice of Asserted Claims for Trial by 9:00 a.m. on 8-31-2010 to specify the accused products for each patent claim that Mirror Worlds intends to pursue at trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/10. cc:attys 8-30-10(mll, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 350 SEALED PATENT MOTION Regarding Independent Claims 8, 16, and 32 of the '427 Patent and Independent Claim 9 of the '313 Patent by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2010 Filing 349 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED INCORRECTLY WITH WRONG DOCKET EVENT*** STIPULATION WITHDRAWAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CERTAIN INFRINGEMENT CLAIMS by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 8/31/2010 (kls, ).
August 30, 2010 Filing 348 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC OF ASSERTED CLAIMS FOR TRIAL (Solo, Alexander)
August 30, 2010 Filing 347 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR AS MOTION INSTEAD OF BRIEF*** MOTION REGARDING WHETHER ALL OF MIRROR WORLDS CLAIMS REQUIRE A STREAM by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 8/31/2010 (kls, ).
August 26, 2010 Filing 372 8.26.10 Minute Entry (PRETRIAL): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/26/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
August 25, 2010 Filing 346 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC of Agreed Motions in Limine (Carroll, Otis)
August 24, 2010 Filing 345 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Estimated Times for Jury Selection and Trial (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2010 Filing 344 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Notice of Estimated Time Requested for Jury Selection and Trial (Race, Deborah)
August 24, 2010 Filing 343 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brock S Weber for Apple, Inc. (mll, )
August 24, 2010 Filing 342 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey Comeau for Apple, Inc. (mll, )
August 24, 2010 Filing 341 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT to Main Document: 340 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
August 24, 2010 Filing 340 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 323 SEALED MOTION Opposed Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-18) SEALED MOTION Opposed Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-9, 11 and 14-18) filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Solo, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
August 23, 2010 Filing 339 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 325 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE 13 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2010 Filing 338 RESPONSE to Motion re 323 SEALED MOTION Opposed Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-18) SEALED MOTION Opposed Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-18) Nos. 10, 12, and 13 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7)(Solo, Alexander)
August 23, 2010 Filing 337 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 324 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE 1-12 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Randall, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2010: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
August 23, 2010 Filing 336 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 243 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Settlement Agreements and Evidence of Certain Prior Litigations filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Randall, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER denying 132 Sealed Motion to Dismiss Apple, Inc's Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/10. cc:attys 8-23-10 (mll, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 334 Joint MOTION in Limine Joint Agreed-Upon Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-5) by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
August 23, 2010 Filing 333 Sealed Document - Proposed Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Solo, Alexander)
August 21, 2010 Filing 332 Sealed Document. Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Amended 35 U.S.C. 282 Identification of Patents, Publications and Prior Inventors (Randall, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/23/2010 (mll, ).
August 21, 2010 Filing 331 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - REFILED AS DOCKET ENTRY # 333 WITH EXHIBITS IN CORRECT ORDER*** Sealed Document - Proposed Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 8/23/2010 (kls, ).
August 21, 2010 Filing 330 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
August 20, 2010 Filing 329 Sealed Document. Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s 35 U.S.C. 282 Identification of Patents, Publications and Prior Inventors (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2010 Filing 328 Sealed Document. Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2010 Filing 327 Sealed Document - MIRROR WORLDS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Solo, Alexander)
August 20, 2010 Filing 326 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORMS by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 8/23/2010 (kls, ).
August 20, 2010 Filing 325 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE 13 by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
August 19, 2010 Filing 324 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE 1-12 by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
August 19, 2010 Filing 323 SEALED MOTION Opposed Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-18) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Randall in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Randall, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2010: # 16 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
August 19, 2010 Filing 322 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER denying 217 Motion to Sever Apple's counterclaim against Mirror Worlds Technologies. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/10. cc:attys 8-19-10 (mll, )
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting 210 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer. The Court orders Apple to file its amended answer immediately. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/10. cc:attys 8-19-10 (mll, )
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9)(Solo, Alexander)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 316 .***SEALED AMENDED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 8/17/2010 (mjc, ).
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 317 .***SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 8/17/2010 (mjc, ).
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 58, # 3 Exhibit 59, # 4 Exhibit 60, # 5 Exhibit 61 (1 of 3), # 6 Exhibit 61 (2 of 3), # 7 Exhibit 61 (3 of 3), # 8 Exhibit 62, # 9 Exhibit 63, # 10 Exhibit 64, # 11 Exhibit 65, # 12 Exhibit 66, # 13 Exhibit 67)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 13)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7)(Solo, Alexander)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18)(Solo, Alexander)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC re 306 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Carroll, Otis)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting 303 Motion for submission of jury questionnaire. The Joint Proposed Juror Questionnaire shall be submitted to and filled out by potential jurors prior to voir dire and jury selection. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/13/10. cc:attys 8-16-10 (mll, )
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MOTION To Limit the Number of Asserted Claims by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 227 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D. AND TO EXCLUDE UGONES TESTIMONY REGARDING APPLES SURVEY INSTRUMENTS AND MARKETING RESEARCH filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 6)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SEALED SURREPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 220 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 26 TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN LEVY filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting 305 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/13/10. cc:attys 8-13-10 (mll, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SEALED SURREPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 236 SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Walter Bratic)(Solo, Alexander)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Joint MOTION Requesting Submission Of A Juror Questionnaire by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Questionnaire, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/10. cc:attys 8-11-10 (mll, )
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 REPORT of Mediation by Michael Philip Patterson. Mediation result: RECESSED(Patterson, Michael)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC Joint Notice of Compliance Regarding Pre-trial Disclosures (Race, Deborah)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Apple Inc.'s Sealed Surreply in Opposition to Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion to Sever Apple's Counterclaim Against Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. (Doc. No. 217) filed by Apple, Inc. (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 22)(Solo, Alexander)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101 filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 8 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19, # 4 Exhibit 20)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit 11)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 15, # 3 Exhibit 16)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 30)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER that the parties meet and confer on the Court's Charge and submit a proposed Charge to the Court by 8-20-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/10. cc:attys 8-04-10(mll, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting 284 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/10. cc:attys 8-04-10 (mll, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 280 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Parties shall file their respective reply briefs by 8-05-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/10. cc:attys 8-04-10 (mll, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER that parties substantively meet and confer on all limine issues before filing any motions in limine. Opposed motions in limine shall be filed by 8-19-2010, and responses are due by 8-23-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/10. cc:attys 8-03-10(mll, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting 283 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Parties' Invalidity Contentions and to Withdraw Related Motions; withdrawing 196 Sealed Motion to Preclude Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions; withdrawing 200 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions; withdrawing 205 Motion to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy; withdrawing 215 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Apple shall be allowed to serve its 5-17-2010 Second Amended Invalidity Contentions and Mirror Worlds shall be allowed to serve its 6-24-2010 Invalidity Contentions, pursuant to the parties' agreement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/10. cc:attys 8-03-10 (mll, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 220 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 26 TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN LEVY filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES JOINT NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCKET NOS. 204 AND 206 (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Joint SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE PARTIES' INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO WITHDRAW RELATED MOTIONS (Docket Nos. 196, 200, 205 and 215) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 227 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D. AND TO EXCLUDE UGONES TESTIMONY REGARDING APPLES SURVEY INSTRUMENTS AND MARKETING RESEARCH filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 236 SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit 27, # 3 Exhibit 28)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT, 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD, 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999, 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101, 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS, 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, 243 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Settlement Agreements and Evidence of Certain Prior Litigations, 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, MOTION IS TERMINATED, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 278, Joint Motion for extension of time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Randall, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT, 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD, 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999, 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101, 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS, 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, 243 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Settlement Agreements and Evidence of Certain Prior Litigations, 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2010 (sm, ).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 210 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 6 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 7 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 6 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 7 to Solo Dec., # 10 Exhibit 8 to Solo Dec., # 11 Exhibit 9 to Solo Dec., # 12 Exhibit 10 to Solo Dec., # 13 Exhibit 11 to Solo Dec., # 14 Exhibit 12 to Solo Dec., # 15 Exhibit 13 to Solo Dec., # 16 Exhibit 14 to Solo Dec., # 17 Exhibit 15 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of David Gelernter, Ph.D., # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Eric T. Freeman, Ph.D., # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John Levy, Ph.D., # 2 Exhibit 1 of Levy Dec., # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 4 Exhibit 1 of Solo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 6 to Solo Dec., # 10 Exhibit 7 to Solo Dec., # 11 Exhibit 8 to Solo Dec., # 12 Exhibit 9 to Solo Dec., # 13 Exhibit 10 to Solo Dec., # 14 Exhibit 11 to Solo Dec., # 15 Exhibit 12 to Solo Dec., # 16 Exhibit 13 to Solo Dec., # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Levy, Ph.D., # 3 Exhibit 1 to Levy Dec., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Levy Dec., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Levy Dec., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Levy Dec., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Levy Dec., # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 9 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 10 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 11 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 12 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 13 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Carroll, Otis)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER denying 269 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mirror Worlds may refile its oppositions to Apple's five motions for summary judgment in compliance with the page limits rules within one business day, otherwise the Court will only consider the oppositions to the extent they comply with the rules. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/10. cc:attys 7-29-10 (mll, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 266 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document submitted by Mirror Worlds, LLC. Docketed using incorrect event. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Its Oppositions to Apple Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 267 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad; Responses due by 8/2/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/28/10. cc:attys 7-28-10 (mll, )
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad, 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 232 Response to Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 256 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 to Levy Dec.)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 7/29/2010 (mjc, ).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REPLY to Response to Motion re 217 MOTION to Sever Apple's Counterclaim Against Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John Levy, Ph.D., # 2 Exhibit 1 to Levy Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 236 SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 6 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 7 to Solo Dec., # 10 Exhibit 8 to Solo Dec., # 11 Exhibit 9 to Solo Dec., # 12 Exhibit 10 to Solo Dec., # 13 Exhibit 11 to Solo Dec., # 14 Exhibit 12 to Solo Dec., # 15 Exhibit 13 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 256 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John Levy, Ph.D., # 2 Exhibit 1 to Levy Dec., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Levy Dec., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Levy Dec., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Levy Dec., # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 10 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 11 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 257 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald Baecker, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 257 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26, # 2 Exhibit 27, # 3 Exhibit 28, # 4 Exhibit 29, # 5 Exhibit 30, # 6 Exhibit 31, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 33, # 9 Exhibit 34, # 10 Exhibit 35, # 11 Exhibit 36, # 12 Exhibit 37, # 13 Exhibit 38, # 14 Exhibit 39, # 15 Exhibit 40, # 16 Exhibit 41, # 17 Exhibit 42, # 18 Exhibit 43, # 19 Exhibit 44, # 20 Exhibit 45, # 21 Exhibit 46, # 22 Exhibit 47, # 23 Exhibit 48, # 24 Exhibit 49, # 25 Exhibit 50, # 26 Exhibit 51, # 27 Exhibit 52, # 28 Exhibit 53, # 29 Exhibit 54, # 30 Exhibit 55, # 31 Exhibit 56, # 32 Exhibit 57)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 220 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 26 TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN LEVY filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 227 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D. AND TO EXCLUDE UGONES TESTIMONY REGARDING APPLES SURVEY INSTRUMENTS AND MARKETING RESEARCH filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Steven K. Feiner Ph.D., # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Steven K. Feiner Ph.D., # 4 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Randall Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Randall Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Randall Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Randall Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Randall Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Randall Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Randall Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Randall Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Randall Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Randall Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Randall Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Randall Declaration)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Eric T. Freeman, Ph.D., # 3 Affidavit Declaration of David Gelernter, Ph.D., # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Solo Dec., # 6 Exhibit 2 to Solo Dec., # 7 Exhibit 3 to Solo Dec., # 8 Exhibit 4 to Solo Dec., # 9 Exhibit 5 to Solo Dec.)(Solo, Alexander)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 248 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS, 220 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 26 TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN LEVY, 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD, 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101, 227 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D. AND TO EXCLUDE UGONES TESTIMONY REGARDING APPLES SURVEY INSTRUMENTS AND MARKETING RESEARCH, 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT, 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999, 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT; Responses due by 7/22/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/22/10. cc:attys 7-22-10 (mll, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 220 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 26 TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN LEVY, 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT, 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD, 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999, 227 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D. AND TO EXCLUDE UGONES TESTIMONY REGARDING APPLES SURVEY INSTRUMENTS AND MARKETING RESEARCH, 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101, 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS, 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting 246 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad; Responses due by 7/27/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/21/10. cc:attys 7-21-10 (mll, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad, 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 232 Response to Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 210 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall ISO Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer, # 2 Exhibit 32 to Supplemental Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 33 to Supplemental Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 34 to Supplemental Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 35 to Supplemental Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 36 to Supplemental Declaration)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Received disk containing a video which is Exhibit 7 to 221 the Declaration of Jeffrey G Randall in Support of Apple Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment; forwarded disk to Judge Davis's Chambers. (mll, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Settlement Agreements and Evidence of Certain Prior Litigations by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo in Support of Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Settlement Agreements and Evidence of Certain Prior Litigations, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 241 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad ; Responses due by 7/20/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/16/10. cc:attys 7-16-10 (mll, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad, 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 232 Response to Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 238 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad; Responses due by 7/15/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/10. cc:attys 7-14-10 (mll, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 SEALED Opposition to Mirror World's Motion to Sever Apple's Counterclaim Against Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. 217 filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments:#(1) Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall Declaration ISO of Opposition to Mirror World's Motion to Sever Apple's Counterclaim Against Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., #(2) Exhibit 1 to Randall Declaration, #(3) Exhibit 2 to Randall Declaration, #(4) Exhibit 3 to Randall Declaration, #(5) Exhibit 4 to Randall Declaration, #(6) Exhibit 5 to Randall Declaration, #(7) Exhibit 6 to Randall Declaration, #(8) Exhibit 7 to Randall Declaration, #(9) Exhibit 8 to Randall Declaration, #(10) Exhibit 9 to Randall Declaration, #(11) Exhibit 10 to Randall Declaration, #(12) Exhibit 11 to Randall Declaration, #(13) Exhibit 12 to Randall Declaration, #(14) Exhibit 13 to Randall Declaration, #(15) Exhibit 14 to Randall Declaration, # 16Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad, 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101, 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, 232 Response to Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 234 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad; Responses due by 7/13/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/10. cc:attys 7-08-10 (mll, )
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 SEALED MOTION (DAUBERT) TO EXCLUDE AND STRIKE THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 6, Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 6, Part 3, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, Part 1, # 20 Exhibit 13, Part 2, # 21 Exhibit 14, # 22 Exhibit 15, # 23 Exhibit 16, # 24 Exhibit 17, # 25 Exhibit 18, # 26 Exhibit 19, # 27 Exhibit 20, # 28 Exhibit 21, # 29 Exhibit 22, # 30 Exhibit 23, # 31 Exhibit 24, # 32 Exhibit 25, # 33 Exhibit 26)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 210 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo In Support of Mirror Worlds, LLCs Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion For Leave To File Its Third Amended Answer, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 7 - Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 7 - Part 3, # 13 Exhibit 7 - Part 4, # 14 Exhibit 7 - Part 5, # 15 Exhibit 7 - Part 6, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit 10, # 19 Exhibit 11, # 20 Exhibit 12, # 21 Exhibit 13, # 22 Exhibit 14, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 222 Motion for Leave to File a Video Non-Electronically. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/06/10. cc:attys 7-06-10 (mll, )
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 RESPONSE to Motion re 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101 filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stein, Kenneth)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo In Support of Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Incs Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Compel Documents and Interrogatory Responses, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PROPOSED ORDER CANNOT BE FILED SEPARATELY, CLERK HAS ATTACHED IT TO #228. Document # 230, Sealed Additional Attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 7/2/2010 (sm, ).
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF US PATENT NO. 6,613,101 by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Affidavit Declaration of John Levy in Support, # 11 Exhibit 1, # 12 Exhibit 2)(Solo, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2010: # 13 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo in Support of Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Solo, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2010: # 23 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D. AND TO EXCLUDE UGONES TESTIMONY REGARDING APPLES SURVEY INSTRUMENTS AND MARKETING RESEARCH by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo in Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27)(Solo, Alexander)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING MIRROR WORLDS' ALLEGATIONS OF WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, Part 3, # 9 Exhibit 3, Part 4, # 10 Exhibit 3, Part 5, # 11 Exhibit 3, Part 6, # 12 Exhibit 3, Part 7, # 13 Exhibit 3, Part 8, # 14 Exhibit 3, Part 9, # 15 Exhibit 3, Part 10, # 16 Exhibit 4, # 17 Exhibit 5, # 18 Exhibit 6, # 19 Exhibit 7, # 20 Exhibit 8, # 21 Exhibit 9, # 22 Exhibit 10, # 23 Exhibit 11, # 24 Exhibit 12, # 25 Exhibit 13, # 26 Exhibit 14)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227; 6,638,313; 6,725,427; AND 6,768,999 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 7, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO ESTABLISH NON-INFRINGEMENT OF APPLE'S FOREIGN PRODUCTS AND EXCLUDE FOREIGN SALES FROM ANY POTENTIAL DAMAGES AWARD by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Mark Donnelly Regarding Apple's Distribution of Software Outside of the United States, # 3 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, Part 1, # 16 Exhibit 12, Part 2, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF THE '227 PATENT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A VIDEO NON-ELECTRONICALLY by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,006,227, 6,638,313, 6,725,427 AND 6,768,999 ARE INVALID AS ANTICIPATED AND OBVIOUS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 SEALED MOTION UNDER DAUBERT AND RULE 26 TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY AND EXPERT REPORTS OF JOHN LEVY by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall in Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting 218 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/10. cc:attys 6-30-10 (mll, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION to Sever Apple's Counterclaim Against Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to Response to PATENT Motion re 200 SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alex Solo in Support Of Mirror Worlds Surreply in Opposition to Apples Renewed Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 6/25/2010 (kls, ).
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander Solo In Support of Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer And Submit Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 REBUTTAL TRIAL Witness List by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Rebuttal Witness List by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Solo, Alexander)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Rebuttal Witness List by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 210 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Randall in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 4, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 4, Part 3, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit 18, Part 1, # 24 Exhibit 18, Part 2, # 25 Exhibit 19, # 26 Exhibit 20, # 27 Exhibit 21, Part 1, # 28 Exhibit 21, Part 2, # 29 Exhibit 22, # 30 Exhibit 23, # 31 Exhibit 24, # 32 Exhibit 25, # 33 Exhibit 26, # 34 Exhibit 27, # 35 Exhibit 28, # 36 Exhibit 29, # 37 Exhibit 30, # 38 Exhibit 31)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Trial Witness List by Apple, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Trial Witness List by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Stein, Kenneth)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Trial Witness List by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Stein, Kenneth)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disk and Information Regarding the iPad by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander Solo in Support of Plaintiff Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, The Master Disc and Information Regarding the iPad, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Mirror Worlds LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Foreign Sales Information, the Master Disc and Discovery Regarding the iPad)(Solo, Alexander)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION to Strike the Surprise Expert Reports of John Levy, Ph.D. on the Purported Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,613,101 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall ISO Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit A to Randall Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Randall Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Randall Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Randall Declaration)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY RESPONSES by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall ISO of Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Randall Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Randall Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Randall Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Randall Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Randall Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Randall Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Randall Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Randall Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Randall Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Randall Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Randall Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Randall Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Randall Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Randall Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Randall Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 16 to Randall Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 17 to Randall Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 18 to Randall Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 19 to Randall Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 20 to Randall Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 21 to Randall Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 22 to Randall Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 23 to Randall Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 24 to Randall Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 25 to Randall Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 26 to Randall Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 27 to Randall Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 28 to Randall Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 29 to Randall Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 30 to Randall Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 31 to Randall Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 32 to Randall Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 33 Part 1 to Randall Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 33, Part 2 to Randall Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 34 to Randall Declaration, # 38 Exhibit 35 to Randall Declaration, # 39 Exhibit 36 to Randall Declaration, # 40 Exhibit 37 to Randall Declaration, # 41 Exhibit 38 to Randall Declaration, # 42 Exhibit 39 to Randall Declaration, # 43 Exhibit 40 to Randall Declaration, # 44 Exhibit 41 to Randall Declaration, # 45 Exhibit 42 to Randall Declaration, # 46 Exhibit 43 to Randall Declaration, # 47 Exhibit 44 to Randall Declaration, # 48 Exhibit 45 to Randall Declaration, # 49 Exhibit 46 to Randall Declaration)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to Response to PATENT Motion re 200 SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY by Apple Inc. to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion To Preclude Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions And To Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Randall Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Randall Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Randall Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Randall Declaration)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity, 200 SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 SEALED PATENT MOTION [RENEWED] FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall In Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 1, Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 1, Part 5, # 8 Exhibit 1, Part 6, # 9 Exhibit 1, Part 7, # 10 Exhibit 1, Part 8, # 11 Exhibit 1, Part 9, # 12 Exhibit 1, Part 10, # 13 Exhibit 2, # 14 Exhibit 3, # 15 Exhibit 4, # 16 Exhibit 5, # 17 Exhibit 6, # 18 Exhibit 7, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 9, # 21 Exhibit 10, # 22 Exhibit 11, # 23 Exhibit 12, # 24 Exhibit 13, # 25 Exhibit 14, # 26 Exhibit 15, # 27 Exhibit 16, # 28 Exhibit 17, Part 1, # 29 Exhibit 17, Part 2, # 30 Exhibit 17, Part 3, # 31 Exhibit 17, Part 4, # 32 Exhibit 17, Part 5, # 33 Exhibit 17, Part 6, # 34 Exhibit 17, Part 7, # 35 Exhibit 17, Part 8, # 36 Exhibit 17, Part 9, # 37 Exhibit 17, Part 10, # 38 Exhibit 17, Part 11, # 39 Exhibit 17, Part 12, # 40 Exhibit 17, Part 13, # 41 Exhibit 17, Part 14, # 42 Exhibit 17, Part 15, # 43 Exhibit 17, Part 16, # 44 Exhibit 17, Part 17, # 45 Exhibit 17, Part 18, # 46 Exhibit 17, Part 19, # 47 Exhibit 17, Part 20, # 48 Exhibit 18, # 49 Exhibit 19, # 50 Exhibit 20, Part 1, # 51 Exhibit 20, Part 2, # 52 Exhibit 20, Part 3, # 53 Exhibit 21, # 54 Exhibit 22, # 55 Exhibit 23, # 56 Exhibit 24, # 57 Exhibit 25, # 58 Exhibit 26, # 59 Exhibit 27, # 60 Exhibit 28, # 61 Exhibit 29)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 197 Motion for an Expedited Briefing Schedule and Expedited Consideration of Mirror Worlds' Motion to Preclude Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions and to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Steven K Feiner Regarding Invalidity. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/10. cc:attys 6-03-10 (mll, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 196 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity AND RENEWED MOTION for Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 1, Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 1, Part 5, # 8 Exhibit 1, Part 6, # 9 Exhibit 1, Part 7, # 10 Exhibit 1, Part 8, # 11 Exhibit 1, Part 9, # 12 Exhibit 1, Part 10, # 13 Exhibit 2, # 14 Exhibit 3, # 15 Exhibit 4, # 16 Exhibit 5, # 17 Exhibit 6, # 18 Exhibit 7, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 9, # 21 Exhibit 10, # 22 Exhibit 11, # 23 Exhibit 12, # 24 Exhibit 13, # 25 Exhibit 14, # 26 Exhibit 15, # 27 Exhibit 16, # 28 Exhibit 17, Part 1, # 29 Exhibit 17, Part 2, # 30 Exhibit 17, Part 3, # 31 Exhibit 17, Part 4, # 32 Exhibit 17, Part 5, # 33 Exhibit 17, Part 6, # 34 Exhibit 17, Part 7, # 35 Exhibit 17, Part 8, # 36 Exhibit 17, Part 9, # 37 Exhibit 17, Part 10, # 38 Exhibit 17, Part 11, # 39 Exhibit 17, Part 12, # 40 Exhibit 17, Part 13, # 41 Exhibit 17, Part 14, # 42 Exhibit 17, Part 15, # 43 Exhibit 17, Part 16, # 44 Exhibit 17, Part 17, # 45 Exhibit 17, Part 18, # 46 Exhibit 17, Part 19, # 47 Exhibit 17, Part 20, # 48 Exhibit 18, # 49 Exhibit 19, # 50 Exhibit 20, Part 1, # 51 Exhibit 20, Part 2, # 52 Exhibit 20, Part 3, # 53 Exhibit 21, # 54 Exhibit 22, # 55 Exhibit 23, # 56 Exhibit 24, # 57 Exhibit 25, # 58 Exhibit 26, # 59 Exhibit 27, # 60 Exhibit 28, # 61 Exhibit 29)(Randall, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule And Expedited Consideration of Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion For An Expedited Briefing Schedule And Expedited Consideration of Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity)(Solo, Alexander)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 195 Motion to Expedite submitted by Mirror Worlds, LLC. Document does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander Solo In Support of Mirror Worlds, LLCs Motion To Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit 24, # 29 Text of Proposed Order Granting Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Expedite The Briefing Schedule, to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity)(Solo, Alexander)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule And Expedited Consideration of Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion For An Expedited Briefing Schedule And Expedited Consideration of Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions And to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 6/2/2010 (mjc, ).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER striking 192 Sealed Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule, to Preclude Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions, and to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Steven K Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/01/10. cc:attys 6-01-10 (mll, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying 190 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Apple may refile its Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions in compliance with the page limits rules within one business day, otherwise the Court will only consider the motion to the extent it complies with the rules. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/01/10. cc:attys 6-01-10 (mll, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STRIKEN PER 194 ORDER SEALED MOTION Mirror Worlds LLCs Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule, to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions and to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 6/1/2010 (mll, ).
May 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey G. Randall, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 3, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 4, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 5, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 6, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 7, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 8, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 9, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 10, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 15, Part 1, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 15, Part 2, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 15, Part 3, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 33 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 34 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 35 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 36 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 37 Exhibit Ex. 24, # 38 Exhibit Ex. 25, # 39 Exhibit Ex. 26, # 40 Exhibit Ex. 27, # 41 Exhibit Ex. 28, # 42 Exhibit Ex. 29, # 43 Exhibit Ex. 30, # 44 Exhibit Ex. 31, # 45 Exhibit Ex. 32, # 46 Exhibit Ex. 33)(Randall, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Apple's Motion for Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ***Filed in Error. Please Disregard.*** MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule, to Preclude Apples Amended Invalidity Contentions and to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander Solo in Support of Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule, to Preclude Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions and to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 6/1/2010 (gsg).
May 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Expedite the Briefing Schedule, to Preclude Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions and to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Steven K. Feiner, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 6/1/2010 (gsg).
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S Christian Platt on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Platt, S)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order E-NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 at 9:00 AM has been continued and Jury Trial is reset to 9/20/2010 at 9:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (NOTE: Jury Selection on September 7, 2010 at 9:00 AM has not changed). (rlf, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Deadlines reset per 186 Amended Docket Control Order: Amended Pleadings due by 6/16/2010. Discovery due by 6/14/2010. Expert Witness List due by 5/20/2010; Rebuttal expert witnesses designated by 6-04-2010. Identify trial witnesses by 6/16/2010; Rebuttal trial witnesses identified by 6-21-2010. Jury instructions due by 8/2/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2010; Response to Dispositive Motions due 7-21-2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2010. (mll, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/12/10. cc:attys 5-12-10 (mll, )
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Solo, Alexander)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Proceedings held on 1/27/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 102 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2010. (sms, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines per 183 Order: Discovery due by 6/10/2010. Expert Witness List due by 5/13/2010; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 5-31-2010. (mll, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 181 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/10. cc:attys 4-02-10 (mll, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Allan M. Soobert and Jeffrey Randall for Apple, Inc. Attorney Sonal N Mehta; Matthew Douglas Powers; Sven Raz; Stefani C Smith; Carmen Elizabeth Bremer and Steven Scott Cherensky terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/10. cc:attys 4-02-10 (mll, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sven Raz for Apple, Inc.. (mll, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/16/10. cc:attys 2-17-10 (mll, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER that the parties each pay $23,100.00 to Michael McLemore for services through 2-01-2010 as the technical consultant to the Court, for a total amount of $46,200.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/10. cc:attys 1-29-10(mll, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 1.27.10 Minute Entry (MARKMAN): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 1/27/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REVISED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-5(d)filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 173 , Revised Joint Claim Construction Chart. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS NOT SIGNED AND DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.*** (mjc, )
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 172 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard H An terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/10. cc:attys 1-26-10 (mll, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** REVISED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-5(d)filed by Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 1/26/2010 (mjc, ).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard H. An by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard H. An)(Solo, Alexander)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC of Compliance With PR 4-5(d) (Carroll, Otis)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney submitted by Mirror Worlds, LLC. Proposed Order not separate attachment to Motion. Correction should be made by Next Business Day (kls, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - PROPOSED ORDER NOT SEPARATE ATTACHMENT*** Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard H. An by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Solo, Alexander) Modified on 1/25/2010 (kls, ).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 167 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit the joint claim construction chart is extended to 1-22-2010 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/22/10. cc:attys 1-22-10 (mll, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re 156 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under U.S.C. Section 112 paragraph 2 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Stefani)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY to 160 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Solo, Alexander)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 165 , Additional Attachments to Main Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: 151 Sealed Document, 160 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 1/19/2010 (mjc, ).
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY ISO APPLE'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple Inc. (Smith, Stefani)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re 156 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under U.S.C. Section 112 paragraph 2 filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Solo, Alexander)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc. Re: Estimated Time Requested For Markman (Smith, Stefani)
January 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RESPONSE BRIEF re 150 Apple's Claim Construction Brief, filed by Mirror Worlds. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Solo, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Solo, Alexander) Modified on 1/11/2010 (mll, ).
January 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RESPONSE BRIEF re: 151 Mirror Worlds' Claim Construction Brief, filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Stefani C. Smith ISO Apple's Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L)(Smith, Stefani) Modified on 1/11/2010 (mll, ).
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexander Solo for Mirror Worlds, LLC. (mll, )
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ian Gregg DiBernardo for Mirror Worlds, LLC. (mll, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order in part and reset discovery deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/22/09. cc:attys 12-23-09(mll, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Under U.S.C. Section 112 paragraph 2 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit lH, # 11 Exhibit I)(Cherensky, Steven)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 32 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 154, Joint Motion to Amended/Correct. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 32 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani) Modified on 12/22/2009 (kls, ).
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 152 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Parties are permitted to provide the Court with their technology tutorials on or before 12-22-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/09. cc:attys 12-22-09(mll, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 32 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order E-NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 1/28/2010 at 9:30 AM HAS BEEN CONTINUED AND MARKMAN HEARING IS RESET TO 1/27/2010 AT 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SEALED OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, filed by Mirror Worlds. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(An, Richard) Modified on 12/16/2009 (mll, ). Modified on 1/11/2010 (mll, ).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C - Part 1, # 5 Exhibit C - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit C - Part 3, # 7 Exhibit C - Part 4, # 8 Exhibit C - Part 5, # 9 Exhibit C - Part 6, # 10 Exhibit C - Part 7, # 11 Exhibit C - Part 8, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G - Part 1, # 16 Exhibit G - Part 2, # 17 Exhibit G - Part 3, # 18 Exhibit G - Part 4, # 19 Exhibit G - Part 5, # 20 Exhibit H)(Cherensky, Steven)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Frank Weil (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Weil)(Smith, Stefani)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/09. cc:attys 11-30-09 (mll, )
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File COMPLY WITH P.R. 4-3(d), 4-4, 4-5(a), 4-5(b) AND TO FILE ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(An, Richard)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Ivan Kavrukov (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Kavrukov)(Smith, Stefani)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to comply with Local Patent Rule 4-3(a)-(c) and (e) is extended to 11-16-2009; the deadline to comply with Patent Local Rule 4-3(d) is extended to 11-25-2009; and the discovery deadline for claim construction issues under Patent Local Rule 4-4 is extended to 12-17-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/09. cc:attys 11-17-09 (mll, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT pursuant to P.R. 4-3, filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Stefani)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-3 Statement and for Completion of Discovery Under P.R. 4-4 by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (An, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 132 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple's Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Stefani)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER appointing Michael T McLemore as technical advisor to the Court in this action, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and deft and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/09. cc:attys 11-03-09(mll, )
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall be permitted to comply with Local Patent Rule 4-3 on or before 11-13-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09 (mll, )
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION re Joint Submission of a Technical Advisor by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Stefani)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple's Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard An, # 2 Exhibit 1 to An Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to An Decl.)(An, Richard)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Parties to Comply with Patent Local Rule 4-3 by Apple, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REPORT of Mediation by Michael Philip Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re 132 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple's Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Sonal N. Mehta, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15)(Mehta, Sonal)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Stefani)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC of Compliance with P. R. 4-2 (An, Richard)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple's Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard An, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(An, Richard)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ANSWER to 113 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc..(An, Richard)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 129 Joint Motion of Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Mirror Worlds, LLC, Third-Party Defendant Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., and Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff Plaintiff Apple Inc. to extend: (1) Mirror Worlds and MWTs deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Apples Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (D.E. 113); and (2) the parties deadlines to comply with Patent Local Rule 4-2. Having considered the matter, and that it is agreed, the Court GRANTS the motion and extends (1) the time for Mirror Worlds, LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Apple Inc.s Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims and (2) for the parties to comply with P.R. 4-2 until September 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/24/2009. (kls, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mirror World's Response to Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims; and, Parties Deadline to Comply with Patent Local Rule 4-2, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 105 Sealed Motion to Dismiss Apple Inc's Infringement Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-22-09 (mll, )
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time. Mirror Worlds defts shall answer or otherwise respond to Apple's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims by 9-25-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/09. cc:attys 9-15-09(mll, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 113 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(An, Richard)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. (An, Richard)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Non-Opposition to Mirror Worlds, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Apple's Infringement Counterclaim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Stefani)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION re 105 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Infringement Counterclaim by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Stefani)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall be permitted to comply with Local Patent Rule 4-3 on or before 10-30-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/09. cc:attys 9-10-09 (mll, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (An, Richard)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Stefani)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 105 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Infringement Counterclaim; Responses due by 9/10/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/08/09. cc:attys 9-08-09(mll, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-3 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/03/09. cc:attys 9-03-09 (mll, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Infringement Counterclaim by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Extend Time to Comply with P.R. 4-1 by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/31/2009. (gsg)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Second Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Stefani)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 105 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Infringement Counterclaim ; Responses due by 9/3/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/09. cc:attys 8-26-09 (mll, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Infringement Counterclaim by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Eric Freeman (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Freeman)(Smith, Stefani)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Richard S. Milner (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Milner)(Smith, Stefani)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 86 Motion regarding the parties' prosecution bar dispute. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/09. cc:attys 8-11-09(mll, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Third-Party Defendant Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to 58 Counterclaim, Answer to Complaint by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc..(An, Richard)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Apple, Inc.'s Infringement Counterclaim by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 An Decl, # 2 An Decl Ex 1, # 3 An Decl Ex 2, # 4 An Decl Ex 3, # 5 An Decl Ex 4, # 6 An Decl Ex 5, # 7 An Decl Ex 6, # 8 An Decl Ex 7, # 9 An Decl Ex 8, # 10 An Decl Ex 9, # 11 An Decl Ex 10, # 12 An Decl Ex 11, # 13 Raich Decl, # 14 Raich Decl Ex 1, # 15 Raich Decl Ex 2, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/09. cc:attys 8-10-09(mll, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoenas to Yale University and Christopher Jones (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Yale University, # 2 Subpoena to Christopher Jones)(Smith, Stefani)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Agreed MOTION For Entry of Revised Agreed Protective Order re 99 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/7/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 21 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/3/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2009. (sms, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 86 Motion regarding the parties' prosecution bar dispute. The Court orders Mirror Worlds to resubmit an agreed version of its proposed protective order with additional stipulations. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/09. cc:attys 7-08-09 (mll, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Minute Entry -- 7.7.09 Motion Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2009 re 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Protective Order (Regarding the Parties' Prosecution Bar Dispute) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Biggs, Adam)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Notice of Recent Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Race, Deborah)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Return of Service Executed as to Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. on 6/5/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and the Court's June 12, 2009 Order (Smith, Stefani)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mirror Worlds LLC and Mirror Worlds Technologies Inc shall have until and including 8-10-09 to answer or otherwise respond to Apple's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/30/09. cc:attys 6-30-09(mll, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Apple's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(An, Richard)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order E-NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Protective Order (Regarding the Parties' Prosecution Bar Dispute) : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Protective Order (Regarding the Parties' Prosecution Bar Dispute) 91 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Cherensky, Steven)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Protective Order (Regarding the Parties' Prosecution Bar Dispute) filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (An, Richard)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 88 Joint Motion to Amend Discovery and Docket Control Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/15/2009. (gsg)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 87 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Amended Discovery and Docket Control Orders. The parties shall submit proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by June 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/15/2009. (gsg)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Amended Discovery And Docket Control Orders by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Protective Order (Regarding the Parties' Prosecution Bar Dispute) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 85, Motion to Amend/Correct. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED WITH A CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE.*** (mjc, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Protective Order (Regarding the Parties' Prosecution Bar Dispute) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven) Modified on 6/8/2009 (mjc, ).
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/04/09. cc:attys 6-04-09 (mll, )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.. (mll, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Joint MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Expedited Consideration of Motion to Amend Protective Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims; denying 78 Motion for Hearing. The Court orders Apple to file its Amended Answer and Counterclaims immediately. The Court also orders that Apple's infringement contentions for the 101 patent also be served immediately. The parties shall submit agreed proposed amended Discovery and Docket Control Orders integrating the 101 patent to the Court by 6-10-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/09. cc:attys 6-03-09 (mll, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control, Protective or Discovery Order filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/09. cc:attys 5-26-09(mll, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/09. cc:attys 5-26-09 (mll, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OF SUBPOENAS TO COOPER & DUNHAM LLC, JONES DAY AND NIXON & VANDERHYE (Attachments: # 1 Appendix SUBPOENA TO COOPER & DUNHAM LLC, # 2 Appendix SUBPOENA TO JONES DAY, # 3 Appendix SUBPOENA TO NIXON & VANDERHYE)(Smith, Stefani)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Subpoena to Julie Teodosio (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Julie Teodosio)(Mehta, Sonal)
March 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to David Gelernter (Smith, Stefani)
March 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Withdrawal of Subpoena to David Gelernter (Smith, Stefani)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to David Gelernter (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Subpoena to Gelernter)(Smith, Stefani)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Amend Discovery Order. The new deadline for the completion of the parties' rolling document productions is 5-15-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/18/09. cc:attys 2-18-09 (mll, )
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Discovery Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 68 .***NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. of Change of Firm Name, Address and Electronic Addresses (Amended) (Race, Deborah) Modified on 2/10/2009 (mjc, ).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 69 .***NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Notice of Change of Firm Name, Address and Electronic Addresses (Race, Deborah) Modified on 2/10/2009 (mjc ).
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Stefani)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Subpoena to Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc.)(Smith, Stefani)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoena to Scott Fertig (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Subpoena to Scott Fertig)(Smith, Stefani)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of K Gallagher)(Carroll, Otis)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance re Document Production (Smith, Stefani)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims; Responses due by 1/16/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/06/09. cc:attys 1-7-09 (mll, )
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Withdraw 48 First Amended Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/08. cc:attys 12-29-08(mll, )
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garland T Stephens terminated as counsel of record for Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/08. cc:attys 12-29-08 (mll, )
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds Technologies, Inc., Mirror Worlds, LLC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Sonal)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Mehta, Sonal)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw 48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Garland T. Stephens by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance (First Supplemental Initial Disclosures) (Smith, Stefani)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Apple Inc file a motion for leave to amend its answer within five days of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/18/08. cc:attys 12-18-08(mll, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time. The Discovery and Docket Control Orders are amended as follows: Deadline to comply with P.R. 3-4(a) and Start of Discovery Order document production is extended to 1-09-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/17/08. cc:attys 12-17-08 (mll, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Scott Cherensky on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Cherensky, Steven)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 APPLE'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds, LLC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Stefani)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 48 FOR CORRECT PLEADING APPLE's FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds, LLC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Stefani) Modified on 11/26/2008 (mll, ).
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 45 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) OF WITHDRAWAL OF SUBPOENA TO ABACUS VENTURES, LLC AND ABACUS VENTURES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Subpoenas)(Smith, Stefani)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Subpoenas to ABACUS VENTURES, LLC; ABACUS & ASSOCIATES, L.P.; ABACUS & ASSOCIATES INC.; ABACUS VENTURES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; RECOGNITION INTERFACE, LLC; PLAINFIELD SPECIALTY HOLDINGS I INC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Subpoenas)(Smith, Stefani)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Disclosure by Mirror Worlds, LLC (Carroll, Otis)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Smith, Stefani)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/08. (mjc )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Smith, Stefani)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/21/08. cc:attys 10-22-08 (mll, )
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Stefani)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard H An for Mirror Worlds, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-15367. Approved 10/3/08. (mjc )
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth L Stein for Mirror Worlds, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-15367. Approved 10/3/08. (mjc )
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Diamante for Mirror Worlds, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-15367. Approved 10/3/08. (mjc)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Subpoenas to Yale University, Dr. David Gelernter, Dr. Nicholas Carriero, Mr. Christopher Hatchell and Ms. Nancy Pellegrino (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Mehta, Sonal)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Michael Philip Patterson added as Mediator. Mediation is to be completed by 10-31-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/08. cc:attys 9-18-08(mll, )
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER setting Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2009; Respond to amended pleadings by 11-9-09. Discovery due by 6/4/2010. Expert Witness List due by 4/16/2010; Rebuttal expert witnesses identified by 5-14-2010. Identify trial witnesses by 6/11/2010; Rebuttal trial witnesses due 6-15-2010. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2008 for pltfs; 10-20-08 for defts. Jury instructions due by 7/23/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2010; Response to Dispositive Motions due 7-09-2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2010. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 1/28/2010 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Exhibits and Exhibit Lists due 9-13-2010. Expected Length of Trial is 5 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/08. cc:attys 9-18-08(mll, )
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Discovery Order and entering Agreed Discovery Order in furtherance of the management of the Court's docket under FRCP 16. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/10/08. (mjc )
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Discovery Agreed Motion for Entry of the Discovery Order and the Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit A -- Discovery Order, (2) Exhibit B -- (FILED IN ERROR) )(Smith, Stefani) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2008: # 3 Exhibit C -- Corrected Docket Control Order) (mll, ). Modified on 9/10/2008 (mll, ).
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Douglas Powers on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Powers, Matthew)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall be permitted to file their Agreed Discovery Order and Agreed Docket Control Order on or before 9-9-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/03/08. cc:attys 9-3-08 (mll, )
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Agreed Discovery Order and Agreed Docket Control Order by Mirror Worlds, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Of Compliance With Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Carroll, Otis)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit agreed docket control and discovery orders are extended to 9-2-08; the effective Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is deemed to be 9-2-08 for purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules; Apple's deadline for compliance with PR 3-3 and 3-4 is set for 10-20-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/08. cc:attys 7-29-08 (mll, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Continue deadlines. The deadline for pltf to comply with PR 3-1 and 3-2 are extended from 7-18-08 to 8-15-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/17/08. cc:attys 7-18-08 (mll, )
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting Jury Selection for 9/7/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis; Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis; Markman Hearing set for 1/28/2010 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis; Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties shall submit an agreed Docket Control and Discovery Order by 7-28-08. Pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures are due 7-18-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/17/08. cc:attys 7-18-08(mll, )
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION To Extend Deadlines In Compliance With P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 7/14/2008 (see document #19) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 7/14/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign In Sheet) (rlf, )
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carmen Elizabeth Bremer on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Bremer, Carmen)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Status Conference set for 7/14/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Judge Davis' Courtroom in Tyler. Purpose of the conference is to assign a claim construction hearing date and trial setting, and to determine whether parties will consent to trial before Judge Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/16/08. (mjc )
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Affirmative Defenses by Mirror Worlds, LLC.(Carroll, Otis)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds, LLC Notice Indicating the Case is Ready for a Scheduling Conference (Carroll, Otis)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Stephens, Garland)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Apple Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses And Counterclaims To Mirror Worlds, LLC'S Complaint For Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Stephens, Garland)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Stephens, Garland)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Mirror Worlds, LLC (Race, Deborah)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stefani C Smith for Apple, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-13426. Approved 4/15/08. (mjc )
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sonal N Mehta for Apple, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-13426. Approved 4/15/08. (mjc )
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC identifying Plainfield Specialty Holdings I, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Carroll, Otis)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC identifying Specialty Holdings I, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Carroll, Otis)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 5/21/2008. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc )
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Stephens, Garland)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Plaintiff to file a notice, within five days of Defendant's answer, that the case is ready for scheduling conference. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/28/08. (mjc)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 3/17/2008, answer due: 4/7/2008. (mjc )
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (fnt, )
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Leonard Davis. (mjc )
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carroll, Otis)
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1464716.), filed by Mirror Worlds, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1# 2 Exhibit No. 2# 3 Exhibit No. 3# 4 Exhibit No. 4# 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Otis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirror Worlds, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirror Worlds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?