Albritton v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Eric Albritton alleged that Defendant Richard Frenkel published a false and defamatory statement that Plaintiff had conspired with the Clerk of the US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas to feloniously alter official documents.

Plaintiff: Eric Albritton
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Richard Frenkel
Case Number: 6:2008cv00089
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Gregg
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 310 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own attys' fees and costs of Court. Defts shall deliver the agreed-upon consideration to Mr Albritton's Counsel within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 11/05/09. cc:attys 11-05-09(mll, )
November 4, 2009 Filing 310 MOTION to Dismiss by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, James)
September 24, 2009 Filing 306 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Jury Trial completed on 9/22/2009. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (bss, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 309 Plaintiff Exhibit List. (bss, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 308 Defense Exhibit List. (bss, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 307 Witness List. (bss, )
September 20, 2009 Filing 305 REPLY to Response to Motion re 302 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Babcock, Charles)
September 20, 2009 Filing 304 RESPONSE in Opposition re 302 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support, 303 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed) filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
September 18, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding motions 302 and 303 submitted by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. No proposed orders are attached. Correction should be made by 9/21/09. (mjc, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 303 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Renewed) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
September 17, 2009 Filing 302 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Brief in Support by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
September 16, 2009 Filing 301 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Sam Baxter by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2009: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER denying 299 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 09/11/09. cc:attys 9-11-09 (mll, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 299 Second MOTION in Limine by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 10, 2009 Filing 298 NOTICE by David. Maland, David Provines, Shelley Moore, Faye Thompson, Peggy Thompson, Cynthia Paar, Rhonda Lafitte, Rachel Wilson : Scope of Authorized Testimony for Federal Employee Witnesses (Submitted by the United States Attorney) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Touhy Regulations for the Courts, # 2 Exhibit 2: Plaintiff's Subpoena to David Maland, # 3 Exhibit Cisco Systems' Subpoenas to the clerk personnel, # 4 Exhibit 4: Patton Letter to Maland dated August 25, 2009, # 5 Exhibit 5: Defense Counsel Letter to Maland Dated July 28, 2009, # 6 Exhibit 6: Defense Counsel Letter to Maland dated July 1, 2009, # 7 Exhibit 7: Maland Letter to Patton dated August 31, 2009, # 8 Exhibit 8: Maland Letter to Patton Dated September 3, 2009, # 9 Exhibit 9: Maland Letter to Defense Counsel dated August 11, 2009)(Gibson, Thomas)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying 285 Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Michael Smith. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 09/08/09. cc:attys 9-08-09(mll, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 296 RESPONSE to Motion re 285 Opposed MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Michael Smith filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting 294 Motion to Designate Next Day Trial Witnesses. Parties are ordered to provide each other their witnesses for the following day not later than 5:00 p.m. on the day prior to such witnesses' testimony. With respect to the first day of trial, the pltf shall inform defense counsel of the pltf's first day witnesses not later than 5:00 p.m. on 9-11-2009. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 09/07/09. cc:attys 9-08-09 (mll, )
September 4, 2009 Filing 294 Opposed MOTION Designation of Next Day Trial Witnesses by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER re 205 Plaintiff's Objections to Deposition Testimony Designated by Defendant filed by Eric Albritton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 9/4/2009. (mjc, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER denying as moot 280 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 280 Motion for Protective Order regarding Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/4/09. (mjc, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re 285 Opposed MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena filed by Michael Smith. Defendants are ordered to file an expedited response to the motion by 3:00 p.m. 9/8/2009. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/4/09. (mjc, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Amended Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations and Cross Designations re 206 Notice filed by Mallun Yen, Richard Frenkel, Cisco Systems, Inc., John Noh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 9/4/2009. (gsg)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST re 199 Notice of Plaintiff's Corrected Exhibit List filed by Eric Albritton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 9/4/2009. (gsg)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER re 210 Notice of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Trial Exhibit List filed by Eric Albritton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 9/4/2009. (gsg)
September 3, 2009 Filing 286 RESPONSE to Motion re 280 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen MOTION for Protective Order from Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
September 3, 2009 Filing 285 Opposed MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena by Michael Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Lawrence)
September 1, 2009 Filing 292 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/1/2009. (Court Reporter Christi Humphries.) (tlh, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER RESETTING HEARING. For the convenience of the parties and in the interest of judicial economy, the Court will conduct tomorrow's hearing in Tyler. The hearing will be held at the US Courthouse in Tyler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 08/31/09. cc:attys 8-31-09(mll, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER that any evidence which admission is opposed shall be made available for inspection by the Court at the hearing scheduled for 9-01-09. If a party fails to make such evidence available to the Court, the objection to it will be sustained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 08/28/09. cc:attys 8-28-09(mll, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER re 280 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen MOTION for Protective Order from Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen filed by Mallun Yen, Cisco Systems, Inc., Mark Chandler. The Court orders Plaintiff to file an expedited response to the motion by 5:00 p.m. 9/4/2009. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 8/26/09. (mjc, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER SETTING A HEARING regarding remaining objections to exhibits and witnesses raised in the joint final pretrial order. Hearing is set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush at the U.S. Courthouse in Plano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 8/26/09. (mjc, )
August 25, 2009 Filing 280 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen, MOTION for Protective Order from Trial Subpoenas of Mark Chandler and Mallun Yen by Mark Chandler, Mallun Yen, Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2009: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg).
August 25, 2009 Filing 279 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Trial Subpoena for Michael Smith (Babcock, Charles)
August 25, 2009 Filing 278 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Trial Subpoena for Amie Mathis (Babcock, Charles)
August 21, 2009 Filing 277 Proposed Pretrial Order Amended Joint Final Pretrial Order by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E - Plaintiff's Exhibit List, # 6 Ex. F - Defendant's Exhibit List, # 7 Ex. G - Plaintiff's Witness List, Depo Designation and Cross Designations, # 8 Ex. H - Def's Objections to Plaintiff's Depo Designations, # 9 Ex. I - Defendant's Witness List, Depo Designations and Cross Designations, # 10 Ex. J - Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Depo Designations)(Patton, Nicholas)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER denying 272 Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 08/14/09. cc:attys 8-17-09 (mll, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting 274 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to comply with the Court's 6-05-09 Order to file a Revised Pretrial Order shall be extended to 8-21-09. The court will not consider any further extensions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 08/14/09. cc:attys 8-14-09 (mll, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 274 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Pretrial Order by Eric Albritton, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
August 6, 2009 Filing 273 RESPONSE in Opposition re 272 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
July 21, 2009 Filing 272 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas by Bart Showalter, Kurt Pankratz, Jillian Powell. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheavens, Joseph)
July 21, 2009 Filing 271 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoenas Served (Attachments: # 1 Jillian Powell - Proof of Service, # 2 Kurt Pankratz - Proof of Service, # 3 Bart Showalter - Proof of Service)(Patton, Nicholas)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting 269 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to comply with the Court's Order 266 denying motions for reconsideration is extended to 8-14-09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 07/07/09. cc:attys 7-08-09(mll, )
July 6, 2009 Filing 269 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Pretrial Order by Eric Albritton, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
July 2, 2009 Filing 268 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Amended Subpoena (Babcock, Charles)
June 18, 2009 Filing 267 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Lafitte Subpoena, # 2 Maland Subpoena, # 3 Moore Subpoena, # 4 Paar Subpoena, # 5 Provines Subpoena, # 6 F. Thompson Subpoena, # 7 P. Thompson Subpoena, # 8 Wilson Subpoena)(Babcock, Charles)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying 262 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 263 Motion for Reconsideration. The parties are ordered to confer and make a good faith effort to reduce the number of exhibits and deposition excerpts to be offered at trial, and the number of objections to the remaining exhibits and deposition excerpts that will be offered at trial. The parties shall accomplish this within 30 days from the entry of this order. Parties are further ordered to file a revised joint final pretrial order that conforms with the orders of the court and includes a reduction in the number of, and objections to, exhibits and deposition excerpts with 30 days from the entry of this order. Any objections to exhibits and deposition excerpts that remain unresolved shall be referred to US Magistrate Judge Don D Bush for disposition. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 06/05/09. cc:attys 6-8-09 (mll, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 265 RESPONSE to Motion re 263 MOTION for Reconsideration re 254 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1)(Patton, Nicholas)
May 26, 2009 Filing 264 RESPONSE to Motion re 262 MOTION for Reconsideration re 259 Order on Motion in Limine MOTION for Reconsideration re 259 Order on Motion in Limine filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 18, 2009 Filing 263 MOTION for Reconsideration re 254 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
May 18, 2009 Filing 262 MOTION for Reconsideration re 259 Order on Motion in Limine by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6, # 7 Ex. 7, # 8 Ex. 8, # 9 Ex. 9, # 10 Ex. 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER that parties file any motions to reconsider the court's 5-08-09 orders by 5-18-09 (Motions to Reconsider due by 5/18/2009). Responses to any motions to reconsider shall be filed by 5-25-09. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM in Tyler, before Judge Richard A. Schell. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 05/11/09. cc:attys 5-12-09(mll, )
May 11, 2009 Filing 260 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/11/2009. Jury Selection and Trial scheduled for 9/14/09 at 9:00 AM in Tyler, TX. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (bss, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 192 Motion in Limine.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 05/08/2009. (bss, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 05/08/09. cc:attys 5-8-09 (mll, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying 185 Motion to Impanel a Twelve Person Jury. The court will impanel a ten person jury in this case. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 05/08/09. cc:attys 5-8-09 (mll, )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER denying 186 Motion for entry of non-waiver order; denying 208 Motion for entry of non-waiver order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 05/08/09. cc:attys 5-8-09 (mll, )
May 8, 2009 Filing 255 RESPONSE to 253 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to Portions of the Joint Pre-Trial Order by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6)(Patton, Nicholas)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER denying 152 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 05/08/09. cc:attys 5-8-09 (mll, )
April 24, 2009 Filing 253 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel re 189 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Objections to Portions of the Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles)
April 22, 2009 Filing 252 NOTICE OF HEARING (Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2009 03:00 PM before Judge Richard A. Schell.) Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/22/2009. (gsg)
April 17, 2009 Filing 251 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel re 247 Proposed Jury Instructions Objections to and Arguement in Support of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Babcock, Charles)
April 17, 2009 Filing 250 NOTICE by Eric Albritton re 247 Proposed Jury Instructions Plaintiff's Briefing and Argument in Support of His Proposed Jury Instructions (Patton, Nicholas)
April 16, 2009 Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/24/2009 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. (per 249 Notice of Hearing) (mll, )
April 16, 2009 Filing 249 NOTICE resetting Final Pretrial Conference to 4-24-09 at 10:00 a.m. in Plano, Texas. (mll, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 246 Motion for Discovery. Defts are granted leave to reopen discovery to take the deposition of Michelle Albritton and the motion to dismiss deft's Motion in Limine No. 2 is also GRANTED. The court notes that Motion in Limine No. 2 is not a separate motion, but a part of docket entry 191. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 04/15/09. cc:attys 4-15-09 (mll, )
April 14, 2009 Filing 247 Proposed Jury Instructions by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
April 14, 2009 Filing 246 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery to Reopen Discovery to Take Deposition of Michelle Albritton and Motion to Dismiss as Moot Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 244 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit their joint proposed jury instructions no later than 4-14-09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 04/13/09. cc:attys 4-14-09 (mll, )
April 10, 2009 Filing 244 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Jury Instructions and Verdict Form by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 242 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall submit their joint proposed jury instructions no later than 4-10-2009. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 04/03/09. cc:attys 4-3-09 (mll, )
April 2, 2009 Filing 242 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Jury Instructions and Verdict Form by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 240 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 04/01/09. cc:attys 4-01-09 (mll, )
March 31, 2009 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
March 31, 2009 Filing 239 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 186 MOTION for entry of Non-Waiver Order filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 234 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defts are granted leave to file their Reply to pltf's Opposition to Cisco's Motion for Entry of Non-Waiver Order in excess of the page limit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 03/19/09. cc:attys 3-19-09 (mll, )
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 232 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defts are granted leave to file their Sur-Reply to pltf's Reply to defts' Response to pltf's Motion in limine in excess of the page limit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 03/19/09. cc:attys 3-19-09 (mll, )
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 230 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Pltf is granted leave to file his Surreply to defts' Motion in limine in excess of the page limit, not to exceed a total of 15 pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 03/18/09. cc:attys 3-19-09 (mll, )
March 18, 2009 Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re 186 MOTION for entry of Non-Waiver Order filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles)
March 18, 2009 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 18, 2009 Filing 233 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION in Limine filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H)(Babcock, Charles)
March 18, 2009 Filing 232 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 13, 2009 Filing 231 RESPONSE to Motion re 208 MOTION Entry of Non Waiver Order filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
March 13, 2009 Filing 230 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendants' Motion in Limine by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
March 13, 2009 Filing 229 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 191 MOTION in Limine filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Patton, Nicholas)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting 220 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/12/2009. (kls, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 226 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 3/12/2009. (kls, )
March 9, 2009 Filing 226 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
March 9, 2009 Filing 225 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 192 MOTION in Limine filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
March 6, 2009 Filing 224 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re 143 Order on Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
March 5, 2009 Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re 186 MOTION for entry of Non-Waiver Order filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas)
March 5, 2009 Filing 222 RESPONSE to Motion re 185 MOTION Impanel twelve person jury filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
March 3, 2009 Filing 221 REPLY to Response to Motion re 191 MOTION in Limine filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles)
March 3, 2009 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
March 3, 2009 Filing 219 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Austin Wells on behalf of David. Maland, David Provines, Shelley Moore, Faye Thompson, Peggy Thompson, Cynthia Paar, Rhonda Lafitte, Rachel Wilson (Wells, Robert)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 216 Motion to Seal. The clerk shall place Exhibit #4 of pltf's Response to deft's Motion in limine under seal. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 03/02/09. cc:attys 3-3-09 (mll, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ***SEALED ORDER UNSEALED PER JUDGE SCHELL ON 5/11/2009.*** Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part (97) defts' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part (115) pltf's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court also DENIES the following motions: (111) Motion to strike summary judgment evidence; (121) Motion to strike pltf's amended (corrected) response to defts' motion for summary judgment; (122) Motion to strike pltf's cross-motion for summary judgment; (123) Motion to strike pltf's evidence cited in response to defts' motion for summary judgment; (154) Motion to strike with respect to pltf's sur-reply to defts' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 02/27/09. cc:attys 2-27-09(mll, ) Modified on 5/8/2009 (bss, ). Modified on 5/11/2009 (mjc, ).
February 27, 2009 Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Ex. No. 4 to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying as moot 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 118 Motion for Hearing; denying 119 Motion for Hearing. If defts require a ruling from the court on the issue of personal jurisdiction, the parties may re-urge their motions with the court by 3-25-09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 02/27/09. cc:attys 2-27-09 (mll, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER resetting Final Pretrial Conference for 4/24/2009 01:00 PM before Judge Richard A. Schell, in Plano, Texas. All trial subpoenas are hereby QUASHED; granting 169 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas to Non Party Witnesses filed by Kurt Pankratz, Douglas Kubehl, Jillian Powell, Kevin Meek, Bart Showalter; granting 207 MOTION to Quash filed by Faye Thompson, David. Maland, Cynthia Paar, Peggy Thompson, David Provines, Rhonda Lafitte, Shelley Moore, Rachel Wilson. Parties are ordered to file joint proposed jury instructions and a verdict form by 4-3-09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 02/27/09. cc:attys 2-27-09(mll, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting 211 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Pltf is granted leave to file his Response to Defts' Motion in Limine in excess of the page limit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 02/27/09. cc:attys 2-27-09(mll, )
February 26, 2009 Filing 212 ***CORRECTED ENTRY. REPLACES 203 .***NOTICE by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel re 189 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 2/27/2009 (mjc, ).
February 26, 2009 Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 26, 2009 Filing 210 ***CORRECTED ENTRY. REPLACES 204 .***NOTICE by Eric Albritton re 189 Proposed Pretrial Order Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Trial Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 2/27/2009 (mjc, ).
February 26, 2009 Filing 209 RESPONSE in Opposition re 169 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas to Non Party Witnesses filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 26, 2009 Filing 208 MOTION Entry of Non Waiver Order by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Non Waiver Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 26, 2009 ***NOTICE OF DOCKETING ERROR/DEFICIENCY. Document # 204, Motion to Strike. ATTORNEY TO EITHER SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER PER LOCAL RULES OR REFILE DOCUMENT USING CORRECTED EVENT CODE.*** (mjc, )
February 26, 2009 ***NOTICE OF DOCKETING ERROR/DEFICIENCY. Document # 203, Motion to Strike. ATTORNEY TO EITHER SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER PER LOCAL RULES OR REFILE DOCUMENT USING CORRECTED EVENT CODE.*** (mjc, )
February 26, 2009 Filing 207 MOTION to Quash by David. Maland, David Provines, Shelley Moore, Faye Thompson, Peggy Thompson, Cynthia Paar, Rhonda Lafitte, Rachel Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Declaration by David Maland, # 2 Exhibit 2: Bret Saxe Ltr 10-27-08, with Regs, # 3 Exhibit 3: Cisco Systems Req for Testimony 10-28-08, # 4 Exhibit 4: Maland Letter 10-29-08, # 5 Exhibit 5: Cisco counsel letter 10-30-08, # 6 Exhibit 6: Maland Letter 10-31-08, # 7 Exhibit 7: Excerpts of Movant's Depositions (7.a.-7.h.), # 8 Exhibit 8: Defendant's Request for Testimony 01-29-09, # 9 Exhibit 9: Maland Ltr to Defendants' counsel 02-18-09, # 10 Exhibit 10: Maland Ltr to Defendants' Counsel 02-23-09, # 11 Exhibit 11: Defendants' counsels ltr to Maland 02-25-09, # 12 Exhibit 12: Maland ltr to Plaintiff's counsel 02-18-09, # 13 Exhibit 13: Plaintiff's counsel's email to Maland 02-22-09, # 14 Exhibit 14: Maland ltr to Plaintiff's counsel 02-23-09, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Thomas)
February 25, 2009 Filing 206 NOTICE by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel of objections to deposition designations (Attachments: # 1 continuation)(Babcock, Charles)
February 25, 2009 Filing 205 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Deposition Testimony (Patton, Nicholas)
February 25, 2009 Filing 204 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED ENTRY 210 .*** MOTION to Strike 189 Proposed Pretrial Order Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Trial Exhibits by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 2/27/2009 (mjc, ).
February 25, 2009 Filing 203 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED ENTRY 212 .*** MOTION to Strike 189 Proposed Pretrial Order Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 2/27/2009 (mjc, ).
February 24, 2009 Filing 202 ***EXHIBIT 4 SEALED PER ORDER 218 ***RESPONSE to Motion re 191 MOTION in Limine filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5)(Patton, Nicholas) Modified on 3/12/2009 (mjc, ).
February 24, 2009 Filing 201 RESPONSE to Motion re 192 MOTION in Limine filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 24, 2009 Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Babcock, Charles)
February 24, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 197, Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED IN SEARCHABLE PDF.*** (mjc, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 199 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Plaintiff's Corrected Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Ex. G)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 196 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Deposition Designations to 2/25/09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/23/09. (mjc )
February 23, 2009 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for Monday, 3/2/2009 03:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. (dm, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 197 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***
February 20, 2009 Filing 196 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Deposition Designations by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 19, 2009 Filing 195 RESPONSE to 187 Proposed Jury Instructions (Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions) by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 19, 2009 Filing 194 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 2/26/2009 (mjc, ).
February 19, 2009 Final Pretrial Hearing scheduled for Monday, 3/2/2009 at 3:00 pm will be held at U. S. District Courthouse, 7940 Preston Road, Plano, TX 75024. (dm, )
February 19, 2009 Filing 193 NOTICE of Hearing:Final Pretrial Conference set for Monday, 3/2/2009 03:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. (dm, )
February 18, 2009 Filing 192 MOTION in Limine by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 18, 2009 Filing 191 MOTION in Limine by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 18, 2009 Filing 190 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Amie Mathis (Babcock, Charles)
February 18, 2009 Filing 189 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Final Pretrial Order by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 17, 2009 Filing 188 Proposed Jury Instructions by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 17, 2009 Filing 187 Proposed Jury Instructions by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles)
February 17, 2009 Filing 186 MOTION for entry of Non-Waiver Order by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 17, 2009 Filing 185 MOTION Impanel twelve person jury by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
February 12, 2009 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re 143 Order on Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 12, 2009 Filing 183 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Kevin Meek (Patton, Nicholas)
February 12, 2009 Filing 182 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Faye Thompson (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 180 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Douglas Kubehl (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Jillian Powell (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - David Provines (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 177 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Rachel Wilson (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 176 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Amie Mathis (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 175 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Cynthia Paar (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Rhonda LaFitte (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 173 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Kurt Pankratz (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 172 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Shelley Moore (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 171 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Peggy Thompson (Patton, Nicholas)
February 11, 2009 Filing 170 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Notice of Subpoena Served - Bart Showalter (Patton, Nicholas)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time, and extending time to 2-16-09 to file Joint Pre-trial Order, Exhibit Lists, Proposed Jury Instructions and Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 02/10/09. cc:attys 2-11-09(mll, )
February 10, 2009 Filing 169 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas to Non Party Witnesses by Bart Showalter, Kevin Meek, Douglas Kubehl, Kurt Pankratz, Jillian Powell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph D. Cheavens in Support of Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas, # 2 Exhibits 1-4 to Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas)(Cheavens, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2009: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
February 9, 2009 Filing 168 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Order by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
February 5, 2009 Filing 167 RESPONSE to Motion re 154 MOTION to Strike 130 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 130 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 3, 2009 Filing 166 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION to Strike 115 Sealed Response to Motion, (Replaces DE #161 per Clerk's notice) filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
February 3, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 161 Plaintiff's Sur-Reply submitted by Eric Albritton. Document is over page limit. Correction should be made by 2/4/09. (mjc )
February 2, 2009 Filing 165 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 30, 2009 Filing 164 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 29, 2009 Filing 163 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Rhonda Lafitte (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 162 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to David Maland (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 161 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION to Strike 115 Sealed Response to Motion,, filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 29, 2009 Filing 160 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Shelly Moore (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 159 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Rachel Wilson (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 158 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Peggy Thompson (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 157 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Faye Thomopson (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 156 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to David Provines (Babcock, Charles)
January 29, 2009 Filing 155 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Cynthia Paar (Babcock, Charles)
January 28, 2009 Filing 154 MOTION to Strike 130 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
January 28, 2009 Filing 153 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 142 .***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 111 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Objections and Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 1/29/2009 (mjc, ).
January 28, 2009 Filing 152 MOTION for Reconsideration re 143 Order on Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER withdrawing 135 Order Referring Case to Second Mediation. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 01/16/09. cc:attys 1-26-09(mll, )
January 22, 2009 Filing 150 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. Certificate of Conference added to Document # 118 and 119, Motions for Hearing. *** (mjc )
January 20, 2009 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
January 20, 2009 Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles)
January 20, 2009 Filing 147 REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles)
January 20, 2009 CLERK SEALED EXHIBIT A TO DOCUMENT 146 because it was not sealed when filed by the attorney (mjc )
January 20, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 145, Response to Motion. TO BE REFILED IN SEARCHABLE PDF FORMAT. PLEASE IGNORE.***(mjc )
January 19, 2009 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 1/20/2009 (kls, ).
January 16, 2009 Filing 145 ***PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED.***RESPONSE to Motion re 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 1/20/2009 (mjc ).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying as moot 88 Motion to Compel; granting 104 Amended Motion to Compel. Pltf Eric Albritton is ordered to fully answer Interrogatories 1-5 within 5 days of this order. Counsel for Albritton should follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and expected local practice in this District. Deft is granted an additional 10 days after actual receipt of the answers to supplement its evidence. No further argument or briefs are allowed on this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 01/15/09. cc:attys 1-16-09 (mll, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 01/15/09. cc:attys 1-16-09 (mll, )
January 15, 2009 Filing 142 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT LINK. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 153 ***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 1/29/2009 (mjc, ).
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 138 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 01/14/09. cc:attys 1-14-09 (mll, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: 88 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.; 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.; 104 Amended MOTION to Compel filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Motions REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush for disposition. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 01/13/09. cc:attys 1-14-09(mll, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Richard A. Schell. Jury instructions due by 2/9/2009. Motions in limine due by 2/18/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2009. Video Deposition Designations due 2/9/2009; Trial Exhibits due 2/18/2009. The Agreed Motion to Extend Pretrial Filing Deadlines Subject to Court Approval 128 is granted. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 1/12/09. (mjc )
January 13, 2009 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 12, 2009 Filing 137 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 104 Amended MOTION to Compel filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia L. Peden, # 2 Ex. 1 to Peden Declaration, # 3 Ex. 2 to Peden Declaration, # 4 Ex. 3 to Peden Declaration, # 5 Ex. 4 to Peden Declaration, # 6 Ex. 5 to Peden Declaration, # 7 Ex. A, # 8 Ex. B, # 9 Ex. C, # 10 Ex. D)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 01/09/09. cc:attys 1-9-09 (mll, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 WITHDRAWN PER 151 ORDER ORDER referring this case to Second Mediation. The mediator currently assigned is former US Magistrate Judge Robert W. Faulkner. The mediation conference shall be conducted by 2-16-09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 01/09/09. cc:attys 1-9-09(mll, ) Modified on 1/26/2009 (mll, ).
January 8, 2009 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 8, 2009 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex.)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 7, 2009 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re 121 MOTION to Strike 115 Sealed Response to Motion,, filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 6, 2009 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 6, 2009 Filing 130 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Albritton Declaration, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4, # 6 Ex. 5)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 5, 2009 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re 111 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Objections and Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
January 5, 2009 Filing 128 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 Scheduling Order, Agreed Motion to Extend Pretrial Filing Deadlines Subject to Court Approval by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
January 2, 2009 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 Amended MOTION to Compel filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Charles)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 120 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defts are granted leave to file their Reply to pltf's Response to Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment in excess of the page limit. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/29/08. cc:attys 12-29-08 (mll, )
December 24, 2008 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42, # 2 Exhibit 43, # 3 Exhibit 44)(Babcock, Charles)
December 24, 2008 Filing 124 RESPONSE to Motion re 111 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Objections and Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 24, 2008 Filing 123 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Evidence Cited in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 24, 2008 Filing 122 MOTION to Strike 112 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 24, 2008 Filing 121 MOTION to Strike 115 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 24, 2008 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 24, 2008 Filing 119 MOTION for Hearing re 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mallun Yen. (Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2009: # 2 Certificate of Conference) (mjc, ).
December 24, 2008 Filing 118 MOTION for Hearing re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Noh. (Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2009: # 2 Certificate of Conference) (mjc, ).
December 23, 2008 Filing 117 CORRECTED Witness List by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
December 19, 2008 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 Amended MOTION to Compel filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 19, 2008 Filing 115 SEALED CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6, # 7 Ex. 7, # 8 Ex. 8, # 9 Ex. 9, # 10 Ex. 10, # 11 Ex. 11, # 12 Ex. 12, # 13 Ex. 13, # 14 Ex. 14, # 15 Ex. 15, # 16 Ex. 16, # 17 Ex. 17, # 18 Ex. 18, # 19 Ex. 19, # 20 Ex. 20, # 21 Ex. 21, # 22 Ex. 22, # 23 Ex. 23, # 24 Ex. 24, # 25 Ex. 25, # 26 Ex. 26, # 27 Ex. 27, # 28 Ex. 28, # 29 Ex. 29, # 30 Ex. 30, # 31 Ex. 31, # 32 Ex. 32, # 33 Ex. 33, # 34 Ex. 34, # 35 Ex. 35, # 36 Ex. 36, # 37 Ex. 37, # 38 Ex. 38)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/17/08. cc:attys 12-18-08 (mll, )
December 15, 2008 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 15, 2008 Filing 112 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Albritton Declaration, # 2 Ex. 2 - Baxter Declaration, # 3 Ex. 3 - Brucculeri Declaration, # 4 Ex. 4 - Carroll Declaration, # 5 Ex. 5 - Peden Declaration, # 6 Ex. 6 - Williams Declaration, # 7 Ex. 7, # 8 Ex. 8, # 9 Ex. 9, # 10 Ex. 10, # 11 Ex. 11, # 12 Ex. 12 - Maland Depo - Part 1, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Part 2 - Maland Depo Exhibits, # 14 Ex. 14, # 15 Ex. 15, # 16 Ex. 16, # 17 Ex. 17, # 18 Ex. 18, # 19 Ex. 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Ex. 21, # 22 Ex. 22, # 23 Ex. 23, # 24 Ex. 24, # 25 Ex. 25, # 26 Ex. 26, # 27 Ex. 27, # 28 Ex. 28, # 29 Ex. 29, # 30 Ex. 30, # 31 Ex. 31, # 32 Ex. 32, # 33 Ex. 33, # 34 Ex. 34, # 35 Ex. 35, # 36 Ex. 36, # 37 Ex. 37, # 38 Ex. 38, # 39 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 15, 2008 Filing 111 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Objections and Motion to Strike Summary Judgment Evidence by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 8, 2008 Filing 110 trial witnesses Witness List by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles)
December 8, 2008 Filing 109 RESPONSE to Motion re 88 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses filed by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
December 5, 2008 Reset Final Pretrial Conference for 3/2/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Richard A. Schell (per 108 Order). (mll, )
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Responses due by 12/15/2008. As a result of this postponement of the response, the final pretrial is hereby reset for 3-02-09. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/05/08. cc:attys 12-05-08 (mll, )
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Unseal Document 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment, 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 99 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 100 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 101 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 102 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 12/05/08. cc:attys 12-05-08 (mll, )
December 4, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
December 3, 2008 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 99 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 102 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 101 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 100 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment filed by Mallun Yen, Richard Frenkel, Cisco Systems, Inc., John Noh Nos. 97-102 by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 2, 2008 Filing 104 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 96 ***Amended MOTION to Compel by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order on Amended Motion to Compel)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 12/2/2008 (mjc ).
December 1, 2008 Filing 103 Trial Witness List by Eric Albritton. (Patton, Nicholas)
November 26, 2008 Filing 102 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment. (Babcock, Charles) (UNSEALED PER 107 ORDER) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mll, ).
November 26, 2008 Filing 101 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38, # 8 Exhibit 39, # 9 Exhibit 40, # 10 Exhibit 41)(Babcock, Charles)(UNSEALED PER 107 ORDER) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mll, ).
November 26, 2008 Filing 100 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21/2, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27, # 8 Exhibit 28, # 9 Exhibit 29, # 10 Exhibit 30)(Babcock, Charles)(UNSEALED PER 107 ORDER) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mll, ).
November 26, 2008 Filing 99 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 98 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 18, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20)(Babcock, Charles)(UNSEALED PER 107 ORDER) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mll, ).
November 26, 2008 Filing 98 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10)(Babcock, Charles)(UNSEALED PER 107 ORDER) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mll, ).
November 26, 2008 Filing 97 MOTION For Summary Judgment by Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1/1, # 2 Exhibit 1/2, # 3 Exhibit 1/4, # 4 Exhibit 1/4, # 5 Exhibit 1/5, # 6 Exhibit 1/6, # 7 Exhibit 1/7, # 8 Exhibit 1/8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 2)(Babcock, Charles) (UNSEALED PER 107 ORDER) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mll, ).
November 26, 2008 Filing 96 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 104 ***Amended MOTION to Compel by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Cisco System, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 12/2/2008 (mjc ).
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 11/25/08. cc:attys 11-26-08(mll, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Withdraw 86 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Subpoena Issued to John Ward, Jr.. Motion is withdrawn without prejudice, but may be refiled as timely if Cisco believes that Ward's document production is inadeqate. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 11/25/08. cc:attys 11-26-08 (mll, )
November 25, 2008 Filing 93 MOTION to Withdraw 86 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Subpoena Issued to John Ward, Jr. WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 21, 2008 Filing 92 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Subpoena of Kevin Meeks (Amended) (Patton, Nicholas)
November 21, 2008 Filing 91 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Subpoena of Jillian Powell (Amended) (Patton, Nicholas)
November 21, 2008 Filing 90 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Subpoena of Bart Showalter (Amended) (Patton, Nicholas)
November 21, 2008 Filing 89 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Subpoena of Kurt Pankratz (Amended) (Patton, Nicholas)
November 20, 2008 Filing 88 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 20, 2008 Filing 87 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY REFILED AS DOCKET #88 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 11/24/2008 (kls, ).
November 19, 2008 Filing 86 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Subpoena Issued to John Ward, Jr. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 18, 2008 Filing 85 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline by Eric Albritton, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2008 Filing 84 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Amended Subpoena - Beatrice Nguyen (Patton, Nicholas)
November 17, 2008 Filing 83 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Amended Subpoena - J. Anthony Downs (Patton, Nicholas)
November 17, 2008 Filing 82 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Answers and Objections to Cisco System, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Holmes, James)
November 14, 2008 Filing 81 NOTICE by Eric Albritton of Subpoena to J. Anthony Downs (Patton, Nicholas)
November 14, 2008 Filing 80 NOTICE by Eric Albritton of Subpoena to Beatrice Nguyen (Patton, Nicholas)
November 13, 2008 Filing 79 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Second Amended Notice of Subpoena of Michael Smith (Babcock, Charles)
November 12, 2008 Filing 78 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Patton, Nicholas)
November 12, 2008 Filing 77 NOTICE of Disclosure by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Second Supplemental Disclosure (Patton, Nicholas)
November 4, 2008 Filing 76 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Babcock, Charles)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled Highly Confidential Pursuant to theProtective Order. Ordered that Plaintiff's motion 21 is withdrawn with prejudice to refiling as agreed by the parties. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 11/3/08. (mjc )
October 31, 2008 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Nicholas)
October 29, 2008 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re 72 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 28, 2008 Filing 72 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, James)
October 27, 2008 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia L Peden on behalf of Eric Albritton (Peden, Patricia)
October 27, 2008 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas H Patton on behalf of Eric Albritton (Patton, Nicholas)
October 24, 2008 Filing 69 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel SUPPLEMENTAL (Babcock, Charles)
October 22, 2008 Filing 68 MOTION to Compel (PACER Doc. #55) ADDENDUM - CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
October 17, 2008 Filing 67 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Michael Smith (Amended) (Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 66 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Louis Brucceleri (Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 65 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Otis Carroll (Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 64 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Danny Williams (Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Samuel Baxter (Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 62 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena of Elizabeth DeRieux (Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Filing 61 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena on Bart Showalter (Holmes, James)
October 15, 2008 Filing 60 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena on Steve Schortgen (Holmes, James)
October 15, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena on Jillian Powell (Holmes, James)
October 15, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena on Kevin Meeks (Holmes, James)
October 15, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena (Holmes, James)
October 15, 2008 Filing 56 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena on John Ward, Jr. (Babcock, Charles)
October 14, 2008 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties shall complete all discovery in this case by 11-20-08. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 10/12/08. cc:attys 10-14-08 (mll, )
October 9, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of First Supplemental Disclosures (Holmes, James)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONFIRMING APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR. Robert W Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 10/07/08. cc:attys 10-07-08(mll, )
October 3, 2008 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of the Discovery Deadline by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, James)
September 29, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Shelly Moore (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 49 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Rhonda Lafitte (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 48 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Rachel Wilson (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 47 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Peggy Thompson (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Michael Smith (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Mae Velvin (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to David Provines (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to David Maland (Babcock, Charles)
September 29, 2008 Filing 42 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Amie Mathis (Babcock, Charles)
September 8, 2008 Filing 41 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mallun Yen, John Noh. (Babcock, Charles)
September 5, 2008 Filing 40 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Holmes, James)
September 2, 2008 Filing 39 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, James)
August 18, 2008 Filing 38 ANSWER to 17 Complaint Subject to her Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mallun Yen.(Babcock, Charles)
August 18, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mallun Yen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mallun Yen)(Babcock, Charles)
August 18, 2008 Filing 36 ANSWER to 17 Complaint Subject to his Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by John Noh.(Babcock, Charles)
August 18, 2008 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Noh. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Babcock, Charles)
August 15, 2008 Filing 34 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Holmes, James)
August 11, 2008 Filing 33 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, In the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Babcock, Charles)
August 8, 2008 Filing 32 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, In the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Holmes, James)
August 6, 2008 Filing 31 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOC # 32 FOR CORRECT PLEADING SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, 21 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, In the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order filed by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Holmes, James) Modified on 8/8/2008 (mll, ).
August 5, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena (Holmes, James)
August 5, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE by Eric Albritton Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoena (Holmes, James)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Pltf shall reply to Cisco's Response to pltf's motion challenging the designation of certain documents labeled as highly confidential on or before 8-6-08. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 08/04/08. cc:attys 8-5-08 (mll, )
July 30, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmes, James)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER resetting Final Pretrial Conference for 2/2/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Richard A. Schell. Mediation should take place by 12-1-08. If the parties agree on a mediator, they shall so notify the court by 10-1-08. Otherwise, the court will select a mediator. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 07/25/08. cc:attys 7-25-08(mll, )
July 18, 2008 Filing 25 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 21 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, In the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Babcock, Charles)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Schell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 7/11/08. (mjc )
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Leonard Davis recused. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/10/08. (mjc)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael H. Schneider recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedingsSigned by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/9/2008. (gsg)
July 7, 2008 Filing 21 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 75 *** SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion Challenging the Designation of Certain Documents Labeled "Highly Confidential" Pursuant to the Protective Order or, In the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Order by Eric Albritton. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4, # 6 Ex. 5, # 7 Ex. 6, # 8 Ex. 7)(Holmes, James) Modified on 11/4/2008 (mjc ).
June 25, 2008 Filing 20 ANSWER to 17 Complaint by Richard Frenkel.(Babcock, Charles)
June 25, 2008 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
June 16, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel (Babcock, Charles)
June 16, 2008 Filing 17 COMPLAINT against Mallun Yen, John Noh, Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001579960.), filed by Eric Albritton.(Holmes, James)
June 13, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE of Disclosure by Eric Albritton (Holmes, James)
June 12, 2008 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 5, 2008 before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-590-1096. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2008. (rem, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Discovery due by 11/7/2008. Plaintiff to identify trial witnesses by 12/1/2008; Defendant by 12/8/2008. Jury instructions due by 1/7/2009. Proposed Findings of Fact due by 1/7/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2009. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/5/08. (mjc )
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/05/08. cc:attys 6-5-08(mll, )
June 5, 2008 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2008. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (lgp, )
June 3, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Richard Frenkel (Babcock, Charles)
June 2, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Disclosure by Eric Albritton (fnt, )
May 29, 2008 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Babcock, Charles)
May 2, 2008 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Frenkel.(McWilliams, George)
April 7, 2008 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Richard Frenkel.( McWilliams, George)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 6/5/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/31/08. cc:attys 3-31-08 (mll, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to all parties (mll, )
March 14, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. cc:attys 3-17-08 (mll, )
March 14, 2008 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Notice of Removal,.. (Babcock, Charles)
March 14, 2008 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
March 14, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cisco Systems, Inc. from Gregg County Court at Law #2, case number 2008-481-CCL2. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1464822), filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A to Cisco's Notice of Removal# 3 Exhibit B to Cisco's Notice of Removal# 4 Exhibit C to Cisco's Notice of Removal)(Babcock, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albritton v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Albritton
Represented By: James Andrew Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Frenkel
Represented By: Charles L Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?